In Re: Oil Spill by the Oil Rig "Deepwater Horizon" in the Gulf of Mexico, on April 20, 2010 Featured Case

Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 2:2010md02179
Filed: August 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 43:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6071 ORDER granting 6066 Motion to Withdraw Alex Peet as Attorney for Destin Hype, LLC (doc #40194), Michael Louis Lovieno (doc #40166) and Nick Louis Lovieno (doc #40235). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/20/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6070 ORDER granting 6063 Motion to Withdraw law firm of Davis & Norris, LLP as Attorney for Jo Ann and Dennis Bingel (doc #64281). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/20/2012. (Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(blg)
March 20, 2012 Filing 6068 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw The Dugan Law Firm as Attorney of Record by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(Franco, David)
March 19, 2012 Filing 6066 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Alex Peet as Attorney for Destin Hype, LLC (doc #40194), Michael Louis Lovieno (doc #40166) and Nick Louis Lovieno (doc #40235) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Peet, Alex) Modified on 3/20/2012 (blg).
March 19, 2012 Filing 6065 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. re 5564 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 10-2454, 10-1768)(Tebbutt, Charles) Modified on 3/20/2012 (blg).
March 19, 2012 Filing 6064 ***DEFICIENT: AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand CONSTANTIN LAND TRUST VS. EPIC DIVING & MARINE SERVICES, LLC against Defendant filed by Plaintiff.(Reference: 12-179)(Album, Jerald) Modified on 3/20/2012 (blg).
March 16, 2012 Filing 6069 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-46) FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring case(s) to the Eastern District of LA to become part of MDL 2179, by Clerk MDL Panel. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 6067 Joinder In and Consent filed by Defendants BP America, Inc., BP Company North America Inc., BP Corporation North America, Inc., BP Products North America Inc., and BP Exploration & Production Inc. re 5078 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Reference: 11-2891)(gec, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 6063 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw law firm of Davis & Norris, LLP as Attorney for Jo Ann and Dennis Bingel (doc #64281) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888; 10-2771)(Barnett, Wesley) Modified on 3/20/2012 (blg).
March 16, 2012 Filing 6062 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for acceptance of this late-filed Short Form Joinder, as to Columbia Street Seafood LLC (doc #117985) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Shaw, Franklin) Modified on 3/19/2012 (gec, ). Modified on 3/20/2012 (blg).
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6061 ORDER: the Court will hold an In Chambers Conference with liaison counsel 5/3/2012 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(Reference: All Cases)(gec, )
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6060 ORDER granting 6046 Motion to Withdraw Walter L. Nixon Jr. as Attorney for Thomas Shane Sekul/Mississippi Maritime Heritage Foundation (doc #49098). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/16/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
March 16, 2012 Filing 6059 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Discovery Conference held on 3/16/2012. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (Attachments: # 1 Conference Attendance Record) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
March 15, 2012 Filing 6058 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Status Conference held on 3/15/2012, re 5751 Wisner Donation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Specific Performance of Contractual Access Agreement. ORDERED that, no later than Monday, 3/19/2012, counsel for the Wisner Donation will produce to counsel for BP a non-privileged list of all materials already received from BP that are responsive to the contractual terms at issue. FURTHER ORDERED that a Status Conference is hereby SCHEDULED for 3/28/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. FURTHER ORDERED that imposition of a deadline for BP's written opposition to the motion for partial summary judgment and a schedule for any additional briefing or evidence submission regarding the 5751 Wisner Donation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Specific Performance of Contractual Access Agreement, is DEFERRED until after the scheduled status conference. (Reference: 10-2771) (NEF sent to Judge Barbier) (blg)
March 15, 2012 Filing 6057 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Top Water Charters, LLC, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 12-381)(Stag, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2012 (blg).
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6056 ORDER - Status Conference set for 3/27/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr... Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (NEF - J. Barbier)(Reference: 11-2499)(car, )
March 15, 2012 Filing 6055 Letter to Magistrate Judge Wilkinson from Counsel for Plaintiff August Walter dated 3/12/2012. (Reference: 12-177)(blg)
March 15, 2012 Filing 6054 ***ERROR: ATTORNEY REFILED AS DOC 6057 . - Amended MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 2:10-cv-0381, 2:10-cv-0888, 2:10-md-2179)(Stag, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2012 (blg).
March 15, 2012 Filing 6053 CORRECTED APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendant BP re 5951 Notice of Appeal,. (Reference: 11-274, 11-275)(Goodwin, David) Modified on 3/16/2012 (blg).
March 15, 2012 Filing 6052 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP Exploration and Production Inc. on 3/5/2012. (Reference: 12-529)(Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 3/16/2012 (blg).
March 15, 2012 Filing 6051 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP America Production Company on 3/5/2012. (Reference: 12-529)(Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 3/16/2012 (blg).
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6050 ORDER- Status Conference reset for 3/20/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (NEF - J. Barbier)(Reference: 12-177)(car, )
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6049 ORDER Clarifying the Court's 5995 First Amended Order of March 8, 2012, Creating Transition Process. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/14/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6048 ORDER denying 5673 MOTION to Sever and Deconsolidate filed by Plaintiff; However, the reassignment and referral to Magistrate Judge Wilkinson shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/14/2012.(Reference: 12-177)(blg)
March 14, 2012 Filing 6047 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinder of Allan A. Montreuil Jr. (doc #117950), Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Goldberg, Kevin) Modified on 3/15/2012 (blg). (Main Document and Attachment 1 replaced on 3/15/2012) (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2012: # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order) (blg). Modified on 3/15/2012 to split document into separate PDFs. (blg).
March 14, 2012 Filing 6046 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Walter L. Nixon Jr. as Attorney for Thomas Shane Sekul/Mississippi Maritime Heritage Foundation (doc #49098) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Nixon, Walter) Modified on 3/14/2012 (blg).
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6045 ORDER granting 6036 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Sang Thanh Nguyen; Attorney Drew A. Ranier, Christopher R. Sonnier, Sarah Ranier Kearney and Brett M. Powers terminated. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/14/2012. (Reference: 10-1850)(blg)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6044 ORDER granting 6035 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Giau V. Nguyen; Attorney Drew A. Ranier; Christopher R. Sonnier; Sarah Ranier Kearney and Brett M. Powers terminated. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/14/2012. (Reference: 10-1855)(blg)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6043 ORDER granting 6037 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Giang T. Nguyen; Attorney Drew A. Ranier; Christopher R. Sonnier; Sarah Ranier Kearney and Brett M. Powers terminated. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/14/2012. (Reference: 10-1852)(blg)
March 14, 2012 Filing 6042 MOTION to Dismiss claims against defendant Lawson Environmental Services, LLC by Defendant Lawson Environmental Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: 11-2499) (**Originally filed on 3/13/2012, in member case 11-2499, Rec. Doc. 34)(blg)
March 14, 2012 Filing 6041 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (11-2499, Rec. Doc. 12) by Defendants DRC Emergency Services, LLC, DRC Marine, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: 11-2499) (**Originally filed on 3/7/2012, in member case 11-2499, Rec. Doc. 20)(blg)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6040 ORDERED that Case No. 11-2499 is hereby CONSOLIDATED with MDL 2179. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 11-2499 is REASSIGNED AND REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Division 2) for the purpose of pretrial case management. By effect of Pretrial Order No. 15 (Rec. Doc. 676 ), all motions previously filed in member case 11-2499, including DRC's Motion to Dismiss (11-2499, Rec. Doc. 20), are hereby continued and no oppositions are due until further ordered by the Court. Parties are directed to use the MDL 2179 caption in future filings with this Court. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/13/2012. (NEF sent to Magistrate Judge Wilkinson) (Reference: 11-2499)(blg)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6039 ORDER: Regarding Protection of Confidential Information. (re 641 PTO #13, 2376 PTO #36 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 3/13/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 13, 2012 Filing 6038 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. on 1/26/2012. (Reference: 12-248)(Taschek, Leah) Modified on 3/14/2012 (blg).
March 13, 2012 Filing 6037 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Brett M Powers, Drew Ranier, Sarah Ranier Kearney, Ranier Law Firm, Christopher R Sonnier, Sonnier Law Firm as Attorney by Plaintiff Giang T Nguyen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-1852)(Powers, Brett) Modified on 3/14/2012 (blg).
March 13, 2012 Filing 6036 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Brett M Powers, Drew Ranier, Sarah Ranier Kearney, Ranier Law Firm, Christopher R Sonnier, Sonnier Law Firm as Attorney by Plaintiff Sang Thanh Nguyen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-1850)(Powers, Brett) Modified on 3/14/2012 (blg).
March 13, 2012 Filing 6035 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Brett M Powers, Drew Ranier, Sarah Ranier Kearney, Ranier Law Firm, Christopher R Sonnier, Sonnier Law Firm as Attorney by Plaintiff Giau V Nguyen. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-1855)(Powers, Brett) Modified on 3/14/2012 (blg).
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6034 ORDER granting 6024 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David B. Franco to be substituted in place of Kristopher R. Kahao, Joseph E. Ritch, Joseph M. Dunn, and David L. Rumley for Plaintiff Fish Commander, LLC. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/13/2012. (Reference: 10-1339)(blg)
March 13, 2012 Filing 6033 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Bruno, Joseph) Modified on 3/14/2012 (blg).
March 13, 2012 Filing 6032 Supplemental DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiff Louisiana State re 5874 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 11-1480)(Parsiola, David) Modified on 3/14/2012 (blg).
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6031 ORDERED that Epiq Systems shall be enrolled on the service list for all cases inMDL No. 2179 and CA 10-2771. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 3/12/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 12, 2012 Filing 6030 JOINT DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity, Defendants Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Deepwater Inc., BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc., and BP p.l.c. re 5564 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 10-1768, 10-2454)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 3/13/2012 (blg).
March 12, 2012 Filing 6029 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendant BP re 5951 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 11-274, 11-275)(Goodwin, David) Modified on 3/13/2012 (blg).
March 12, 2012 Filing 6028 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Defendants Weatherford U.S., L.P. and Weatherford International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Judgment)(Reference: 10-2771 and 10md2179)(Goodier, Glenn) Modified on 3/13/2012 (blg).
March 12, 2012 Filing 6027 ANSWER to 881 Master Complaint B3 Bundle by Clean Tank LLC. (Reference: ALL CASES in Pleading Bundle Section III.B(3))(Waid, Raymond) Modified on 3/13/2012 (blg).
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6026 ORDER granting 6019 Motion Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul W. Turner to be substituted in place of Bruce A. Craig as to plaintiffs David C. Carlile (doc #64540), and QMCD, LP (doc #64562). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/12/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6025 ORDER re Working Group Conference on Friday, 3/9/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 3/12/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
March 12, 2012 Filing 6024 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney David B. Franco to be substituted in place of Kristopher R. Kahao, Joseph E. Ritch, Joseph M. Dunn, and David L. Rumley by Plaintiff Fish Commander, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-1339)(Kahao, Kristopher) Modified on 3/13/2012 (blg).
March 12, 2012 Filing 6021 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5921 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pl. D. Montgomery. (Reference: 11-2298)(Dursa, Matthew) Modified on 3/13/2012 (blg).
March 12, 2012 Filing 6020 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5920 MOTION to Certify Class Action of Pl. D. Montgomery. (Reference: 11-2298)(Dursa, Matthew) Modified on 3/13/2012 (blg).
March 11, 2012 Filing 6019 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul W. Turner to be substituted in place of Bruce A. Craig as to plaintiffs David C. Carlile (doc #64540) QMCD, LP (doc #64562) and by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Turner, Paul) Modified on 3/12/2012 (blg).
March 9, 2012 Filing 6023 Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by Donald Vidrine for the following reason: duplicate payment: receipt number 053l-3414876, and 053l-3414801 re 5957 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6022 ORDER granting 5945 M-I, LLC's MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's February 24, 2012 Order, docket 5870 ; M-I's 5364 MOTION for Joinder in and Adopt The Arguments Made in The Weatherford Entities' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(C) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and M-I L.L.C.'s Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c), and 2520 MOTION to Dismiss Transocean's Cross-Claims/Counter-Claims are not moot and are reinstated on the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/9/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771)(blg)
March 9, 2012 Filing 6018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Discovery Conference held on 3/9/2012. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (Attachments: # 1 Conference Attendance Record) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 6016 ***DEFICIENT - EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Kristopher R. Kahao, Joseph E. Ritch, Joseph M. Dunn, and David L. Rumley as Attorney by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-1339)(Kahao, Kristopher) Modified on 3/12/2012 (blg).
March 9, 2012 Filing 6013 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Defendant Cameron International Corporation re 5089 Notice of Appeal, 5084 Notice of Appeal, 4987 Notice of Appeal, 5086 Notice of Appeal, 5063 Notice of Appeal, 5085 Notice of Appeal, 5087 Notice of Appeal, 4988 Notice of Appeal, 5874 Notice of Appeal, 5539 Notice of Appeal, 5081 Notice of Appeal, 5065 Notice of Appeal (Reference: 10-2771, 10-1757, 10-1758, 10-1759, 10-1760, 10-2087, 10-2731, 10-2996, 10-2997, 11-1106, 11-1113, 11-1480)(Wittmann, Phillip) Modified on 3/12/2012 (blg).
March 9, 2012 Filing 6012 NOTICE by Defendant Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-529)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Status Conference held on 3/8/2012 re consent pursuant to 29:636(c). IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff must file its written response to defendant's motion to dismiss no later than March 23, 2012 as stated herein. (NEF - J. Barbier) (Reference: 12-179, 12-259)(car, )
March 8, 2012 Filing 6011 NOTICE by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-519)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6010 NOTICE by Defendant Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-482)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6009 NOTICE by Defendant Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-481)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6008 NOTICE by Defendant Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-480)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6007 NOTICE by Defendant Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-476)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6006 NOTICE by Defendant Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-471)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6005 NOTICE by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-470)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6004 NOTICE by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Transocean Deepwater, Inc. and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-466)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6003 NOTICE by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-248)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6002 NOTICE by Defendant Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings, LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-528)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6001 NOTICE by Defendant Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings, LLC, Transocean Deepwater, Inc. and Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-252)(Hymel, Richard)
March 8, 2012 Filing 6000 ***DEFICIENT - First MOTION to Remand to State Court 32nd JDC, Terrebonne Parish, Louisiana by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 12-381)(Stag, Michael) Modified on 3/9/2012 (blg).
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5999 ORDER granting 5996 Motion to Withdraw The Dugan Law Firm as Attorney of Record as to Patrick J. Molinere (doc #63806). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/8/2012. (Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(blg)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5998 ORDER APPOINTING JOHN W. PERRY JR. AS A COURT-DESIGNATED NEUTRAL re proposed settlement of the seafood program. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/8/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 8, 2012 Filing 5996 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw The Dugan Law Firm as Attorney of Record as to Patrick J. Molinere (doc #63806) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(Franco, David) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg).
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5995 First Amended ORDER Creating Transition Process re 5988 Order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(Reference: ALL CASES)(gec, )
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5994 ORDER granting 5958 MOTION to Stay; FURTHER ORDERED that the effect of the Court's Order of February 14, 2012 (Rec. Doc. 5681 ), as amended by the Order dated February 24, 2012 (Rec. Doc. 5875 ), is hereby STAYEDpending Donald Vidrine's appeal of those Orders or until further ordered by this Court. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/8/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5993 ORDER denying 5976 Motion to Vacate Order Appointing Interim Class Counsel; The 5977 Motion for Expedited Hearing is MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/8/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 8, 2012 Filing 5992 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without as to Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., LTD by Plaintiffs John T. Fruge, et al. (Reference: 10-1752)(Marshall, Curt) Modified on 3/9/2012 (blg).
March 8, 2012 Filing 5991 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without as to Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., LTD by Plaintiffs Tam Ve Le, et al. (Reference: 10-2114)(Marshall, Curt) Modified on 3/9/2012 (blg).
March 8, 2012 Filing 5990 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without as to Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., LTD by Plaintiffs James Kirk Mitchell, et al. (Reference: 10-1472)(Marshall, Curt) Modified on 3/9/2012 (blg).
March 8, 2012 Filing 5989 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Court-Designated Neutral by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order To Appoint Neutral)(Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5988 ORDER granting 5987 Joint Motion, creating transition process, and appointing claims administrator and transition coordinator. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/8/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 8, 2012 Filing 5987 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Establish and Govern Transition Process by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Transition Process)(Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen)
March 7, 2012 Filing 5986 ***DEFICIENT - EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record David B. Franco by Plaintiff Fish Commander, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-1339)(Franco, David) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg).
March 7, 2012 Filing 5985 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiff Louisiana State re 5874 Notice of Appeal (Reference: 11-1480)(Parsiola, David) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg).
March 7, 2012 Filing 5984 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5976 MOTION to Vacate 5960 Order Appointing Interim Class Counsel. (Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen)
March 7, 2012 Filing 5983 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Cameron International Corporation f/k/a Cooper Cameron Corporation on 2/9/2012. (Reference: 12-349)(Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg).
