Authenment v. Ingram Barge Company et al
Plaintiff: Edward F Authenment, III
Defendant: Ingram Barge Company, Cenac Towing Co., LLC and Mid-Coast Barge Corporation
Case Number: 2:2010cv02107
Filed: July 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER AND REASONS granting 216 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as moot Plaintiff's 209 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying Valero's 197 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part Plaintiff's 210 Cros s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. No claims remain against Defendants Kinder Morgan Bulk Terminals, Inc., Kinder Morgan Liquids Terminals, LLC, and Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LP and they are dismissed from this suit. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER AND REASONS granting 88 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff is compelled to arbitrate his claims against West of England Shipowners Mutual Insurance Association, and the above-captioned matter is STAYED pending that arbitration. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm, )
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying 134 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/9/2012. (gbw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Authenment v. Ingram Barge Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward F Authenment, III
Represented By: Richard Julius Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingram Barge Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cenac Towing Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Coast Barge Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?