March 7, 2012 Filing 5982 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Louisiana State re 5874 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 11-1480)(Parsiola, David) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg).
March 7, 2012 Filing 5981 ***ERROR: REFILED AS DOC 5985 . - DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiff re 5874 Notice of Appeal (Reference: 11-1480)(Parsiola, David) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg).
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6015 ORDER of USCA re Designation of Record, as to 5957 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6014 ORDER of USCA re Designation of Record, as to 5951 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 11-274, 11-275)(blg)
March 6, 2012 Filing 5980 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for acceptance of late-filed Short Form Joinders filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Jones, Rhon) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg).
March 6, 2012 Filing 5977 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing re 5976 Motion to Vacate by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Becnel, Daniel) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2012: # 2 Proposed Order) (blg).
March 6, 2012 Filing 5976 MOTION to Vacate 5960 Order Appointing Interim Class Counsel by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Becnel, Daniel) Modified on 3/8/2012 (blg).
March 6, 2012 Filing 5975 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Plaintiff Darryl Haan re 5922 MOTION to Hold Tampa Ship in Contempt of Court for Refusing to Comply with Federal Subpoena. (Reference: 10md2179; Darryl Haan - Claim No. 1123040)(blg)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5974 ORDER granting 5915 MOTION to Sever Individual Case From MDL; Member case No. 12-2588, Campo v. BP, et al., is hereby SEVERED AND DECONSOLIDATED from MDL 2179. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 12-2588 is hereby REASSIGNED AND REFERRED from Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Division 2) for the purpose of pretrial case management. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/2/2012.(Reference: 11-2588)(blg)
March 6, 2012 Filing 5972 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Status Conference held on 3/6/2012. (NEF: Sect J) (Reference: 11-2891)(caa, )
March 6, 2012 Filing 5971 Summons Issued as to Defendants Cameron International Corporation, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., BP America, Inc., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., Transocean Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2, # 2 Summons 3, # 3 Summons 4, # 4 Summons 5, # 5 Summons 6, # 6 Summons 7)(Reference: 12-248)(blg)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5970 ORDER granting 5962 Motion to Withdraw Martin D. Crump as Attorney for Daniel Courtney (doc #47672). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/6/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5969 ORDER granting 5961 Motion to Withdraw Alex Peet as Attorney for Charles Gaddis and Gaddis Enterprises (doc #111020). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/6/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5968 ORDER Regarding Overlap Issue for BPs Rule 30(b)(6) for Phase Two. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 3/6/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
March 5, 2012 Filing 5973 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 5964 MOTION to Dismiss Case; ***PURSUANT TO PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15: 'all pending and future motions, are continued without date unless a motion is specifically excepted from the continuance by the Court. The Court will then organize and prioritize the continued motions and in due course, set the motions for hearing. No responses to the motions are due until two weeks before the hearing date set by the Court.' **A notice of submission should not be filed in this MDL. This Motion is NOT noticed for submission until ordered by the Court. (Reference: 12-179, 12-259)(blg)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5967 ORDER granting 5950 Motion to Enroll Stephen K. Guidry and David L. Merkley as Additional Counsel of Record by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/5/2012. (Reference: 10-3815)(blg)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5966 ORDER granting 5949 Motion to Enroll Stephen K. Guidry and David L. Merkley as Additional Counsel of Record by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/5/2012. (Reference: 10-3168)(blg)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5965 ORDER granting 5948 Motion to Enroll Stephen K. Guidry and David L. Merkley as Additional Counsel of Record by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/5/2012. (Reference: 11-1160)(blg)
March 5, 2012 Filing 5964 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Epic Diving & Marine Services, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: 12-179 c/w 12-259)(Venn, Brett) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 5, 2012 Filing 5963 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Epic Diving & Marine Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Tetra Applied Technologies, LLC, Corporate Parent TETRA Applied Holding Company for Defendant Epic Diving & Marine Services, LLC. (Reference: 12-179 c/w 12-259)(Venn, Brett) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 5, 2012 Filing 5962 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Withdraw Martin D. Crump as Attorney for Daniel Courtney (doc #47672) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Lang, Leslie) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 5, 2012 Filing 5961 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Alex Peet as Attorney for Charles Gaddis and Gaddis Enterprises (doc #111020) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Peet, Alex) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5960 ORDER Appointing James Parkerson Roy and Stephen J. Herman as Interim Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(Reference: All Cases)(gec, )
March 5, 2012 Filing 5959 Request of Summons Issued as to Defendants Cameron International Corporation, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., BP America, Inc., BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., Transocean Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Delaney Group, Inc. re Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Reference: 12-248)(Taschek, Leah) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 5, 2012 Filing 5958 MOTION to Stay re 5875 Order on Motion for Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court; Pending 5957 Appeal by Donald Vidrine. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Habans, Robert) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 5, 2012 Filing 5957 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Donald Vidrine as to 5875 Order on Motion for Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. (Filing fee $ 455 receipt number 053L-3414876) (Reference: ALL CASES)(Habans, Robert) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5956 ORDER granting 5600 Motion to Resume Standard Business Practices and Cease Collection of Data Created After 1/31/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 3/5/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5955 ORDERED that Phase I of the trial scheduled to commence on Monday, March 5, 2012at 8:00 a.m. is ADJOURNED. The Court will schedule a status conference with liaison counsel to discuss issues raised by the settlement and to set a new trial date. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/2/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
March 2, 2012 Filing 5954 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Summy, Scott) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Filing 5953 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Summy, Scott) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5952 ORDER - Status Conference set for 3/15/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (NEF - J. Barbier)(Reference: 12-177)(car, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 5951 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Company North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc., BP America Inc., BP Holdings North America Limited, and BP plc as to 5938 Judgment - Rule 54(b). (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 053L-3410853.) (Reference: 11-274, 11-275)(Goodwin, David) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Filing 5950 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Stephen K. Guidry and David L. Merkley as Additional Counsel of Record by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-3815)(Guidry, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Filing 5949 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Stephen K. Guidry and David L. Merkley as Additional Counsel of Record by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-3168)(Guidry, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Filing 5948 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Stephen K. Guidry and David L. Merkley as Additional Counsel of Record by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-1160)(Guidry, Stephen) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Filing 5947 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinder of Paul J. Merritt (doc #112583) Filed Beyond the Sept. 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Goldberg, Kevin) Modified on 3/5/2012 (gec, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2012: # 2 Proposed Order) (gec, ). Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Filing 5946 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2012 re BPs Request for Gagliano Documents, as stated herein. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 5945 MOTION for Reconsideration re 5870 Order denying as moot 5364 Motion for Joinder in and for Judgment on The Pleading and 2520 Motion to Dismiss Transocean's Cross-Claims/Counter-Claims by Defendant M-I, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases and No. 10-2771)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5944 ORDER - Status Conference set for 3/15/2012 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (NEF - J. Barbier)(Reference: 10-2771)(car, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 5943 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tampa Ship, LLC re 5922 MOTION to Hold Tampa Ship in Contempt of Court for Refusing to Comply with Federal Subpoena (This Document Relates to Claim No. 1123040). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: Darryl Haan, Claim No. 1123040)(Cambre, Colin) Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Filing 5942 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders as to Kyle Glorioso (doc #112282) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Petosa, Frank) Modified on 3/5/2012 (gec, ). Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 2, 2012 Filing 5941 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Allow Late Filed Short Form Joinder as to Betty Patterson (doc #112572), Raymond Patterson (doc #112573), Kelly Powell (doc #1125652) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/5/2012 (gec, ). Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5940 ORDER granting 5935 Motion to Withdraw Martin D. Crump as Attorney for Bau Le (doc #59974). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/1/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
March 1, 2012 Filing 5939 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Exhibit List for the Phase I Trial and of Objections to Other Parties' Exhibits and Witnesses for the Phase I Trial by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP, re 5467 Objections, 5200 Exhibit List, 5348 Objections, 5878 Objections. (Reference: All Cases)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 3/2/2012 (blg).
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5938 Rule 54(b) PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT: ORDERED that a partial final judgment is hereby entered, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), in favor of the Underwriters, Ranger, and Transocean and against BP, Anadarko, and MOEX on the insurers' complaints, declaring that all claims by BP, Anadarko, and MOEX for additional insured coverage under the Policies for the sub-surface pollution liabilities BP, Anadarko, and MOEX have incurred and will incur with respect to the Macondo well oil release are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/1/12.(Reference: 11-274, 11-275)(sek, )
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5937 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 4913 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Various Insurance Companies. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/1/12. (Reference: 11-274, 11-275)(sek, )
March 1, 2012 Filing 5936 MOTION to Strike Designated Deposition Testimony That Violates the Court's 2-9-12 Order by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 3/2/2012 (blg).
March 1, 2012 Filing 5935 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Withdraw Martin D. Crump as Attorney for Bau Le (DOC #59974) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Lang, Leslie) Modified on 3/2/2012 (blg).
March 1, 2012 Filing 5934 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Past Filing Deadline by Claimants by Plaintiffs. (Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Lucado, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2012: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A) (blg). Modified on 3/6/2012 (blg).
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5933 ORDER granting 5929 Motion to Enroll Philip F. Cossich and Brandon J. Taylor as Additional Counsel of Record for the Jefferson Parish School Board (doc #93). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/1/2012. (Reference: 10-9999)(blg)
March 1, 2012 Filing 5932 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Short Form Joinder in Limitation as to Martin Thompson by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(Alvarez, Mekel) Modified on 3/2/2012 (blg).
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5931 STIPULATION AND AGREED-UPON ORDER REGARDING MOEX OFFSHORE 2007 LLC'S AND THE UNITED STATES' PRESENTATION OF EVIDENCE DURING PHASE I OF THE TRIAL. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/29/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5930 STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING ANADARKO ENTITIES ORDER re 5924 Motion for Leave to File Stipulated Order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/29/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 29, 2012 Filing 5929 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Philip F. Cossich and Brandon J. Taylor as Additional Counsel of Record for the Jefferson Parish School Board (doc #93) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-09999)(Grant, Robert) Modified on 3/1/2012 (blg).
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5928 ORDER re 5751 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Specific Performance of Contractual Access Agreement filed by Plaintiff Edward Wisner Donation; Pursuant to PTO No. 15 (Rec. Doc. 676 ), this motion is presently continued and no responses are due until ordered by the Court. ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/29/2012. (NEF sent to Magistrate Judge Wilkinson) (Reference: 2/29/2012)(blg)
February 29, 2012 Filing 5927 AGREED STIPULATIONS by Defendant and All Parties to the Phase 1 Trial (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 3/1/2012 (blg).
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5926 ORDER Regarding Examination of Donald Vidrine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/29/2012. (NEF: bobhab@bellsouth.net) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) Modified on 2/29/2012 (caa, ).
February 29, 2012 Filing 5925 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Joinder, as to Renegade Super Grafix, Inc. by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Direct Filing Short Form)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Baria, David) Modified on 3/1/2012 (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2012: # 2 Proposed Order) (blg).
February 29, 2012 Filing 5924 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for for Entry of Stipulated Order by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Order Regarding Anadarko Entities)(Reference: All Cases)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 3/1/2012 (blg).
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5923 ORDER: The Court defers ruling on 5673 Plaintiff's MOTION to Sever and Deconsolidate. ORDERED that member case no. 12-177, Walter v. B.P. America, Inc., is hereby REASSIGNED AND REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Division 2) for the purpose of pretrial case management, including issuing a scheduling order, overseeing discovery, and any other preliminary matters. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/29/2012.(Reference: 12-177)(blg)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5918 ORDER denying 4871 Motion for Summary Judgment Against Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/29/2012. (Reference: 10-1308, 10-2994, 10-4489, 10-2764, 10-1539, 10-1325)(blg)
February 29, 2012 Filing 5917 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Milam, Adam) Modified on 3/1/2012 (blg).
February 29, 2012 Filing 5916 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Allow Late Filed Short Form Joinder as to The Open Window, Inc. (doc #112287) and Francis Williams (doc #112286) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/1/2012 (blg).
February 28, 2012 Filing 5922 MOTION to Hold Tampa Ship in Contempt of Court for Refusing to Comply with Federal Subpoena by Plaintiff Darryl Haan. (Reference: 10md2179; Darryl Haan - Claim No. 1123040)(blg)
February 28, 2012 Filing 5915 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Sever Individual Case From MDL by Plaintiffs Kenneth Campo, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2588)(Impastato, Dominick) Modified on 2/29/2012 (blg).
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5914 ORDER Regarding Objections to Demonstratives for the First Week of the Trial. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/28/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5913 ORDER denying as moot 5098 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings; for reasons stated in 5489 Order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/28/2012.(Reference: 11-2515)(blg)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5912 ORDER granting 5594 Motion to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney by Plaintiffs Mohammed E. Mohammed, doc #52838; Bibekanada Bepary, doc #49761; Betty Pierre, doc #60631; Warren Taylor, doc #52986; John Williams, doc #49765; Aaron Washington, doc #58143; Jannyn Erazo, doc #52598; and George Green, doc #52680. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/28/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
February 28, 2012 Filing 5911 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Brad Billon on February 17, 2012 by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.(Reference: ALL CASES)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/29/2012 (blg).
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5910 ORDER regarding Confidentiality Claims by Transocean and BP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/28/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 28, 2012 Filing 5909 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed After Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Wild, Cheryl) Modified on 2/29/2012 (blg).
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5907 ORDER re 5873 MTN Adverse Inferences based on Invocation of the 5th Amd filed by Pla, 5879 MTN for Adverse Inferences Based on BP Employee Mark Hafle's Refusal to Testify filed by Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater Inc. & Triton Asset Leasing GmbH., & 5885 MTN for Adverse Inferences Based on Assertions of the 5th Amd filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/28/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 28, 2012 Filing 5906 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders filed beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: All Cases, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Goldberg, Kevin) Modified on 2/29/2012 (blg).
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5997 ORDER of USCA re designation of record, as to 5564 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 10-1768, 10-2454)(blg)
February 27, 2012 Filing 5905 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinder Filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline, as to Kevin Harriel (doc #112280) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Shaw, Franklin) Modified on 2/28/2012 (blg).
February 27, 2012 Filing 5904 Notice of Compliance by BP America Production Company. (Reference: 12-381)(Rolen-Ogden, April)
February 27, 2012 Filing 5903 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Allow Late Filed Short Form Joinder by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Peet, Alex) Modified on 2/28/2012 (blg).
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5902 ORDER granting in part 5880 Motion to Strike to the extent that its objections are noted for the record and the parties shall proceed with BP's proposal as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/27/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 27, 2012 Filing 5901 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the April 20, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Movants, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Johnson, Jonathan) Modified on 2/28/2012 (blg).
February 27, 2012 Filing 5900 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to LIberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc. on 1/30/2012. (Reference: 12-311)(Wittmann, Phillip)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5896 ORDER re Neutral Expert Forensic Examination and Report Regarding Halliburton Computers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/27/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5895 ORDER re Working Group Conference on Friday, 2/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/27/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 26, 2012 Filing 5892 Letter (email) to Judge Carl J. Barbier from Andrew Langan dated 2/26/2012 re HESI objections. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 26, 2012 Filing 5890 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline as to Gary Bryant(#110185); Seth Wilson(#112400); Dewight Sightler(#109393); Scott Johnson(#110247); Brent Shaver(#110186); Keith Powell(#112248); and Mike Peek(#112250) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Clark, Charles) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/29/2012) (blg). Modified on 2/29/2012 (blg).
February 26, 2012 Filing 5889 ***ERROR: REFILED AS DOC 5890 - EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Forms Filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Clark, Charles) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 26, 2012 Filing 5888 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Jones, Rhon) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5887 ORDER: For reasons of judicial efficiency and to allow the parties to make further progress in their settlement discussions, the Court, on its own motion, issues the following Order: IT IS ORDERED that Phase I of the trial scheduled to commence February 27, 2012, is ADJOURNED until Monday, March 5, 2012 at 8:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/26/12.(Reference: all cases)(sek, )
February 25, 2012 Filing 5899 Letter (email) to Judge Barbier from Donald E. Godwin dated 2/25/2012 re HESI's Objections. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 25, 2012 Filing 5898 Email to Mike OKeefe from Robert Cunningham dated 2/25/2012 re PSC Demonstratives. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 25, 2012 Filing 5893 Email to Judge Shushan from Robert Cunningham dated 2/25/2012 re demonstratives. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 25, 2012 Filing 5886 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Jones, Rhon) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5921 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff D. Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support & Table of Contents, # 2 1-4, # 3 5, # 4 6-9, # 5 Proof of Service)(Reference: 11-2298)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5920 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff D. Montgomery. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support & Table of Contents, # 2 1-6, # 3 Attachment A & B, # 4 Proof of Service)(Reference: 11-2298)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5919 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-45) FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring case(s) to the Eastern District of LA to become part of MDL 2179, by Clerk MDL Panel. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5897 Letter (email) to Judge Barbier from Andrew Langan dated 2/24/2012 re Order re Working Group Conference on Friday, 2/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 5894 Letter (email) to Judge Barbier from Andrew Langan dated 2/24/2012 re demonstratives. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 5885 MOTION for Adverse Inferences Based on Assertions of the Fifth Amendment by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: ALL CASES; 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5884 OBJECTIONS to Trial Exhibits (2-24-12) by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, and BP p.l.c. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5883 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed After The September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Jones, Rhon) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5882 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed After the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Waltzer, Joel) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5881 Phase One Trial Exhibit List by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, and BP p.l.c. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5880 MOTION to Strike Portions of Expert Reports, and Depositions Referencing Excluded JIT Report and JIT Testimony re 5618 Order, 5572 Order, 5448 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Exclude by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A re Calvin Barnhill, # 2 Exhibit B re J.R. Batte, # 3 Exhibit C re David Bolado, # 4 Exhibit D re David G. Calvert, # 5 Exhibit E re Ronald Crook, # 6 Exhibit F re Paul Dias, # 7 Exhibit G re Robert Grace, # 8 Exhibit H re Sam Lewis, # 9 Exhibit I re Greg McCormack, # 10 Exhibit J1 re Andrew Mitchell, # 11 Exhibit J2 re Andrew Mitchell, # 12 Exhibit K re Jeff Wolfe, # 13 Exhibit L re Fredrick Beck, # 14 Exhibit M re George Medley, # 15 Exhibit N re Kris Ravi)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5879 MOTION for Adverse Inferences Based on BP Employee Mark Hafle's Refusal to Testify by Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater Inc. and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5878 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company, LP re 5731 Halliburton's Sixth Amended Good Faith Trial Exhibit List: Phase One. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: All Cases)(Kuchler, Deborah) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5877 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Summy, Scott) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5876 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinder Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline, as to TransWood, Inc. (doc #110044) by Plaintiffs . (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Albritton, Melvin) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5875 ORDER & REASONS re 5757 MOTION to Review the United States' Magistrate Judge's Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Transocean's Motion to Compel: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Magistrate Judge's Order [Rec. Doc. 5681] is hereby amended to add the following language: By complying with this order, Donald Vidrine shall not be deemed to have waived the right to assert the psychotherapist-patient privilege with respect to the information contained in his medical records in any other action outside the instant proceeding, specifically including any ongoing criminal investigation of the events giving rise to the Macondo well blowout. Otherwise, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Review [Rec. Doc. 5757] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/2012. (Reference: all cases)(sek, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 5874 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Louisiana State as to 5029 Order granting Motion to Dismiss (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 053L-3400767.) (Reference: 11-1480)(Parsiola, David) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5873 MOTION Adverse Inferences based on Invocation of the Fifth Amendment by Plaintiffs through Co-Liaison Counsel and the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - Hafle, # 2 Appendix 2 - Morel, # 3 Appendix 3 - Kaluza, # 4 Appendix 4 - Kutcha, # 5 Appendix 5 - Harrell, # 6 Appendix 6 - Bertone, # 7 Appendix 7 - Haire, # 8 Appendix 8 - Willis, # 9 Appendix 9 - Fleytas, # 10 Appendix 10 - Ingram, # 11 Appendix 11 - Holloway, # 12 Appendix 12 - Sandell, # 13 Appendix 13 - Seraile)(Reference: All Cases (including 10-2771))(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5872 ORDER re Joinder of MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC and MOEX USA Corporation as to 4319 Anadarko's Motion in Limine. The Court subsequently granted Anadarkos Motion in Limine. (Rec. Doc. 5836 ). ORDERED that evidence of MOEX's knowledge of or access to Macondo Well design and/or operations is irrelevant to any issue in the Phase I trial. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5871 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants Nalco Company, Nalco Holdings LLC, Nalco Finance Holdings LLC and Nalco Holding Company re 5718 MOTION to Amend Master B3 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: all cases in pleading bundle III.B(3))(Heiden, Thomas) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5870 ORDERED that the following Motions are DENIED AS MOOT: 2445 , 2884 , 2887 , 2891 , 4306 , 5242 , 2587 , 4186 , 2823 , 5364 , and 2520 . FURTHER ORDERED that the two Motions in Opposition to Class Certification of any Action in MDL No. 2179 (Rec. Docs. 4782 , 4798 ) are DENIED AS PREMATURE. The Court has stayed all class action motion practice and deadlines. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5869 FIRST AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM against Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc, Transocean Deepwater Inc, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Sperry Drilling Services, M-I, LLC filed by Anadarko E&P Company LP, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation. (amending Cross-claim filed in 10-2771, doc #338; amending to delete, and thereby dismiss, Anadarko's cross-claims against BPXP, BP America Production Company, BP p.l.c., Weatherford U.S. L.P., Weatherford International, Inc., and Cameron International Corporation)(Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5868 ORDER granting 5669 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Crossclaim of Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/2012. (Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5867 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Corporation North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2886)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5866 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Company North America, Inc. served on 2/13/2012. (Reference: 11cv2886)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5865 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Corporation North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2887)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5864 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Company North America, Inc. served on 2/13/2012. (Reference: 11cv2887)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5863 ***ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY TO DOC 5861 . - SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Company North America, Inc. served on 2/13/2012. (Reference: 11cv2888)(Owen, Joe) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5862 ***ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY TO DOC 5861 . - SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Corporation North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2888)(Owen, Joe) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5861 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Corporation North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2888)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5860 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Corporation North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2889)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5859 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Company North America, Inc. served on 2/13/2012. (Reference: 11cv2889)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5858 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Company North America, Inc. served on 2/13/2012. (Reference: 11cv2890)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5857 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Corporation North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2890)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5856 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Products North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2890)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5855 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Exploration and Production, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2890)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5854 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Exploration and Production, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2889)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5853 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Exploration and Production, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2888)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5852 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Exploration and Production, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2887)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5851 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Exploration and Production, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2886)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5850 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Products North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2886)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5849 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Products North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2887)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5848 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Products North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2888)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5847 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Products North America, Inc. served on 2/14/2012. (Reference: 11cv2889)(Owen, Joe)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5846 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendant BP re 5718 MOTION to Amend Master B3 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5845 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Summy, Scott) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5844 ORDER granting 5802 Motion to Supplement 5795 Plaintiffs' MOTION to AllowLate Filed Short Form Joinders In Limitation; The list of plaintiffs, attached as EXHIBIT A, and the Short Forms, attached as Exhibit B, to the Motion to Allow Late Filed Short Form Joinders (Doc. 5795) shall be amended and supplemented by EXHIBIT A and EXHIBIT B attached to Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement (Doc. 5802) in the Transocean Limitation. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/23/2012. (Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5843 Return of Service of Subpoena served on Stress Engineering Services on 2/6/2012 by Plaintiffs. (Reference: all cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5842 Return of Service of Subpoena served on Schlumberger on 2/1/2012 by Plaintiffs. (Reference: all cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5841 Return of Service of Subpoena served on Exxon Mobil on 2/2/2012 by Plaintiffs. (Reference: all cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5840 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Acceptance of Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Summy, Scott) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5839 Return of Service of Subpoena served on Oceaneering International Inc. on 2/10/2012 by Plaintiffs. (Reference: all cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5838 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Allow Late Filed Short Form Joinder by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2012: # 2 Proposed Order) (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5837 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond The September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Reference: ALL CASES, 10-8888)(Barr, Brian) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2012: # 1 Proposed Order) (blg).
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5836 ORDER granting 4319 Anadarko's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Anadarko Entities' Knowledge of or Access to Information About Well Design and/or Operations of the Macondo Prospect from the Limitation of Liability Trial. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5835 ORDER denying 4484 PSC's Motion in Limine to Exclude BP Testimony and Argument Regarding BOP Regulatory Compliance or Temporary Abandonment Plan. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5834 ORDER Regarding Motions in Limine to Exclude Non-Governmental Reports; ORDERED that the subject motions in limine (Rec. Docs. 4811 , 4812 , & 4894 ) are DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) .
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5833 ORDER Regarding Motions in Limine Concerning Miscellaneous Exhibits; ORDERED that the subject motions in limine (Rec. Doc. 4757 and Rec. Doc. 4525 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5832 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC, MOEX USA Corporation, Mitsui Oil Exploration Company, Ltd. regarding 5831 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaims and Counterclaims of Cameron International Corporation for failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-3059, 10-4182, 10-4183, 11-516)(Nizialek, Philip) Modified on 2/24/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5831 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaims and Counterclaims of Cameron International Corporation for failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC, MOEX USA Corporation, Mitsui Oil Exploration Company, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Proposed Order, # 10 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 10-3059, 10-4182, 10-4183, 11-516)(Nizialek, Philip) Modified on 2/24/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Filing 5830 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders Filed Beyond the September 16, 2011 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771)(Sterbcow, Paul) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5829 ORDER: Final Witness Lists for the Phase One Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/24/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Final Witness Lists)(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 24, 2012 Filing 5828 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Clean-Up Responder Defendants re 5718 MOTION to Amend Master B3 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases in Pleading Bundle B3)(Lyle, Michael) Modified on 2/27/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Filing 5827 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater Inc. and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH re 5757 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5681 Order on Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/24/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Filing 5826 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders (Exhibit A) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Cossich, Philip) Modified on 2/24/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Filing 5825 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 5820 Notice VoO Contract Claim Plaintiff Fact Sheet, 5818 Notice VoO Contract Claim Plaintiff Fact Sheet, 5819 Notice VoO Contract Claim Plaintiff Fact Sheet; Documents has been stricken. VoO Contract Claim Plaintiff Fact Sheets are NOT filed into the Court record, pursuant to Order. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 23, 2012 Filing 5824 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Status Conference held on December 9, 2011 before Judge Sally Shushan. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number (504) 589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(clu, )
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5823 ORDER granting 5750 BP's and M-I's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss With Prejudice Their Claims Against Each Other. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/23/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5822 ORDER granting 5806 Motion for Extension of Deadlines for Service of Complaint. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/23/2012. (Reference: 11-2886, 11-2887, 11-2888, 11-2889, 11-2890)(blg)
February 23, 2012 Filing 5821 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Robert Bea on 2/20/2012 by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., and Transocean Deepwater Inc. (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/24/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Filing 5820 ***STRICKEN - NOTICE by Plaintiff VoO Contract Claim Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Donald Jackson. (Reference: all)(Petosa, Frank) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Filing 5819 ***STRICKEN - NOTICE by Plaintiff VoO Contract Claim Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Keith Hughes. (Reference: all)(Petosa, Frank) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Filing 5818 ***STRICKEN - NOTICE by Plaintiff VoO Contract Claim Plaintiff Fact Sheet of Christopher Comminey. (Reference: all)(Petosa, Frank) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5817 ORDER re 5600 mOTION to Resume Standard Business Practices and Cease Collection of Data Created After January 31, 2012 filed by Cameron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/23/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5816 ORDER Regarding Release of Evidence to BP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/23/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 5815 NOTICE of Filing of Limitation Action by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings, LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-381)(Hymel, Richard) Modified on 2/24/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Filing 5814 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Corporate Rep of Cameron International Corporation through Jack Moore (Headquarters) on 2/20/2012 by Plaintiff. (Reference: All Cases)(Gisleson, Soren) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 23, 2012 Filing 5813 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Corporate Rep of Cameron International Corporation through Jack Moore on 2/20/2012 by Plaintiff. (Reference: All Cases)(Gisleson, Soren) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 22, 2012 Filing 5908 Letter (e-mail) to Judge Shushan from Transocean dated 2/22/2012 regarding confidential trial exhibits. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2012: # 1 Exhibit) (caa, ).
February 22, 2012 Filing 5891 Letter (email) from Andrew Langan dated 2/22/2012 re Objections to Demonstratives. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 5812 OBJECTIONS to Demonstratives Designed by Other Parties by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: All Cases; 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 22, 2012 Filing 5811 OBJECTIONS to Demonstrative Aids by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, BP p.l.c. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5810 ORDER re Motions in Limine Regarding Joint Investigation Report and Government Reports ( 5448 , 5618 , 5635 Orders); The fact testimony of Mr. Garrison is admissible, and his opinion testimony is inadmissible. The Chevron cement testing report, Chevron cement testing data, and associated fact testimony of Mr. Gardner are not rendered inadmissible by their relationship to the excluded government reports. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/22/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5809 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 4836 United States' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 5113 Anadarko's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part, denying in part 5103 Transocean's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/22/2012.(Reference: 10-4536)(blg)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5808 ORDER granting 5360 Cameron's Motion in Limine to Exclude Warning Opinions of PSC Expert Gregg S. Perkin. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/22/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5807 ORDER granting 5760 Motion to Dismiss Case with prejudice filed by plaintiff Oleander Benton. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/22/2012. (Reference: 10-4226)(blg)
February 22, 2012 Filing 5806 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Service by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2886, 11-2887, 11-2888, 11-2889, 11-2890)(Owen, Joe) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 22, 2012 Filing 5805 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Demonstrative Aides by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko E&P Company LLC, pursuant to 5327 Order re Working Group Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objections to Proposed Demonstrative Aides)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 22, 2012 Filing 5804 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. by Plaintiffs Scott Carswell, et al. (Reference: 11-260)(Adams, Samuel) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 22, 2012 Filing 5803 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. by Plaintiffs Mary Gifford Walton, et al. (Reference: 10-4204)(Adams, Samuel) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg).
February 22, 2012 Filing 5802 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Supplement by Plaintiffs re 5795 MOTION to allow late filed short form joinder (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/23/2012 (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2012: # 4 Proposed Order) (blg).
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5801 ORDER granting 5538 Motion for Extension of Time to File Untimely Notice of Appear. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/22/2012. (Reference: 11-1480)(blg)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5800 ORDER granting 5755 Motion for Leave to File under seal Exhibits A-C, attached to HESI's Combined Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/22/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 5799 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Status Conference held on February 10, 2012 before Judge Sally Shushan. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number (504) 589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(clu, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 5798 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name as to Attorney Gary Mason by Plaintiffs Lester Ansardi, et al. (Reference: 11-2908)(Mason, Gary) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 22, 2012 Filing 5797 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Acceptance of Limitations Short Form Joinders Beyond the September 16, 2012 Deadline by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-8888)(Petosa, Frank) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 21, 2012 Filing 5795 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to allow late filed short form joinder by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 3)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2012: # 5 Proposed Order) (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2012: # 6 AMENDED - EXHIBIT A, # 7 AMENDED - EXHIBIT B (PART1), # 8 AMENDED - EXHIBIT B (PART 2)) (blg). Modified on 2/24/2012 - Exhibits Amended, pursuant to 5844 Order. (blg).
February 21, 2012 Filing 5794 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP America Production Company on 2/15/2012. (Reference: 12-349)(Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 21, 2012 Filing 5793 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to BP Exploration and Production Inc. on 2/15/2012. (Reference: 12-349)(Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 21, 2012 Filing 5792 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Cameron International Corporation f/k/a Cooper Cameron Corporation on 2/9/2012. (Reference: 12-349)(Toups, Mitchell) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 21, 2012 Filing 5791 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Buddy Trahan. (Reference: 11-263)(Lubel, Lance) Modified on 2/23/2012 - accepted per chambers, see previous filed motion to remand 1900 (blg).
February 21, 2012 Filing 5790 Fourth Amended Phase One "Good Faith" Trial Exhibit List by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 21, 2012 Filing 5789 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name as to Attorney Gary Mason by Plaintiffs Edward Lockridge. (Reference: 10-2659)(Mason, Gary) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 21, 2012 Filing 5788 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name as to Attorney Gary Mason by Plaintiffs Eugene B. Dugas, et al. (Reference: 10-1322)(Mason, Gary) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5787 Phase One Trial Exhibit List by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, and BP p.l.c. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5786 REPLY in Response to Motion filed by Defendant Cameron International Corporation re 5414 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn BOP Control System Design Opinions Previously Offered By BP's Expert, Arthur Zatarain by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5785 REPLY in Response to Motion filed by Defendant Cameron International Corporation re 5415 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn Shear Ram Design Opinions Previously Offered By Halliburton's Expert, Glen Stevick by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5784 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant Cameron International Corporation re 5413 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn BOP Shear Ram Design Opinions Previously Offered By BP's Expert, Forrest Earl Shanks by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5783 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. re 5391 MOTION to Exclude Eric Gregory Childs as an Expert filed by United States of America. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5782 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Edward Geoffrey Webster for Substantial Reliance on Excluded JIT Report & Testimony or, in the Alternative, to Strike Portions of Expert Report & Testimony of Edward Geoffrey Webster Referencing Excluded JIT Report & JIT Testimony by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Webster Expert Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Edward Geoffrey Webster)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5781 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP re 5398 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Report of James P. Lang by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP, 5245 MOTION in Limine to Strike and Preclude from Trial Certain Sections of the Rebuttal Expert Report of James P. Lang and Certain Opinions of James P. Lang. (Reference: All Actions.)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5780 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5422 MOTION to Limit Testimony of Daniel Bolado by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5779 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5435 MOTION to Preclude Unreliable Opinions on the Failure of the Primary Cement Job by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5778 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5435 MOTION to Preclude Unreliable Opinions on the Failure of the Primary Cement Job by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5777 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5426 MOTION to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Alan R. Huffman by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5776 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5421 MOTION to Limit Testimony of Gene Benge by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5775 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5432 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of David Pritchard by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5774 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5428 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Andrew Hurst by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5773 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5423 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Mr. Greg Childs by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5772 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5434 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Richard Strickland by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5771 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5429 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Samuel Lewis by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5770 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5427 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of John Hughett by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5769 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5420 MOTION to Limit Testimony of Dr. Frederick "Gene" Beck by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5768 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5419 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Robert Bea and Dr. William Gale by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5767 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5425 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Patrick Hudson by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5766 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5433 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Glenn Stevick by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5765 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5431 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Gregg Perkin by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5764 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5424 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Rory R. Davis and Others by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5763 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5430 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of David O'Donnell by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5762 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by United States of America re 5391 MOTION to Exclude Eric Gregory Childs as an Expert filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED - Exhibit 1, # 2 SEALED - Exhibit 2, # 3 SEALED - Exhibit 3)(Reference: 10-4536)(O'Rourke, Steven) Modified on 2/22/2012 - added sealed documents (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5761 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant Cameron International Corporation re 5412 MOTION to Exclude All BOP Shear Ram Design Opinions Offered by the United States' Expert, Talas Engineering by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5760 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Oleander Benton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-4226)(Buzbee, Anthony) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5759 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant Cameron International Corporation re 5411 MOTION to Exclude All BOP Design Opinions Offered by PSC's BOP Expert, Gregg S. Perkin by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Reference: ALL)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5758 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re 5406 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Reference: ALL and 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5757 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5681 Order on Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony by Donald Vidrine. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Habans, Robert) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5756 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant M-I LLC re 5402 MOTION to Exclude Robert Bea and William Gale's Opinions Regarding the Spacer by Defendant M-I LLC. (Reference: All Cases and 10-2771)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5755 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Daubert Reply Exhibits Under Seal by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5754 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant M-I LLC re 5401 MOTION to Exclude Calvin Barnhill's Opinions Regarding the Relationship Between the Spacer and the Negative Pressure Test by Defendant M-I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Provided Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit B (Provided Under Seal))(Reference: All Cases and 10-02771)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5753 Notice of Compliance Godfrey J. Leboeuf v. BP America Production Company and Danos and Curole Marine Contractors, LLC by BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reference: 12-417)(Hinnigan, Emma) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 20, 2012 Filing 5752 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants Moex Offshore 2007 LLC, Moex USA Corporation re 5404 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of James P. Lang. (Reference: All Cases)(Pritchard, John) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5796 ORDER Regarding BPs Request for Gagliano Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/18/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 17, 2012 Filing 5751 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Specific Performance of Contractual Access Agreement Edward Wisner Donation by Plaintiff Edward Wisner Donation. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Cathy Norman)(Reference: 10-cv-02771)(Wiygul, Robert) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 17, 2012 Filing 5750 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Claims Against Each Other by Defendants BP p.l.c., BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, M-I L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5749 ORDER granting 5704 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits A-S Under Seal re 5705 Response/Memorandum in Opposition by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/17/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Filing 5748 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Discovery Conference held on 2/17/2012. (Court Reporter Karen Ibos.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheets) (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5747 ORDER of USCA. USCA Judge Name: Garza, Southwick, and Haynes, Circuit Judges ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED. (Reference: In Re: Gabriel Sanchez (10md2179)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5746 ORDER of USCA. USCA Judge Name: Garza, Southwick, and Haynes, Circuit Judges. ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED. (Reference: In Re: Plaquemines Parish School Board (10md2179, 11-348)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5744 ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/8/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/17/2012.(Reference: 12-179, 12-259) (NEF sent to Judge Barbier)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Filing 5743 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree with MOEX Offshore 2007 by United States of America . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Consent Decree)(Reference: 10-4536)(Himmelhoch, Sarah) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 17, 2012 Filing 5742 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Lange Clark on behalf of Plaintiff Gary R. Goodwin . (Reference: 11-1773)(Clark, Charles) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5741 ORDER dismissing as moot 5486 PSC's MOTION for Order Regarding MaterialPreviously Maintained as Confidential. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/17/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5740 ORDER granting 5709 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Henry W. Kinney and Natalie Mitchell to be substituted in place of Jarrell E. Godfrey, Jr. as to Plaintiffs Adele Daake(doc #75474), Daake Family Trust 125, LLC(doc #75478), Beach View Investments, LLC(doc #75482). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/17/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5739 ORDER granting 5723 Motion to Withdraw George Gilly as Attorney by Plaintiff Lloyd's London. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/17/2012. (Reference: 11-1439, 11-1440)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5738 ORDER granting 5722 Motion to Withdraw George Gilly as Attorney by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/17/2012. (Reference: 11-275)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5737 ORDER granting 5721 Motion to Withdraw George Gilly as Attorney by Defendant QBE Marine & Energy Syndicate 1036. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/17/2012. (Reference: 10-4536)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5736 ORDER granting 5710 Motion to Withdraw J. Parker Miller as Attorney as to plaintiff Shane Elrod - doc #107934. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/17/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
February 17, 2012 Filing 5733 NOTICE of Filing of Limitation Action by Defendant Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. and Transocean Deepwater, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Reference: 12-349)(Hymel, Richard) Modified on 2/22/2012 (blg).
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5735 ORDER denying as moot 5359 BP's Motion in Limine to Preclude the Use of Extrinsic Evidence to Interpret Indemnities. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/16/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5734 ORDER denying 5455 Motion for Certificate of Interlocutory Appealability. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/16/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5732 ORDER Regarding Access to Trial by Press and Public. In connection with the trial of Phase One commencing on February 27, 2012, and supplementing and clarifying the order entered on February 7, 2012 (rec. doc. 5613 ). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/16/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 16, 2012 Filing 5731 Sixth Amended Good Faith Trial Exhibit List by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/17/2012 (blg).
February 16, 2012 Filing 5730 Phase One Exhibit List by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, and BP p.l.c. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/17/2012 (blg).
February 16, 2012 Filing 5729 Second Supplemental and Amended Exhibit List by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., and Transocean Deepwater Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transocean's Second Supplemental and Amended Exhibit List)(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/17/2012 (blg).
February 16, 2012 Filing 5728 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants Randy J Adams, Sea Support Services, L.L.C. re 5726 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (***Originally filed prior to consolidation: filed 2/14/2012 in member case 12-179, doc #11) (Reference: 12-179)(blg)
February 16, 2012 Filing 5727 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. re 5726 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (***Originally filed prior to consolidation: filed 2/14/2012 in member case 12-179, doc #10) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Randy J. Adams, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of John McLemore)(Reference: 12-179)(blg)
February 16, 2012 Filing 5726 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Constantin Land Trust. (***Originally filed prior to consolidation: filed 1/27/2012 in member case 12-179, doc #4) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 12-179)(blg)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5725 ORDERED that Case Nos. 12-179 and 12-259 are CONSOLIDATED WITH MDL 2179.FURTHER ORDERED that Case Nos. 12-179 and 12-259 are REASSIGNED AND REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Division 2) for the purpose of pretrial case management, including issuing a scheduling order, overseeing discovery, and any other preliminary matters. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/15/2012.(Reference: 12-279, 12-259)(blg)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5724 ORDER - Status Conference set for 3/6/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.(Reference: 11-2891) (NEF - J. Barbier)(car, )
February 16, 2012 Filing 5723 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw George Gilly as Attorney by Plaintiff Lloyd's London. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-1439, 11-1440)(Moran, Kyle) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 16, 2012 Filing 5722 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw George Gilly as Attorney by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-275)(Moran, Kyle) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 16, 2012 Filing 5721 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw George Gilly as Attorney by Defendant QBE Marine & Energy Syndicate 1036. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-4536)(Moran, Kyle) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5720 ORDER Regarding the Baxter Investigation; ORDERED: 1. The Baxter investigation was conducted by counsel for BP and is protected from disclosure by the attorney-client privilege and work-product doctrine. (See Rec. doc. 2396 at 3) 2. All parties shall refrain from cross-examination at trial regarding the Baxter investigation and its work, including the analyses referenced in the clawed back portion of the document. 3. Any appeal of this order shall be taken by Monday, February 20, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/16/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5719 ORDER re Working Group Conference on Friday, 2/10/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/16/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 16, 2012 Filing 5718 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct Master B3 Complaint by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading Second Amended B3 Master Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: B3 Bundle Cases)(Herman, Stephen)
February 16, 2012 Filing 5717 Sixth Supplemental Deposition Testimony Confidentiality Status Chart filed by Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater Inc. and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Transocean's 6th Supp Depo Testimony Confid Status Chart)(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 16, 2012 Filing 5716 Return of Service of Subpoena served on Randy Miles Ezell on 2/14/2012 by Federal Government Interests.(Reference: 2:10md2179)(Underhill, R)
February 15, 2012 Filing 5715 DISMISSED CLAIM of plaintiff Darren Anthony Costello in individual complaint case 10-04427.(Arnold, Kurt)
February 15, 2012 Filing 5714 DISMISSED CLAIM of plaintiff Frank Ernest Ireland in individual complaint case 10-04427.(Arnold, Kurt)
February 15, 2012 Filing 5713 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena to Appear and Testify served on Tommy Roth on 02/10/2012 by Defendant BP.(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5712 ORDERED that 5619 BP's OBJECTIONS/MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court, are OVERRULED and the Magistrate Judge's Order (Rec. Doc. 5557 ) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/15/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5711 ORDERED that the Weatherford entities' Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 5652 ) shall be UNSEALED and made public, including all documents attached thereto. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/15/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 15, 2012 Filing 5710 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw J. Parker Miller as Attorney (Doc. 107934 in Case No. 10-8888) by Plaintiff Shane Elrod. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Miller, J.) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 15, 2012 Filing 5709 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Henry W. Kinney and Natalie Mitchell to be substituted in place of Jarrell E. Godfrey, Jr. by Plaintiffs Adele Daake(doc #75474), Daake Family Trust 125, LLC(doc #75478), Beach View Investments, LLC(doc #75482). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Mitchell, Natalie) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 15, 2012 Filing 5708 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Campbell on behalf of Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC, MOEX USA Corporation. (Reference: All Cases)(Campbell, Thomas) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 15, 2012 Filing 5707 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. re 5564 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 10-2454, 10-1768)(Tebbutt, Charles) Modified on 2/16/2012 (blg).
February 15, 2012 Filing 5706 Summons Issued as to Defendants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration and Production, Inc., Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Moex Offshore 2007, LLC, MOEX USA Corporation, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Transocean Ltd., Cameron International Corporation, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Weatherford U.S., L.P., M-I, LLC, and Mitsui Oil Exploration Co., Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2, # 2 Summons 3, # 3 Summons 4, # 4 Summons 5, # 5 Summons 6, # 6 Summons 7, # 7 Summons 8, # 8 Summons 9, # 9 Summons 10, # 10 Summons 11, # 11 Summons 12, # 12 Summons 13, # 13 Summons 14)(Reference: 11-3180)(blg)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5745 ORDER of USCA. USCA Judge Name: Garza, Southwick, and Haynes, Circuit Judges. ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED. (Reference: In Re: Brent Rodrigue Sr., et al (10md2179)(blg)
February 14, 2012 Filing 5705 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re 5435 BP's MOTION to Preclude Unreliable Opinions on the Failure of the Primary Cement Job, 5429 BP's MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Samuel Lewis, 5415 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn Shear Ram Design Opinions Previously Offered By Halliburton's Expert, Glen Stevick by Defendant Cameron International Corporation., 5434 BP's MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Richard Strickland, 5425 BP's MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Patrick Hudson, 5427 BP's MOTION to Limit the Testimony of John Hughett, 5422 BP's MOTION to Limit Testimony of Daniel Bolado, 5420 BP's MOTION to Limit Testimony of Dr. Frederick "Gene" Beck, 5433 BP's MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Glenn Stevick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 SEALED - Exhibit A, # 3 SEALED - Exhibit B, # 4 SEALED - Exhibit C, # 5 SEALED - Exhibit D, # 6 SEALED - Exhibit E, # 7 SEALED - Exhibit F, # 8 SEALED - Exhibit G, # 9 SEALED - Exhibit H, # 10 SEALED - Exhibit I, # 11 SEALED - Exhibit J, # 12 SEALED - Exhibit K, # 13 SEALED - Exhibit L, # 14 SEALED - Exhibit M, # 15 SEALED - Exhibit N, # 16 SEALED - Exhibit O, # 17 SEALED - Exhibit P, # 18 SEALED - Exhibit Q, # 19 SEALED - Exhibit R, # 20 SEALED - Exhibit S)(Reference: ALL CASES; 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg). Modified on 2/17/2012 - Added Sealed Exhibits, pursuant to 5749 Order. (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5704 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Daubert Related Exhibits Under Seal by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES; 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5703 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendant Cameron International Corporation re 5430 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of David O'Donnell by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5702 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5406 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports) by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. regarding Dr. William Wecker. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5701 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5406 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports) by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. regarding Dr. Kathleen Sutcliffe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5700 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5406 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports) by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. regarding Dr. J.J. Azar. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5699 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5406 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports) by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. regarding Chuck Schoennagel. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5698 RESPONSE to Motion and Partial Joinder filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5391 MOTION to Exclude Eric Gregory Childs as an Expert filed by United States of America. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5697 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5413 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn BOP Shear Ram Design Opinions Previously Offered By BP's Expert, Forrest Earl Shanks by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5696 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5414 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn BOP Control System Design Opinions Previously Offered By BP's Expert, Arthur Zatarain by Defendant Cameron International Corporation.. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5695 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5432 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of David Pritchard by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company.. (Reference: All Cases (including 10-2771))(Herman, Stephen)
February 14, 2012 Filing 5694 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5428 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Andrew Hurst by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company.. (Reference: All Cases (including 10-2771))(Herman, Stephen)
February 14, 2012 Filing 5693 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5419 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Robert Bea and Dr. William Gale by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company.. (Reference: All Cases (including 10-2771))(Herman, Stephen)
February 14, 2012 Filing 5692 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5402 MOTION to Exclude Robert Bea and William Gale's Opinions Regarding the Spacer by Defendant M-I LLC. (Reference: All Cases (including 10-2771))(Herman, Stephen)
February 14, 2012 Filing 5691 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5431 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Gregg Perkin by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases (including 10-2771))(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5690 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5411 MOTION to Exclude All BOP Design Opinions Offered by PSC's BOP Expert, Gregg S. Perkin by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: All Cases (including 10-2771))(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5689 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendant Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. re 5391 MOTION to Exclude Eric Gregory Childs as an Expert filed by United States of America. (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5688 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5398 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Report of James P. Lang by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP, 5404 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of James P. Lang by Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC and MOEX USA Corporation, 5245 MOTION in Limine to Strike and Preclude from Trial Certain Sections of the Rebuttal Expert Report of James P. Lang and Certain Opinions of James P. Lang. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED - Exhibit A, # 2 SEALED - Exhibit B (part 1), # 3 SEALED - Exhibit B (part 2), # 4 SEALED - Exhibit C, # 5 SEALED - Exhibit D (part 1), # 6 SEALED - Exhibit D (part 2)(Reference: 10-4536)(O'Rourke, Steven) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2012: # 7 SEALED - Exhibit E, # 8 SEALED - Exhibit F) (blg). Modified on 2/16/2012 - Added Sealed Exhibits (blg). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/1/2012) (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5687 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendant Transocean Deepwater Drilling, Inc. re 5423 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Mr. Greg Childs by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter dated 11-11-11)(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5686 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena to Appear and Testify served on Timothy Quirk on 02/09/2012 by Defendant BP.(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5685 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena to Appear and Testify served on Larry McMahan on 02/09/2012 by Defendant BP.(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5684 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater Inc. and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH re 5619 BP's MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5557 Order Denying BP's Motion to Compel Live Appearance by Transocean President and CEO. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Heather G. Callender, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Agreed Stipulation, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Trial Subpoena served on Transocean)(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5683 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Plaintiff Craig Michael Breland re 5654 DEFICIENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Withdrawn. (Reference: 10-2771)(Bonner, William) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5682 ORDERED that the Motions in Limine 5111 , 5112 , 5120 , 5144 of Transocean, BP, M-I and Halliburton to preclude the use of, and the drawing of adverse inferences from, testimony in which a witness has invoked the Fifth Amendment are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to re-urge on a case-by-case basis. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Reference: All Cases)(gec, )
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5681 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Transoceans 5656 Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Donald Vidrine, as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/14/2012. (cc: Robert Habans) (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 14, 2012 Filing 5680 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater Inc., and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH re 5401 MOTION to Exclude Calvin Barnhill's Opinions Regarding the Relationship Between the Spacer and the Negative Pressure Test by Defendant M-I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Barnhill Expert Report Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit B - Barnhill Deposition Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit C - Barnhill Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit D - Bourgoyne Expert Report Excerpts)(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5679 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5412 MOTION to Exclude All BOP Shear Ram Design Opinions Offered by the United States' Expert, Talas Engineering by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Reference: 10-4536)(O'Rourke, Steven) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg). Modified on 2/16/2012 - Added Sealed Exhibits (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5678 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5424 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Rory R. Davis and Others by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED - Exhibit A, # 2 SEALED - Exhibit B, # 3 SEALED - Exhibit C)(Reference: 10-4536)(O'Rourke, Steven) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg). Modified on 2/16/2012 - Added Sealed Exhibits (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5677 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5419 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Robert Bea and Dr. William Gale by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED - Exhibit A, # 2 SEALED - Exhibit B, # 3 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 1), # 4 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 2))(Reference: 10-4536)(O'Rourke, Steven) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg). (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2012: # 5 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 3), # 6 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 4), # 7 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 5), # 8 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 6), # 9 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 7), # 10 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 8), # 11 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 9), # 12 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 10), # 13 SEALED - Exhibit C (part 11), # 14 SEALED - Exhibit D) (blg). Modified on 2/16/2012 - Added Sealed Exhibits (blg). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 6 replaced on 3/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 7 replaced on 3/1/2012) (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5676 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5435 MOTION to Preclude Unreliable Opinions on the Failure of the Primary Cement Job by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED - Exhibit A, # 2 SEALED - Exhibit B, # 3 SEALED - Exhibit C, # 4 SEALED - Exhibit D, # 5 SEALED - Exhibit E)(Reference: 10-4536)(O'Rourke, Steven) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg). Modified on 2/16/2012 - Added Sealed Exhibits (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5675 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5421 MOTION to Limit Testimony of Gene Benge by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED - Exhibit A, # 2 SEALED - Exhibit B, # 3 SEALED - Exhibit C, # 4 SEALED - Exhibit D, # 5 SEALED - Exhibit E, # 6 SEALED - Exhibit F)(Reference: 10-4536)(O'Rourke, Steven) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg). Modified on 2/16/2012 - Added Sealed Documents (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5674 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoena of Donald Vidrine and Dr. Bob Winston and Opposition to Transocean's 5656 Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony by Donald Vidrine. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Reference: ALL CASES)(tsf, )
February 14, 2012 Filing 5673 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Sever and Deconsolidate by Plaintiff August Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 12-177)(Arruebarrena, James) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 14, 2012 Filing 5672 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 5426 MOTION to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Alan R. Huffman by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: 10-2771)(Frost, Peter) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5671 Request of Summons Issued as to Defendants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration and Production, Inc., Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Moex Offshore 2007, LLC, MOEX USA Corporation, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater, Inc., Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., Transocean Ltd., Cameron International Corporation, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Weatherford U.S., L.P., M-I, LLC, and Mitsui Oil Exploration Co., Ltd. filed by Plaintiffs Thanh Hai, Inc., et al re 5667 First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons BP America Production Company, # 2 Summons BP Exploration and Production, Inc., # 3 Summons Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, # 4 Summons Moex Offshore 2007, LLC, # 5 Summons MOEX USA Corporation, # 6 Summons Transocean Holdings LLC, # 7 Summons Transocean Deepwater, Inc., # 8 Summons Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., # 9 Summons Transocean Ltd., # 10 Summons Cameron International Corporation , # 11 Summons Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., # 12 Summons Weatherford U.S., L.P., # 13 Summons M-I, LLC, # 14 Summons Mitsui Oil Exploration Co., Ltd.)(Reference: 11-3180)(Kreller, Stephen) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5670 Conditional MOTION to Substitute BP Exploration & Production, Inc. for Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP as the Cross-Claim Plaintiff in Anadarko's First Amended Cross-Claims by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko E&P Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2179; 10-2771)(Dragna, James) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5669 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Cross-Claims to Rec. Doc. 388, filed in case 10-2771 by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko E&P Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading, # 3 Exhibit Blackline Markup of Proposed Amended Cross-Claims, # 4 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2179; 10-2771)(Dragna, James) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5668 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Hong Van Truong, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2766)(Kreller, Stephen) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5667 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Thanh Hai, Inc., et al. (adding plaintiffs) (Reference: 11-3180)(Kreller, Stephen) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5666 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant Cameron International Corporation re 5360 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Warning Opinions of PSC Expert Gregg S. Perkin Warning Opinions. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/15/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5665 ORDER granting 5614 Motion to Withdraw James F. McKenzie as Attorney for Gary R. Goodwin. Gary R. Goodwin d/b/a JAMIE G and OWNER OF THE MV JAMIE G; is hereby granted sixty (60) days from the date of this Order to obtain new counsel or prepare to proceed pro se. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/13/2012. (Reference: 11-1773)(blg)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5664 ORDER re 5653 Order dismissing all claims against Weatherford U.S., L.P. and Weatherford International, Inc. ORDERED that Weatherford's Motions (Rec. Docs. 5645 , 5396 , 5344 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/13/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5662 ORDER regarding Allocation of Examination Time for Dr. Kris Ravi on 2/15/2012 and 2/16/2012. Any appeal of this order must be filed no later than Monday, 2/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/10/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 13, 2012 Filing 5661 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Donald Vidrine on 2/11/2012 by Transocean . (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5660 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Dr. Bob Winston on 2/10/2012 by Transocean . (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5659 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to File Short Form Joinder in Limitation by Plaintiff Mohammad Saad and Shanab, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Short Form Joinder)(Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(Alvarez, Mekel) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5657 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 5637 MOTION to Remand; Pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 15 - A notice of submission should not be filed in this MDL. This Motion is NOT noticed for submission until ordered by the Court. (Reference: 12-67)(blg)
February 12, 2012 Filing 5656 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Donald Vidrine & Memorandum in Support by Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater Inc. and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - Trial Subpoena served on Donald Vidrine on 2-6-12, # 3 Exhibit B - Email, # 4 Exhibit C - Deposition Subpoena served on Donald Vidrine on 2-11-12, # 5 Exhibit Dn- Deposition Subpoena served on Dr. Winston on 2-10-12)(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 12, 2012 Filing 5655 ***ERROR: RE-FILED CORRECTLY AS 5656 . - MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Donald Vidrine & Memorandum in Support by Defendant. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena served on Mr. Vidrine on 2/6/12, # 2 Exhibit B - Email, # 3 Exhibit C - Subpoena served on Mr. Vidrine on 2/11/12, # 4 Exhibit D - Subpoena served on Dr. Winston on 210/12)(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 10, 2012 Filing 5663 Appeal Record on Loan to Lloyd Frischhertz re 4852 Notice of Appeal, 4854 Notice of Appeal, 4858 Notice of Appeal, 4856 Notice of Appeal, 4853 Notice of Appeal, 4855 Notice of Appeal, 4857 Notice of Appeal - 2 Volumes of Original Record as to master case 10md2179; 1 Volume as to each member case. (Reference: 10-1986, 10-3895, 10-3896, 10-3897, 10-4168, 10-4169, 11-58)(blg)
February 10, 2012 Filing 5658 Letter to Judge Shushan from BP dated 2/10/2012 regarding TIMS/eWell documents. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 10, 2012 Filing 5654 ***DEFICIENT - MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by Plaintiff Craig Michael Breland. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Reference: 10-2771)(Bonner, William) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5653 ORDER granting 5652 Sealed Document: Motion for Summary Judgment, and all claims asserted against Weatherford are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(Reference: All Cases)(gec, )
February 10, 2012 Filing 5652 MOTION for Summary Judgment on All Claims and, Alternatively, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages filed by Weatherford U.S., LP and Weatherford International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30, # 34 Exhibit 31, # 35 Exhibit 32, # 36 Exhibit 33, # 37 Exhibit 34, # 38 Exhibit 35, # 39 Exhibit 36, # 40 Exhibit 37, # 41 Exhibit 38, # 42 Exhibit 39, # 43 Exhibit 40, # 44 Exhibit 41, # 45 Exhibit 42, # 46 Exhibit 43, # 47 Exhibit 44, # 48 Exhibit 45, # 49 Exhibit 46, # 50 Exhibit 47, # 51 Exhibit 48, # 52 Exhibit 49, # 53 Exhibit 50, # 54 Exhibit 51, # 55 Exhibit 52, # 56 Exhibit 53, # 57 Exhibit 54, # 58 Exhibit 55, # 59 Exhibit 56, # 60 Exhibit 57, # 61 Exhibit 58, # 62 Exhibit 59, # 63 Exhibit 60, # 64 Exhibit 61, # 65 Exhibit 62, # 66 Exhibit 63, # 67 Exhibit 64) (Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179)(gec, ) Modified on 2/15/2012 - UNSEALED, Pursuant to 5711 Order. (blg).
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5651 ORDER granting 5349 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Reference: 10-cv-2771, 10-md-2179)(gec, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5650 ORDER granting 5347 Motion to File Under Seal Weatherford U.S., L.P. and Weatherford International, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Reference: 10-cv-2771, 10-md-2179)(gec, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5649 ORDERED that BP's objections are OVERRULED and the Magistrate Judge's Order is AFFIRMED re 5598 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court regarding 5574 Order re Jesse Gagliano's Testimony. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(Reference: All Cases)(gec, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5648 ORDERED that member case no. 11-2891, Coastal Services Group LLC v. B.P. et al is REASSIGNED AND REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Division 2) for the purpose of pretrial case management, including issuing a scheduling order, overseeing discovery, and any other preliminary matters. Parties are directed to use Magistrate Judge Wilkinson's information in the caption of future pleadings. Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(Reference: 11-2891)(gec, ) Modified on 2/10/2012 (gec, ). (NEF:SS,JCW,caa,car)
February 10, 2012 Filing 5647 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to File Short Form Joinder In Limitation by Plaintiff Hicham Khodr, Uptown Grill of Destin, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(Alvarez, Mekel) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 10, 2012 Filing 5646 ***DEFICIENT - EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Sever and De-Consolidate by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 12-177)(Arruebarrena, James) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 10, 2012 Filing 5645 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Third Supplemental and Amended Exhibit List by Defendants Weatherford U.S., L.P. and Weatherford International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179, ALL CASES)(Goodier, Glenn) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 10, 2012 Filing 5644 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Discovery Conference held on 2/10/2012. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (Attachments: # 1 Conference Attendance Record) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5643 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 5615 . ORDERED that the plaintiffs' joint 5559 MOTION in Limine to Admit into Evidence Representative Email Communication Exhibits is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART as stated within document. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(Reference: All cases)(gec, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5642 ORDERED that any responses to 5619 BP's Objections to and Appeal from 5557 Magistrate Judge's Order shall be filed no later than 2/14/2012 12:00 PM and shall not exceed 3 pages. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(Reference: All cases)(gec, )
February 10, 2012 Filing 5641 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP p.l.c., BP Exploration & Production Inc., and BP America Production Company re 5359 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Use of Extrinsic Evidence to Interpret Indemnities. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 9, 2012 Filing 5639 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Company North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc., BP America Inc., BP Holdings North America Limited, and BP plc re 4913 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (Reference: 11-274, 11-275)(Goodwin, David) Modified text on 2/10/2012 (gec, ). Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 9, 2012 Filing 5638 First Amended Phase I Trial Witness List by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL)(Beck, David) Modified text on 2/10/2012 (gec, ). Modified on 2/13/2012 (blg).
February 9, 2012 Filing 5637 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Rory Degeyter, Hilliard Doucet, Shawn Polkey . (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 2:12-cv-00067)(LaPlace, Andre) Modified text on 2/10/2012 (gec, ).
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5635 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 4506 Cameron's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Before Congress, 4515 BP's MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Introduction into Evidence of Other Governmental Reports and Documents, 4521 Transocean's MOTION in Limine to Preclude Blanket Introduction of the National Commission and Chief Counsel Reports, and 4523 Halliburton's MOTION to Exclude the National Commission Reports. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/9/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5634 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part 4512 BP's Motion in Limine to Preclude the Introduction of Evidence Regarding Prior Adverse Criminal, Civil, or Regulatory Proceedings Concerning Conduct Unrelated to the Macondo Well Incident, and 4514 BP's Motion in Limine to Preclude the Introduction of Evidence Regarding Instances of Prior Alleged Improper Conduct Unrelated to the Macondo Well Incident. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/9/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 9, 2012 Filing 5633 Letter to Judge Shushan from J. Andrew Langan dated 2/9/2012 Regarding [5324} Order of the Court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 5630 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re 5598 BP's MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5574 Order Regarding Jesse Gagliano's Testimony. (Reference: All Cases, 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/9/2012 (blg).
February 9, 2012 Filing 5629 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Ronald Sepulvado on 2/6/2012 by Transocean. (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/9/2012 (blg).
February 9, 2012 Filing 5628 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Murry Sepulvado on 2/6/2012 by Transocean. (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/9/2012 (blg).
February 9, 2012 Filing 5627 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Donald J. Vidrine on 2/6/2012 by Transocean. (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 2/9/2012 (blg).
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5625 ORDER denying as premature 4895 Halliburton's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Subsequent Remedial Measures. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/9/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5624 ORDER granting 5617 Motion to Dismiss claims of Air Comfort Company, Inc. (doc #402, 10-2771). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/9/2012. (Reference: 10-2771)(blg)
February 9, 2012 Filing 5623 Summons Re-Issued as to Defendants Mitsui Oil Exploration Co., Ltd. and Transocean Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2)(Reference: 11-3180)(blg)
February 8, 2012 Filing 5632 OBJECTIONS by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. to Records Subpoena. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 5631 OBJECTIONS by Cameron to Records Subpoena. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 5622 OBJECTIONS by BP to Records Custodian Subpoena. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 5620 Request of Summons Re-Issued as to Defendants Mitsui Oil Exploration Co., Ltd. and Transocean Ltd. filed by Plaintiffs Thanh Hai, Inc., et al re Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Mitsui Oil Exploration Co., Ltd., # 2 Summons Transocean Ltd.)(Reference: 11-3180)(Kreller, Stephen) Modified on 2/9/2012 (blg).
February 8, 2012 Filing 5619 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5557 Order Denying BP's Motion to Compel Live Appearance by Transocean President and CEO by Defendant BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/9/2012 (blg).
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5618 ORDER re Motions in Limine Regarding Evidence of Joint Investigation Report and Testimony ( 5448 Order, 5572 Order modifying doc #5448, 5608 HESI's Request for Clarification, 5610 U.S. Letter re HESI's Request for Clarification); The OTC test results and data are admissible and the testimony of Mr. Garrison is not. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/8/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 8, 2012 Filing 5617 EXPARTE/CONSENT Final MOTION to Dismiss claims of Air Comfort Company, Inc. (doc #402, 10-2771) by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771)(Saad, Elias) Modified on 2/9/2012 (blg).
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5616 ORDER granting in part, denying in part 5362 M-I's Motion in Limine to Exclude any Reference to its Related Entities or its Related Entities' Size or Financial Status; GRANTED as to the size or financial status of M-I and its related entities and DENIED as to evidence regarding Schlumberger and the cement bond log. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/8/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 8, 2012 Filing 5615 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5559 MOTION in Limine to Admit Representative E-Mail Communications filed by PSC, Plaintiffs and United States of America. Objections to R&R due by 2/9/2012 4pm. All objections and replies are limited to 2 page letter briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/8/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 5614 EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION to Withdraw James F. McKenzie as Attorney by Plaintiff Gary R. Goodwin . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-1773)(McKenzie, James) Modified on 2/9/2012 (blg).
February 7, 2012 Filing 5636 TRANSFER ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring case(s) to the Eastern District of LA to become part of MDL 2179, by Clerk MDL Panel. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5613 ORDER Regarding Press and Public Frequently Asked Questions, In connection with the trial of Phase One commencing on February 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/7/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5612 ORDER denying 5142 Halliburton's Motion to Exclude Testimony, Documents, and Other Evidence Reflecting Any Expert Opinion(s) of Fred Sabins or CSI Technologies, Inc. regarding the Macondo well. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/7/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5611 ORDER Regarding Modification of 2/7/2012 Working Group 5609 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/7/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 7, 2012 Filing 5610 Letter (e-mail) to Judge Shushan from Steve O'Rourke dated 2/7/2012 Regarding HESI's Request for Clarification of the Court's Order, Rec. Doc. 5572, Regarding Motions in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Joint Investigation Report and Testimony (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5609 ORDER Regarding Working Group Conference on Friday, 2/3/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5607 ORDERED that any response to 5598 BP's MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court as to the Order regarding Jesse Gagliano's Testimony, shall be filed no later than 2/9/2012 at 12:00 pm (noon), and shall not exceed 3 pages. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/7/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5606 ORDER VACATING 5566 Order granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Untimely Notice of Appeal; Any party wishing to file an Opposition to 5538 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Untimely Notice of Appeal, shall do so on or before 2/17/2012, at which time the Court will consider the Motion submitted for decision. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/7/2012.(Reference: 11-1480)(blg)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5603 ORDER AND REASONS denying 4813 BP's MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Introduction of Evidence Related to Settlements Among the Parties. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/7/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 7, 2012 Filing 5600 MOTION to Resume Standard Business Practices and Cease Collection of Data Created After January 31, 2012 by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Beck, David) Modified on 2/8/2012 (blg).
February 7, 2012 Filing 5599 ***ERROR: ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE. - MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Plaintiff. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Buzbee, Anthony) Modified on 2/7/2012 (blg).
February 6, 2012 Filing 5608 Request by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. for Clarification of the Court's 5572 Order Regarding Motions in Limine to Exclude Evidence of the Joint Investigation Report and Testimony. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2012: # 1 Exhibit A) (caa, ). Modified on 2/7/2012 (caa, ).
February 6, 2012 Filing 5605 Supplemental Memorandum filed by BP, in opposition of 5559 MOTION in Limine to Admit Representative E-Mail Communications. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 5604 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., in opposition of 5559 MOTION in Limine to Admit Representative E-Mail Communications. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5602 ORDER granting 5584 Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claim and related Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. and M-I LLC; dismissing as moot 2828 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/6/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES, and 10-2771)(blg)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5601 ORDER granting 5585 Motion to Withdraw Dugan Law Firm as Attorney of Record by Plaintiff Timothy R. Bingham, Jr. (doc #63945). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/6/2012. (Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(blg)
February 6, 2012 Filing 5598 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5574 Order denying 5441 Motion to bar the taking of Jesse Gagliano's deposition & to exclude use of Mr. Gagliano's testimony at trial, by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/7/2012 (blg).
February 6, 2012 Filing 5597 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5360 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Warning Opinions of PSC Expert Gregg S. Perkin Warning Opinions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List)(Reference: All Cases (including No.10-2771))(Herman, Stephen)
February 6, 2012 Filing 5596 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5595 ORDER Regarding Allocation of Time for Opening Statements and Order for Presentation of Evidence. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/6/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 6, 2012 Filing 5594 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney by Plaintiffs Mohammed E. Mohammed, doc #52838; Bibekanada Bepary, doc #49761; Betty Pierre, doc #60631; Warren Taylor, doc #52986; John Williams, doc #49765; Aaron Washington, doc #58143; Jannyn Erazo, doc #52598; and George Green, doc #52680. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Imudia, Martins) Modified on 2/7/2012 (blg).
February 6, 2012 Filing 5593 ***DEFICIENT - EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Imudia, Martins) Modified on 2/7/2012 (blg).
February 6, 2012 Filing 5588 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 5362 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Reference to M-I's Related Entities or M-I's Or Its Related Entities' Size or Financial Status. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - (excerpt from Barnhill Report), # 2 Exhibit B - (excerpt from Bea Report))(Reference: All Cases (including No. 10-2771))(Herman, Stephen)
February 6, 2012 Filing 5587 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Acceptance of Limitation Short Form Joinders filed beyond the 4/20/2011 Deadline (as to Robert Bell, doc #110114; Marlene Bell, doc #110115; Jason Thach, doc #110116; Tamitko Meardry, doc #110117; King's Pointe Marina LLC, doc #110184; Blake Monroe, doc #110208; and Greg Watson, doc #110209) by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Johnson, Jonathan) Modified on 2/7/2012 (blg).
February 5, 2012 Filing 5585 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Dugan Law Firm as Attorney of Record by Plaintiff Timothy R. Bingham, Jr. (doc #63945). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888, 10-2771)(Franco, David) Modified on 2/6/2012 (blg).
February 3, 2012 Filing 5592 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-44) FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring case SDMS 12-6 to the Eastern District of LA to become part of MDL 2179, by Clerk MDL Panel. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 3, 2012 Filing 5590 TRANSFER ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring case SDAL 11-593 to the Eastern District of LA to become part of MDL 2179, by Clerk MDL Panel. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5589 ORDER vacating Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-37) from the MDL Panel transferring case SDTX 11-3638 to the Eastern District of LA to become part of MDL 2179, by Clerk MDL Panel. (Reference: SDTX 11-3638)(blg)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5586 ORDER dismissing as moot 5141 Halliburton's Motion to Preclude Evidence Regarding Clawed-Back or Stricken Documents. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/3/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 3, 2012 Filing 5584 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claim and related Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. and M-I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 2/6/2012 (blg).
February 3, 2012 Filing 5583 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl Barbier: Final Pretrial Conference held on 2/3/2012. (Reference: all cases)(gec, )
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5582 ORDER granting 5201 Motion for Leave to File Short Form Joinders; the short forms identified in Exhibit A attached to the motion shall be considered timely filed. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/3/2012. (Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(blg)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5581 ORDER granting 5507 Motion to Allow Late Filed Short Form Joinder to be Filed as to Charles Gaddis and Gaddis Enterprises. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/3/2012. (Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(blg)
February 3, 2012 Filing 5580 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION To Allow Late Filed Short Form Joinder by Plaintiff Lois Young and Lois's Best Seafood Catering, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Peet, Alex) Modified on 2/6/2012 (blg).
February 3, 2012 Filing 5579 Response/Reply by Defendant Core Industries, Inc. to 5327 Order of Working Group Conference (Reference: 11-2745)(Soule, Scott) Modified on 2/6/2012 (blg).
February 3, 2012 Filing 5578 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Discovery Conference held on 2/3/2012. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (Attachments: # 1 Conference Attendance Record) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 3, 2012 Filing 5577 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Shuman Consulting, LP served on 1/9/2012. (Reference: 2:10-cv-02771)(Bonner, William)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5576 ORDER granting 5139 Motion to Exclude Evidence Relating to Credit on Kodiak No. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/3/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5575 ORDER Regarding Add Energy and Statoil Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/3/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5574 ORDER denying 5441 Motion to bar the taking of Jesse Gagliano's deposition & to exclude use of Mr. Gagliano's testimony at trial. BPs deadline for the appeal of this order is Monday, 2/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/3/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 2, 2012 Filing 5640 Letter to Judge Shushan from Robert R. Gasaway dated 2/2/2012 re Phase 2 Non-US, Non-State Discovery Requests. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 2, 2012 Filing 5621 Letter (e-mail) to Judge Shushan from BP dated 2/2/2012 regarding Response to the PSCs Letter Regarding The Courts 1/30/2012 Working Group Order On Confidentiality. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5591 ORDER Lifting Stay of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-42) FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring cases MDFL 12-8, NDFL 12-9 to the Eastern District of LA to become part of MDL 2179, by Clerk MDL Panel. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5572 ORDER re 5448 Order on Motions in Limine Regarding Evidence of Joint Investigation Report and Testimony. The earlier order is MODIFIED to allow the parties to use data, videos, and photographs from the testing performed by DNV. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/2/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Filing 5571 Fifth Amended Good Faith Exhibit List by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5570 ORDER granting 5217 Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Good Faith Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/2/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Filing 5569 Second Amended Exhibit List by Defendants Weatherford U.S. LP, Weatherford International, Inc. (Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179, ALL CASES)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5568 ORDER granting 5202 Motion to Withdraw 5166 Exhibit List ; granting 5202 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/2/2012. (Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179, ALL CASES)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5567 ORDER granting 5462 Motion for Confirmation of Non-Applicability of Preservation of Evidence Obligations as to Certain Non-Evidentiary Items filed by Dril-Quip, Inc. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/2/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5566 ORDER granting 5538 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/2/2012. (Reference: 11-1480)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Filing 5565 Reply Letter (e-mail) to Judge Shushan from J. Andrew Langan dated 2/2/2012 regarding Gagliano Testimony. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 2, 2012 Filing 5564 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. as to 2784 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, 5491 Judgment. (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 053L-3373048.) (Reference: 10-2454, 10-1768)(Tebbutt, Charles) Modified on 2/2/2012 (blg).
February 2, 2012 Filing 5563 AGREED STIPULATION by Defendants (Corrected). (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/2/2012 (blg).
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5562 ORDERED that 5454 BP's MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court, are OVERRULED and the 5307 Order on Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/2/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5560 ORDER Regarding the Opinions of Experts Which Are W/drawn. The orders for the use of opinions of w/drawn experts 5327 at 5-6. and 5369 are MODIFIED as provided herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/2/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 5561 Letter to Judge's Barbier and Shushan from Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. dated 2/1/2012 regarding Hearsay Objections to Trial Exhibits 151, 2731, 2964, and 1057: Email strings contained in the PSC 300. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2012: # 1 Exhibit 151, # 2 Exhibit 1057, # 3 Exhibit 2964, # 4 Exhibit 2731) (caa, ).
February 1, 2012 Filing 5559 JOINT MOTION in Limine to Admit Representative E-Mail Communications by PSC, Plaintiffs, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit TREX-00151, # 7 Exhibit TREX-01057, # 8 Exhibit TREX-02731, # 9 Exhibit TREX-02964)(Reference: All Cases (including No.10-2771))(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 2/2/2012 (blg).
February 1, 2012 Filing 5558 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Status Conference held on January 27, 2012 before Judge Sally Shushan. Court Reporter/Recorder Susan Zielie, Telephone number (504) 589-7781. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(clu, ) (Main Document 5558 replaced on 2/2/2012) (jtd).
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5557 ORDER regarding Steve Newman, as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/1/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 5555 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from Kerry J. Miller dated 2/1/2012 re to Object to PSC Sample 300. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 5553 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from R. Michael Underhill dated 2/1/2012 re Admissibility of JIT-DNV Testing Data. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 5552 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Louisiana State for proceedings held on 09/16/2011 re 5084 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 11-1106)(Marcello, Victor) Modified on 2/2/2012 (blg).
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5551 ORDER denying 5138 Halliburton's Motion to Exclude Evidence Relating to Testing of Cement Blends Using Non-Rig Samples. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/1/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 1, 2012 Filing 5550 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Louisiana State for proceedings held on 09/16/2011 re 5085 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 11-1113)(Marcello, Victor) Modified on 2/2/2012 (blg).
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5549 ORDER granting 5532 Motion to Seal Exhibits C, D, E, I, O, Q, T, U and W to 5531 Renewed Motion to Dismiss First Amended Master Complaint B3 Bundle by Defendants Nalco Company, Nalco Holdings LLC, Nalco Finance Holdings LLC, Nalco Holding Company.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 2/1/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES in Pleading Bundle Section III.B(3))(blg)
February 1, 2012 Filing 5548 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from Don K. Haycraft dated 2/1/2012 re Rule 45. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 5547 Letter to Judge Barbier & Judge Shushan from Cameron dated 2/1/2012 regarding clarification of the Court's January 26 Order Regarding motions in Limine. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 5545 Defendants' Agreed STIPULATIONS. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 5544 OBJECTIONS by United States to Phase One Trial Stipulations. (Reference: ALL CASES, 10-2771, 10-4536) (tsf, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 5543 Response/Reply by Airborne Support Inc, Airborne Support International Inc to 5327 Order re Working Group Conference. (Reference: ALL CASES IN PLEADING BUNDLE SECTION III B(3))(Mayeaux, Ben) Modified on 2/2/2012 (blg).
February 1, 2012 Filing 5542 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs Louisiana State, et al for proceedings held on 09/16/2011 re 5089 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 10-1760)(Thornhill, Tommy) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
February 1, 2012 Filing 5541 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Louisiana State for proceedings held on 09/16/2011 re 5086 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 10-2996)(Thornhill, Tommy) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
February 1, 2012 Filing 5540 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Louisiana State for proceedings held on 09/16/2011 re 5087 Notice of Appeal . (Reference: 10-2997)(Thornhill, Tommy) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-30012 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 4988 Notice of Appeal, filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-2731)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-30012 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 5087 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-2997)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-30012 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 5086 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-2996)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-30012 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 5085 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 11-1113)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-30012 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 5084 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 11-1106)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-30012 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 5081 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-1759)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-30012 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 5065 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-1757)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-30012 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 5063 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-2087)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 11-31184 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 4858 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 11-58)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 11-31183 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 4857 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-4169)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 11-31181 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 4856 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-4168)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 11-31180 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 4855 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-3897)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 11-31179 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 4854 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-3896)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 11-31178 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 4853 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-3895)(blg)
February 1, 2012 USCA Case Number 11-31172 appealed to USCA, Fifth Circuit for 4852 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff (Reference: 10-1986)(blg)
February 1, 2012 Filing 5539 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Louisiana State as to 5029 Order granting Motion to Dismiss, for reasons stated in 4845 Order. (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 053L-3370321.) (Reference: 11-1480)(Parsiola, David) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
February 1, 2012 Filing 5538 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Untimely Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Louisiana State. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1: Served Notice of Appeal, # 3 Exhibit 2: Record of Service of Notice of Appeal, # 4 Exhibit 3: Affidavit of Darin S. Britt, # 5 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-1480)(Parsiola, David) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5554 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from Kerry J. Miller dated 1/31/2012 re Clarification. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 31, 2012 Filing 5546 **DUPLICATE** Letter (email) to Judge Barbier and Judge Shushan from J. Andrew Langan dated 1/31/2012 re Clarification of 1/26/2012 Order. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, ) Modified on 2/8/2012 (caa, ).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5537 Letter (e-mail) to Judge Barbier & Judge Shushan from BP dated 1/31/2012 regarding Clarification of 1/26/2012 Order. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) Modified on 2/8/2012 (caa, ).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5536 Letter to Judge Barbier & Judge Shushan from BP dated 1/31/2012 regarding Admissibility of Certain Trial Exhibits. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 31, 2012 Filing 5535 OBJECTIONS by All Plaintiffs to Phase One Stipulations (Reference: All Cases (including No.10-2771))(Herman, Stephen)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5534 JOINT DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by All Parties re 4987 , 4988 , 5063 , 5065 , 5081 , 5084 , 5085 , 5086 , 5087 , 5089 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 10-1757, 10-1758, 10-1759, 10-1760, 10-2087, 10-2731, 10-2996, 10-2997, 11-1106, 11-1113)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5533 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Defendants Nalco Company, Nalco Holdings LLC, Nalco Finance Holdings LLC and Nalco Holding Company regarding 5531 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Master Complaint "B3 Bundle". (Reference: ALL CASES in pleading bundle III.B(3))(Heiden, Thomas) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5532 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Exhibits C, D, E, I, O, Q, T, U and W to 5531 Renewed Motion to Dismiss First Amended Master Complaint 'B3 Bundle" by Defendants Nalco Company, Nalco Holdings LLC, Nalco Finance Holdings LLC, Nalco Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES in pleading bundle III.B(3))(Heiden, Thomas) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5531 Renewed MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Master Complaint "B3 Bundle" by Defendants Nalco Company, Nalco Holdings LLC, Nalco Finance Holdings LLC, Nalco Holding Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S-1, # 22 Exhibit S-2, # 23 Exhibit S-3, # 24 Exhibit S-4, # 25 Exhibit S-5, # 26 Exhibit S-6, # 27 Exhibit S-7, # 28 Exhibit S-8, # 29 Exhibit S-9, # 30 Exhibit S-10, # 31 Exhibit S-11, # 32 Exhibit S-12, # 33 Exhibit S-13, # 34 Exhibit S-14, # 35 Exhibit S-15, # 36 Exhibit S-16, # 37 Errata S-17, # 38 Exhibit S-18, # 39 Exhibit S-19, # 40 Exhibit S-20, # 41 Exhibit S-21, # 42 Exhibit S-22, # 43 Exhibit S-23, # 44 Exhibit S-24, # 45 Errata S-25, # 46 Exhibit S-26, # 47 Exhibit S-27, # 48 Exhibit S-28, # 49 Exhibit S-29, # 50 Exhibit S-30, # 51 Exhibit S-31, # 52 Exhibit S-32, # 53 Exhibit S-33, # 54 Exhibit S-34, # 55 Exhibit S-35, # 56 Exhibit S-36, # 57 Exhibit T, # 58 Exhibit U, # 59 Exhibit V - Part 1 of 3, # 60 Exhibit V - Part 2 of 3, # 61 Exhibit V - Part 3 of 3, # 62 Exhibit W, # 63 Exhibit X, # 64 Exhibit Y, # 65 Exhibit Z)(Reference: ALL CASES in pleading bundle III.B(3))(Heiden, Thomas) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg). (Attachment 5 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 6 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 7 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 11 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 17 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 19 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 57 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 58 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg). (Attachment 62 replaced on 2/1/2012) (blg).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5530 ***DEFICIENT - First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1: Served Notice of Appeal, # 3 Exhibit 2: Record of Service of Notice of Appeal, # 4 Exhibit 3: Affidavit of Darin S. Britt, # 5 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-1480)(Parsiola, David) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5529 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Transocean Deepwater, Inc. served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5528 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Anadarko E & P Company LP served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5527 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Weatherford U.S., LLP served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5526 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Transocean, LTD served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5525 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Transocean Holding, LLC served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5524 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5523 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sperry Drilling Services served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5522 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Moex USA Corporation served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5521 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Moex Offshore 2007, LLC served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5520 SUMMONS Returned Executed; MI, LLC a/k/a MI Swaco served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5519 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Haliburton Energy Services, Inc. served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5518 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Cameron International Corporation served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5517 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP, PLC served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5516 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Products North America, Inc. served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5515 ORDER granting 5233 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney W James Singleton to be substituted in place of Stephen M. Smith for plaintiff Juan Jackson, doc #49429. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5514 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BP Exploration & Production, Inc. served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5513 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Anadarko Petroleum Corporation served on 1/24/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(Davis, Jim)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5512 NOTICE of Withdraw of Motion only as it pertains to Morten Haug Emilsen by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re 5406 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5511 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re 5454 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5307 Order on Motion for Spoliation Sanctions. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/31/2012 (blg).
January 31, 2012 Filing 5510 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Liaison Counsel and PSC re 2587 United States' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 4836 United States' Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Reference: 10-4536)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5509 ORDER granting 5282 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: 10-4536)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5508 ORDER granting 5473 Motion to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney for plaintiffs Micheline Joseph - Doc #48568, Nelson Virgil - Doc #49761, and Austin Fleurigene - Doc #48188. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5507 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION To Allow Late Filed Short Form Joinder to be Filed as to Charles Gaddis and Gaddis Enterprises by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Reference: 10-2771, 10-8888)(Peet, Alex) Modified on 2/1/2012 (blg).
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5506 ORDER granting 5457 Motion to Withdraw Jack E. De La Piedra as Attorney by Plaintiff Patricia J. Donoghue. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/13/2012. (cc: Patricia Donoghue) (Reference: 10-3093)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5505 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5107 BP's Motion in Limine to Preclude Expert Opinion Testimony Not Disclosed in the Expert's Rule 26(A) Written Report. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5500 ORDER denying 5119 BP's Motion in Limine to Bar Evidence Regarding Its Recruitment and Promotion Strategies. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5499 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5118 BP's Motion in Limine to Preclude the Use of Deposition Testimony Arising from Improper and Objectionable Questioning. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5498 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5117 BP's Motion in Limine to Exclude Privileged Communications Relating to the Scope of BP's Internal Investigation. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5496 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5115 BP's Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding BP Employee Compensation Information. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5495 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5108 BP's Motion in Limine to Bar Fact or Opinion Testimony on Issues of Law. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5494 ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for Friday, 2/3/2012, at 9:30 a.m. has been RESCHEDULED for Friday, 2/3/2012, at 8:30 a.m. This Pretrial Conference is not a public hearing in court, but intended as a chambers conference with only trial counsel to discuss logistical or other issues relating to the trial scheduled to commence on February 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5493 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 4767 Halliburton's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and 4976 BP's Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012.(Reference: 10-2771, 10-4536, 11-1054, 11-1986, and ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5492 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5110 Motion in Limine to Exclude Non-Factual Fact Witness Testimony by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc. & BP America Production Company. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Filing 5491 JUDGMENT with respect to Center for Biological Diversity v. BP, et al., Nos. 2:10-cv-02454 and 2:10-cv-01768, for the reasons stated in the Court's Order Dismissing the Bundle D1 Master Complaint (Rec. Doc. 2784 ). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/31/2012.(Reference: 10-2454, 10-1768)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5490 ORDER granting 5444 Motion for Extension of Time to Perfect Service by Plaintiffs Law Office of Jim Davis, et al. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/30/2012. (Reference: 11-2450)(blg)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5489 ORDERED that the Motions for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Rec. Doc. 5039 , 5042 , 5043 , 5054 , 5056 , 5057 , 5096 , 5099 , 5100 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/27/2012. (Reference: 11-2766, 11-2909, 11-2908, 11-2319, 11- 2549, 11-2515, 11-2501, 11-2319)(blg)
January 30, 2012 Filing 5556 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from Kerry J. Miller dated 1/30/2012 re Gagliano testimony admissibility. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 5504 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Transocean re 5441 MOTION to bar the taking of Jesse Gagliano's deposition & to exclude use of Mr. Gagliano's testimony at trial. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 5503 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Telephone Conference held on 1/30/2012 re Phase Two stipulations. Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2012 02:00 PM, as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 5502 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from Kerry J. Miller dated 1/30/2012 re Newman and Rule 45. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 5501 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re 5441 MOTION to bar the taking of Jesse Gagliano's deposition & to exclude use of Mr. Gagliano's testimony at trial. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D - H)(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2012: # 4 Exhibit B) (caa, ).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5497 Letter to Judge Shushan from Donald E. Godwin dated 1/30/2012 regarding the three points set out in Court's orde of 1/24/2012 regarding Withdrawn Experts. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 5488 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 5485 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena; This is a duplicate filing of document 5483 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 30, 2012 Filing 5487 REQUEST for Clarification of the Court's 1/23/2012 Order Regarding Withdrawn Expert Opinions by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5327 Order re Working Group Conference. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/31/2012 (blg).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5486 MOTION to Amend/Correct Pre-Trial Order No. 13 with respect to Phase One Trial (for Order Regarding Material Previously Maintained as Confidential) by Plaintiffs Steering Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit B)(Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (blg).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5485 ***ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY OF REC. DOC. 5483 . - Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Corporate Representative of BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP p.l.c., BP America Production Company, and BP North America Products, Inc. served on 1/24/2012 by Plaintiffs. (Reference: all cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (blg).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5484 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Corporate Representative of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. served on 1/28/2012 by Plaintiffs. (Reference: all cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (blg).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5483 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Corporate Representative of BP Exploration & Production, Inc., BP p.l.c., BP America Production Company, and BP North America Products, Inc. served on 1/24/2012 by Plaintiffs. (Reference: all cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (blg).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5482 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena served on Corporate Representative of Cameron International Corporation served on 1/24/2012 by Plaintiffs. (Reference: all cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (blg).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5481 AMENDED ANSWER re 4110 Answer to 1128 First Amended Master Complaint, Cross-Claim, and Third-Party Complaint for Private Economic Losses in Accordance with PTO No. 11 [CMO No. 1] Section III (B1) ["B1 Bundle"] by Defendant MOEX USA Corporation (Reference: All Cases in Pleading Bundle B1 and 10-2771)(blg)
January 30, 2012 Filing 5480 AMENDED ANSWER re 4109 Answer to 1128 First Amended Master Complaint, Cross-Claim, and Third-Party Complaint for Private Economic Losses in Accordance with PTO No. 11 [CMO No. 1] Section III (B1) ["B1 Bundle"] by Defendant MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC (Reference: All Cases in Pleading Bundle B1 and 10-2771)(blg)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5479 ORDER granting 5292 Motion to Amend/Correct; MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC and MOEX USA Corporation have leave to file Amended Answers to the B1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/27/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5476 ORDER re Working Group Conference on Friday, 1/27/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/30/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 5474 ***ERROR: DUPLICATE FILING TO REC DOC. 5473 - EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney, MOTION to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Imudia, Martins) Modified on 1/30/2012 (blg).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5473 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney for plaintiffs Micheline Joseph - Doc #48568, Nelson Virgil - Doc #49761, and Austin Fleurigene - Doc #48188 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Imudia, Martins) Modified on 1/30/2012 (blg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/30/2012) (blg).
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5472 ORDER Regarding Daubert Motions. The Daubert motions, supporting memoranda, opposing memoranda and reply memoranda shall be unsealed and/or filed unsealed. Redacted memoranda shall be not be filed. All exhibits filed with the Daubert motions and memoranda related to the motions shall remain sealed or be filed under seal pending further order of the Court. Pursuant to this order, the following motions and memoranda are unsealed. The exhibits in support of the motions shall remain under seal; 5391 , 5396 , 5398 , 5400 , 5401 , 5402 , 5404 , 5406 , 5411 , 5412 , 5413 , 5414 , 5415 , 5419 , 5420 , 5421 , 5422 , 5423 , 5424 , 5425 , 5426 , 5427 , 5428 , 5429 , 5430 , 5431 , 5432 , 5433 , 5434 , 5435 Sealed Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/30/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 30, 2012 Filing 5471 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc., Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Deepwater Inc. and Triton Asset Leasing GmbH re 5359 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Use of Extrinsic Evidence to Interpret Indemnities. (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 1/30/2012 (blg).
January 30, 2012 Filing 5470 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re Notice of Deficient Filing; re 5457 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. E-FILING IS NOT DEFICIENT, Party address information was provided on document. (Reference: 10-3093)(blg)
January 27, 2012 Filing 5478 Letter to Stephen S. Kreller from CT Corporation dated 1/23/2012, re service on defendant Mitsui Oil Exploration Co., Ltd. (Reference: 11-3180)(blg)
January 27, 2012 Filing 5475 Supplemental Memorandum by Cameron to 5327 Order re Working Group Conference. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 27, 2012 Filing 5469 OBJECTIONS by Defendants BP p.l.c., BP Exploration & Production Inc., and BP America Production Company re Other Parties' Exhibit Lists. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/30/2012 (blg).
January 27, 2012 Filing 5468 OBJECTIONS by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., re Other Parties' Live Witness Lists. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/30/2012 (blg).
January 27, 2012 Filing 5467 OBJECTIONS by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko E&P Company LP, re trial witness lists of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 5315 , the Plaintiffs 5314 , and Transocean 5318 . (Reference: 10-2771; All Cases)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 1/30/2012 (blg).
January 27, 2012 Filing 5466 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Discovery Conference held on 1/27/2012. (Court Reporter Susan Zielie.) (Attachments: # 1 Conference Attendance Record) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5465 ORDER re 5454 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5307 Order on Motion for Spoliation Sanctions; any response briefs shall be filed no later than Tuesday, 1/31/2012 at 5:00 PM and shall not exceed 3 pages. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/27/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5464 ORDER granting 5417 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all actions brought by Ronald Roshto are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/27/2012. (Reference: 11-2521)(blg)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5463 ORDER granting 5416 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that all actions brought by Denise Arnold are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/27/2012. (Reference: 10-4427)(blg)
January 27, 2012 Filing 5462 First MOTION for Confirmation of Non-Applicability of Preservation of Evidence Obligations as to Certain Non-Evidentiary Items by Defendant Dril-Quip, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum In Support of Motion for Confirmation of Non-Applicability of Preservation Obligations, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Motion for Confirmation of Non-Applicability of Preservation Obligations)(Reference: All Cases)(Barrow, C.) Modified on 1/30/2012 (blg).
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5461 ORDER granting 5452 Motion to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney by Plaintiffs Franchette Carzo(#52617), and Yves Senatus(#52948). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/27/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5460 ORDER granting 5438 Motion to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney by Plaintiffs Bernadine Dwyer(#52555), Okon Eduok(#52579), Kevin Hughes(#48204), Walner Marceus(#71046), Saint Louis Oxy(#49514) and Carl Porter(#52869). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/27/2012. (Reference: 10-8888)(blg)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5459 ORDER granting 5334 Motion to Withdraw Jerome Moroux as Attorney for Claimant Eddie Bill Brown. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/27/2012. (Reference: 10-2771)(blg)
January 27, 2012 Filing 5457 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Jack E. De La Piedra as Attorney by Plaintiff Patricia J. Donoghue. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10cv3093)(De La Piedra, Jack) Modified on 1/30/2012 (blg).
January 26, 2012 Filing 5477 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiff Louisiana State for proceedings held on 9/16/2011 re 4987 Notice of Appeal. (Reference: 10-2087)(blg)
January 26, 2012 Filing 5458 Letter to Judge Shushan from Andrew Langan dated 1/26/2012 re Duplicate 30(b)(6) topics. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 26, 2012 Filing 5456 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-43) FROM THE MDL PANEL transferring case(s) to the Eastern District of LA to become part of MDL 2179, by Clerk MDL Panel. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 26, 2012 Filing 5455 MOTION for Certificate of Interlocutory Appealability by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Becnel, Daniel) Modified on 1/27/2012 (blg).
January 26, 2012 Filing 5454 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 5307 Order on Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, by Defendant BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/27/2012 (blg).
January 26, 2012 Filing 5453 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena on Ronald Sepulvado served on Ronald Sepulvado on 1/25/2012 by Federal Government Interests.(Reference: 2:10md2179)(Underhill, R)
January 26, 2012 Filing 5452 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney by Plaintiffs Franchette Carzo(#52617), and Yves Senatus(#52948). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-8888)(Imudia, Martins) Modified on 1/27/2012 (blg).
January 26, 2012 Filing 5451 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena on Nathaniel Chaisson served on Nathaniel Chaisson on 1/26/2012 by Federal Government Interests.(Reference: 2:10md2179)(Underhill, R)
January 26, 2012 Filing 5450 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena on Leo Lindner served on Leo Lindner on 1/25/2012 by Federal Government Interests.(Reference: 2:10md2179)(Underhill, R)
January 26, 2012 Filing 5449 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena on Joseph Keith served on Joseph Keith on 1/26/2012 by Federal Government Interests.(Reference: 2:10md2179)(Underhill, R)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5448 ORDERED that BP's (Rec. Doc. 4511 ), Transocean's (Rec. Doc. 4519 ), Cameron's(Rec. Doc. 4520 ), and Halliburton's (Rec. Doc. 4522 ) motions in limine are GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/26/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5447 ORDER re Weatherford entities 5349 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, and 5347 MOTION to file under Seal - Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERED that, by Wednesday, 2/1/2012, any party that intends to oppose Weatherford's Motion for Summary Judgment shall submit to the Court a short letter stating its intent to do so. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/26/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5446 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 4477 Transocean's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and 4827 BP's Cross-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/26/2012.(Reference: 10-2771, 10-4536, ALL CASES)(blg)
January 26, 2012 Filing 5443 Update Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from Brian H. Barr dated 1/26/2012 re Rule 30(b)(6) Notices. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 26, 2012 Filing 5442 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from Michael J. Lyle dated 1/25/2012 re PSC's responses and position concerning B3 discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C) (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 26, 2012 Filing 5438 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Martins I. Imudia as Attorney by Plaintiffs Bernadine Dwyer(#52555), Okon Eduok(#52579), Kevin Hughes(#48204), Walner Marceus(#71046), Saint Louis Oxy(#49514) and Carl Porter(#52869). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: 10-8888)(Imudia, Martins) Modified on 1/27/2012 (blg).
January 26, 2012 Filing 5436 Return of Service of Trial Subpoena on Calvin Barnhill on 1/19/2012 by Transocean. (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 1/27/2012 (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5445 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from PLC dated 1/25/2012 re Rec. Doc. 5141. (Reference: ALL CASES)(tsf, )
January 25, 2012 Filing 5444 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Perfect Service by Plaintiffs Law Office of Jim Davis, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2450)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5441 MOTION to bar the taking of Jesse Gagliano's deposition & to exclude use of Mr. Gagliano's testimony at trial by BP. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) Modified on 1/31/2012 (caa, ).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5440 Letter to Judge Shushan from J. Andrew Langan dated 1/25/2012 regarding clarification of the Courts Order regarding the use of w/drawn expert opinions & reports at trial where the expert is listed on the retaining ptys witness list. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 25, 2012 Filing 5439 Letter to Judge Shushan from Brian H. Barr dated 1/25/2012 regarding deposition schedule. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 25, 2012 Filing 5437 Letter to Judge Shushan from Steve Herman dated 1/25/2012 regarding Limited B3 Discovery Track. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 25, 2012 Filing 5435 MOTION to Preclude Unreliable Opinions on the Failure of the Primary Cement Job by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5434 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Richard Strickland by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5433 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Glenn Stevick by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5432 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of David Pritchard by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5431 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Gregg Perkin by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2012: # 2 Exhibit A) (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5430 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of David O'Donnell by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5429 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Dr. Samuel Lewis by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5428 MOTION to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Dr. Andrew Hurst by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5427 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of John Hughett by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5426 MOTION to Exclude the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Alan R. Huffman by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5425 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Patrick Hudson by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5424 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Rory R. Davis and Others by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5423 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Mr. Greg Childs by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5422 MOTION to Limit Testimony of Daniel Bolado by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order.(blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5421 MOTION to Limit Testimony of Gene Benge by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5420 MOTION to Limit Testimony of Dr. Frederick "Gene" Beck by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5419 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Robert Bea and Dr. William Gale by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5418 ORDER granting 5389 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - Unredacted Motions and Memoranda by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/25/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5417 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss claims of Ronald Roshto by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 11-2521)(Itkin, Jason) Modified on 1/26/2012 (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5416 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss claims of Denise Arnold by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-4427)(Itkin, Jason) Modified on 1/26/2012 (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5415 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn Shear Ram Design Opinions Previously Offered By Halliburton's Expert, Glen Stevick by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5414 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn BOP Control System Design Opinions Previously Offered By BP's Expert, Arthur Zatarain by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5413 MOTION to Exclude Withdrawn BOP Shear Ram Design Opinions Previously Offered By BP's Expert, Forrest Earl Shanks by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5412 MOTION to Exclude All BOP Shear Ram Design Opinions Offered by the United States' Expert, Talas Engineering by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5411 MOTION to Exclude All BOP Design Opinions Offered by PSC's BOP Expert, Gregg S. Perkin by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5410 ORDER granting 5388 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - Daubert Motions and Memoranda In Support with Exhibits by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/25/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5409 Letter (e-mail) to Judge Shushan from Don K. Haycraft dated 1/25/2012 regarding brief on compelling Transocean's President & Chief Executive Officer to testify. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5408 ORDER Regarding Daubert Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/25/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5407 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5109 Motion in Limine to Exclude Phase Two Evidence from Phase One of the Trial. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/25/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5406 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports) by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5405 ORDER granting 5387 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - Daubert Related Documents (Motion to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports) by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/25/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5404 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of James P. Lang by Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC and MOEX USA Corporation. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5403 ORDER granting 5385 Motion to File Under Seal - Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of James P. Lang by Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC and MOEX USA Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/25/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5402 MOTION to Exclude Robert Bea and William Gale's Opinions Regarding the Spacer by Defendant M-I LLC. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5401 MOTION to Exclude Calvin Barnhill's Opinions Regarding the Relationship Between the Spacer and the Negative Pressure Test by Defendant M-I LLC. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Filing 5400 MOTION to Exclude L. William Abel's Opinions Regarding the Spacer by Defendant M-I LLC. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5399 ORDER granting 5384 Motion to File Under Seal - Three Daubert Motions and Accompanying Exhibits (motions to exclude certain opinions by L. William Abel, Calvin Barnhill, and Robert Bea & William Galeby) by Defendant M-I LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/25/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5398 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Report of James P. Lang by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5397 ORDER granting 5382 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Report of James P. Lang by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/25/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5396 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony Relating to the Purported Disturbance of the Cement at the Bottom of the Macondo Well by Defendants Weatherford U.S., LP and Weatherford International, Inc. (Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179)(blg) Modified on 1/30/2012 - - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg).
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5395 ORDER granting 5381 Motion to File Under Seal - Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony Relating to the Purported Disturbance of the Cement at the Bottom of the Macondo Well by Defendants Weatherford U.S., LP and Weatherford International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/25/2012. (Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5394 Response/Reply by Defendant Cameron to 5327 Order. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 25, 2012 Filing 5393 Summons Issued as to Defendant BP America Production Company. (Reference: 11-3068)(blg)
January 25, 2012 Filing 5392 Request of Summons Issued as to BP America Production Company filed by Plaintiff Michael Cure re Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Reference: 11-3068)(O'Leary, T.) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5391 MOTION to Exclude Eric Gregory Childs as an Expert filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 8, # 3 Proposed Order) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg). Modified on 1/30/2012 - Unseal, pursuant to 5472 Order. (blg). ).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5390 Letter (email) to Judge Shushan from Jimmy Williamson dated 1/24/2012 re Phase II 20(b)(6) Notice to BP. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 24, 2012 Filing 5389 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - Unredacted Motions and Memoranda by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5388 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - Daubert Motions and Memoranda In Support with Exhibits by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL)(Beck, David) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5387 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - Daubert Related Documents (Motion to Exclude Testimony of Expert Witnesses and to Strike Expert Reports) by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5386 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Defendants Moex Offshore 2007 LLC and Moex USA Corporation re 5404 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of James P. Lang . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Pritchard, John) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5385 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to File Under Seal - Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of James P. Lang by Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC and MOEX USA Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Pritchard, John) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5384 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to File Under Seal - Three Daubert Motions and Accompanying Exhibits by Defendant M-I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases and 10-2771)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5383 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP regarding 5398 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Report of James P. Lang. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5382 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal - Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Report of James P. Lang by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5381 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to File Under Seal - Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony Relating to the Purported Disturbance of the Cement at the Bottom of the Macondo Well by Defendants Weatherford U.S., LP and Weatherford International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179)(Goodier, Glenn) Modified on 1/25/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5379 Notice of Compliance by Defendants BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reference: 12-67)(Hinnigan, Emma) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5378 Summons Re-Issued as to Defendant M-I LLC. (Reference: 11-3180)(blg)
January 24, 2012 Filing 5377 Request of Summons Re-Issued as to Defendant M-I LLC filed by Plaintiffs Thanh Hai, Inc., et al re Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons M-I, LLC)(Reference: 11-3180)(Kreller, Stephen) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5374 Summons Re-Issued as to Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2)(Reference: 11-3180)(blg)
January 24, 2012 Filing 5373 Letter to J. Andrew Langan from Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel dated 1/20/2012, re BP Officers Appearing Pursuant to Subpoena Live at Trial. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 24, 2012 Filing 5372 Request of Summons Re-Issued as to Defendants Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Ltd. filed by Plaintiff Thanh Hai, Inc., et al re Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., # 2 Summons Transocean Ltd.)(Reference: 11-3180)(Kreller, Stephen) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 24, 2012 Filing 5371 Return of Service of Subpoena served on Lamar McKay on 12/15/2011 by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 24, 2012 Filing 5370 Return of Service of Subpoena served on Mark R. Bly on 11/4/2011 by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5369 ORDER Regarding Withdrawn Experts, re 5327 Order concerning the 1/19/2012 Working Group Conference. Any appeal from this ruling shall be filed by Monday, January 30. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/24/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5368 ORDER dismissing as moot re 5220 BP's objection to the use of the seven counsel-created documents as exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/24/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 24, 2012 Filing 5365 Phase One Trial Witness List by Defendants Moex Offshore and Moex USA. (Reference: 10-2771) (tsf, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 5380 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. re 5139 MOTION to Exclude Evidence Relating to Credit on the Kodiak No. 2 Well for Non-Productive Time Related to Downhole Tool Issues. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2012: # 1 Exhibit A - J) (caa, ).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5376 Letter to Stephen S. Kreller from CT Corporation dated 1/20/2012, re service on defendant M-I LLC. (Reference: 11-3180)(blg)
January 23, 2012 Filing 5367 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant re 5142 MOTION to Exclude testimony, documents, and other evidence reflecting any expert opinion(s) of Fred Sabins or CSI Technologies, Inc. regarding the Macondo well. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 5366 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE in Support of Motion to Exclude Evidence Relating to Testing of Cement Blends Using Non-Rig Samples by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, ) (caa, ).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5364 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder in and Adopt The Arguments Made in The Weatherford Entities' 5344 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(C); and Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(C) by Defendant M-I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases and 10-2771)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5363 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Punitive Damages, Gross Negligence, and Willful Misconduct Claims by Defendant M-I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases and 10-2771)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5362 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Reference to M-I's Related Entities or M-I's Or Its Related Entities' Size or Financial Status by Defendant M-I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5361 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendant M-I LLC re 5120 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Adverse Inferences Against M-I Based on Fifth Amendment Invocations by Non-M-I Witnesses. (Reference: All Cases)(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5360 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Warning Opinions of PSC Expert Gregg S. Perkin Warning Opinions by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Peppers v. Aries Marine Corp)(Reference: ALL)(Beck, David) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5359 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Use of Extrinsic Evidence to Interpret Indemnities by Defendants BP p.l.c., BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5358 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5119 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence Regarding Its Recruitment and Promotion Strategies. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5357 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5117 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Privileged Communications Relating to the Scope of BP's Internal Investigation. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5356 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5115 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding BP Employee Compensation Information. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5355 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5112 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Drawing of Adverse Inferences From Testimony in Which a Witness has Invoked the Fifth Amendment. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5354 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5118 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Use of Deposition Testimony Arising from Improper and Objectionable Questioning. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5353 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5110 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Non-Factual Fact Witness Testimony. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5352 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5109 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Phase II Evidence From Phase I of the Trial. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5351 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5108 MOTION in Limine to Bar Fact or Opinion Testimony on Issues of Law. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5350 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company re 5107 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Opinion Testimony Not Disclosed in the Expert's Rule 26(A) Written Report. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5349 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to the Proposed Memorandum in Support re 5347 Motion to file under Seal - Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Weatherford U.S., LP and Weatherford International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179)(Goodier, Glenn) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5348 OBJECTIONS to Trial Exhibit Lists by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation and Anadarko E&P Company, pursuant to 5272 Order regarding Working Group Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: All Cases)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5347 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to file under Seal - Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Weatherford U.S., LP and Weatherford International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179)(Goodier, Glenn) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5346 ANSWER to 1510 Local Government Entity Voluntary Master Complaint, Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, and BP p.l.c. (Reference: Bundle C (local govt); 10-2771)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5345 ANSWER to 1510 Local Government Entity Voluntary Master Complaint, Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint by Defendants Weatherford U.S., LP and Weatherford International, Inc. (Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179, 11-0516, 10-3059)(Goodier, Glenn) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5344 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) by Defendants Weatherford U.S., LP and Weatherford International, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10md2179 and 10-4536)(Goodier, Glenn) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5343 Joint ANSWER to 1510 Local Government Entity Voluntary Master Complaint, Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko E&P Company LP. (Reference: Bundle C (local govt); 10-2771)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5342 OBJECTIONS to Phase One Trial Exhibits by Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC and MOEX USA Corporation, pursuant to 5327 Order re Working Group Conference. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Pritchard, John) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5341 ANSWER to Tamaulipas State's First Amended Complaint by Defendants BP America Inc., BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Company North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc., BP Exploration & Production Inc., and BP p.l.c.(Reference: 10-4240)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5340 ANSWER to Quintana Roo State's First Amended Complaint by Defendants BP America Inc., BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Company North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc., BP Exploration & Production Inc., and BP p.l.c. (Reference: 10-4241)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5339 ANSWER to Veracruz State's First Amended Complaint by Defendants BP America Inc., BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Company North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc., BP Exploration & Production Inc., and BP p.l.c. (Reference: 10-4239)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5338 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on January 19, 2012 before Judge Carl J. Barbier. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number (504) 589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(clu, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 5337 TRANSCRIPT of Monthly Status Conference held on January 19, 2012 before Judge Carl J. Barbier. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number (504) 589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(clu, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 5336 ANSWER to 1510 Local Government Entity Voluntary Master Complaint, Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendant Cameron International Corporation.(Reference: Bundle C (local govt); 10-2771)(Wittmann, Phillip) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5335 Phase One Trial Witness List by M-I L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 5334 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Jerome Moroux as Attorney by Claimant Eddie Bill Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 10-2771)(Moroux, Jerome) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5333 ANSWER to 1510 Local Government Entity Voluntary Master Complaint, Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Reference: Bundle C (local govt); 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5332 ORDER Regarding Witness Lists. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/23/2012.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 5331 ANSWER to Tamaulipas State's First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Reference: 10-4240 (wrong case number on document)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5330 ANSWER to Quintana Roo State's First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.(Reference: 10-4241 (wrong case number on document)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5329 ANSWER to Veracruz State's First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.(Reference: 10-4239)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5327 ORDER re Working Group Conference on Thursday, 1/19/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/23/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2012: # 1 Deadlines) (tsf, ).
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5326 ORDER Regarding Allocation for Jesse Gagliano Depositions on February 7 and 8. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/23/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5325 ORDER Regarding 5308 PSCs Motion for Leave to Join BPs Spoliation Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/23/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5324 ORDER Regarding the PSCs Challenge to BPs Clawback Request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/23/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 5322 ANSWER to 1510 Local Government Entity Voluntary Master Complaint, Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint by Third Party Defendant M-I LLC.(Reference: All Cases and 10-2771; Bundle C (local govt))(Tanner, Hugh) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 23, 2012 Filing 5321 ANSWER to 1510 Local Government Entity Voluntary Master Complaint, Cross-Claim and Third-Party Complaint by Defendants MOEX Offshore 2007 LLC and MOEX USA Corporation.(Reference: Bundle C (local govt); 10-2771)(Pritchard, John) Modified on 1/24/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5323 Letter (email) to Judge Barbier from James Parkerson Roy and Stephen J. Herman dated 1/20/2012 re Opp Sabins - Supp Doc 5250. (Reference: ALL CASES) (tsf, )
January 20, 2012 Filing 5320 OBJECTIONS to Non-Email Exhibits Designated by Other Parties by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - MIL Code Descriptions, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reference: All Cases)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5319 OBJECTIONS to Phase One Trial Exhibit Lists by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Cameron's Objections to Phase One Trial Exhibits)(Reference: ALL)(Beck, David) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5318 Good Faith Witness List by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Deepwater Inc. (Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5317 Good Faith Phase I Trial Witness List by Defendants BP p.l.c., BP Exploration & Production Inc., and BP America Production Company. (Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5316 OBJECTIONS by Defendants BP Exploration & Production Inc., BP America Production Company, and BP p.l.c, to Trial Exhibit Lists (1-20-12) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reference: All Cases)(Haycraft, Don) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5315 Phase One Good Faith Live Trial Witness List by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Reference: ALL and 10-2771)(Godwin, Donald) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5314 Combined Phase One Witness List by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Live Witness List, # 2 Exhibit B - Depo Witness List)(Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5313 Phase One Will Call/May Call Witness List by Defendants Weatherford U.S., L.P. and Weatherford International, Inc. (Reference: 10-2771, 10md2179 (ALL CASES))(Goodier, Glenn) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5312 Phase One Exhibit Objections by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc., and Transocean Deepwater Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transocean's Phase One Exhibit Objections)(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5311 ***DEFICIENT - Return of Service of Trial Subpoena on Calvin Barnhill served on Calvin Barnhill on 01/19/2012 by Defendant.(Reference: All Cases)(Miller, Kerry) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5310 Phase I Will Call Trial Witness List by Defendant Dril-Quip, Inc. (Reference: 10-2771)(Barrow, C.) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5309 Phase I Trial Witness List by Defendant Cameron International Corporation. (Reference: 10-2771)(Wittmann, Phillip) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Filing 5308 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Joinder in and Supplement to 4799 BP's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions against HESI by Plaintiffs. Motion(s) referred to Sally Shushan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading Joinder in and Supplement to BP's Mot for Sanctions, # 2 Exhibit A - Crook Testimony, # 3 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen) Modified on 1/23/2012 (blg).
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5307 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4799 BP's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions; any appeal from this order shall be filed by Thursday, January 26, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan on 1/20/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES) (cc: Captain Englebert) (blg)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5306 ORDER granting 4997 Dril-Quip, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Against All Claims; all claims asserted against Dril-Quip, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Dril-Quip Inc.'s pending Motions to Dismiss, including those appearing at Rec. Docs. 1554 , 1902 , 2896 , 2914 , 3253 , and 3254 , are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/20/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5305 ORDER granting 5273 Joint Motion for Leave to Dismiss Cross-Claims; Dril-Quip's cross-claims against M-I are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and M-I's cross-claims against Dril-Quip are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, All Parties to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/20/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES and 10-2771)(blg)
January 20, 2012 Filing 5303 Good Faith Phase I Trial Witness List by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko E&P Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Witness List)(Reference: All Cases)(Kirby, Ky) Modified on 1/20/2012 (blg).
January 19, 2012 Filing 5304 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl Barbier: Status Conference held on 1/19/2012. The Court discussed the Center for Biological Diversity's Renewed Motion for Clarification of "D1" Order (Rec. Doc. 4371 ). Plaintiffs' Counsel Steve Herman and BP Counsel Andy Langan will report their positions to the Court on this Motion within 7 days. The Court heard oral argument on three Motions for Partial Summary Judgment regarding liability under OPA and the CWA ( 4836 , 5113 , 5103 ) The Motions were taken UNDER ADVISEMENT. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Carl Barbier. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (Attachments: # 1 Attendance Record) (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
January 19, 2012 Filing 5302 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to BP's Motion to Exclude Phase Two Evidence by Plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading Supplemental Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A - Campbell Summary (revised), # 3 Exhibit B - Dupree Summary (revised), # 4 Exhibit C - Frazelle Summary (revised), # 5 Exhibit Lynch Summary (revised), # 6 Proposed Order Granting Leave)(Reference: All Cases)(Herman, Stephen)
January 19, 2012 Filing 5301 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan: Discovery Conference held on 1/19/2012. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (Attachments: # 1 Attendance Record # 2 Telephone participants) (Reference: 10-md-2179)(car, )
January 19, 2012 Filing 5300 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Defendants Triton Asset Leasing GmbH, Transocean Holdings LLC, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling Inc. and Transocean Deepwater Inc. re 5103 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment that the Transocean defendants are not liable under OPA or the Clean WaterAct with respect to the underwater discharge of oil from the Macondo Well. (Reference: 10-4536)(blg)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5299 ORDER granting 5288 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/19/2012. (Reference: 10-4536)(blg)
January 19, 2012 Filing 5298 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant Patriot Environmental Services Incorporated.(Reference: 11-2891)(Bergin, Patrick) Modified on 1/20/2012 (blg).
January 19, 2012 Filing 5297 *** Sealed - Letter (e-mail) to Judge Shushan from J. Andrew Langan dated 1/19/2012. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa, )
January 19, 2012 Filing 5296 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. by Plaintiff Jessica Stanley. (Reference: 10-2678)