Lackey et al v. SDT Waste and Debris Services, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Tanya Lackey, Dale Nicolini, James Bold, Robert Gay, Alfred Hamilton, John Smith and Larry Swann
Defendant: SDT Waste and Debris Services, L.L.C., Sidney Torres, IV, Jason McDaniel and Henry Gonlag
Case Number: 2:2011cv01087
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Bernard
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER AND REASONS granting 301 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval. The settlement agreement is ACCEPTED, and the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm) Modified document type on 9/26/2014 (ecm).
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER AND REASONS granting 242 Motion to Excludethe Testimony of Don Strobel; granting 244 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to all Claims of Plaintiff Lester Harrison; granting in part and denying in part 245 Motion for Partial Summar y Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' FLSA Retaliation Claims; granting 246 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' StateLaw Whistleblower Claims. The only claims remaining for trial are the FLSA overtime claims and Whitaker's FLSA retaliation claim. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER AND REASONS re 203 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court of 197 Order granting leave to file 198 Amended Complaint. The Magistrate's decision is REVERSED, and the amended complaint is hereby STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm) Modified document type on 6/24/2014 (ecm).
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDERED that 202 Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions and Production of Documents in Response to Plaintiffs' Third and Fourth Requests for Production of Documents, and for Sanctions and Attorney Fees is DENIED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDERED that 175 Motion for Leave to File First Amended and Supplemental Complaint is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated herein. Plaintiffs have seven days from the issuance of this Order to file their pleading into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 158 . It is Ordered that Defendants' 122 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiffs and Request for Attorney's Fees, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm, )
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and deferring in part 34 Motion to Certify Class. Plaintiffs' request to proceed as a collective action is GRANTED, and the class is conditionally certified as requested. Plaintiffs' request for an order requiring Defendants to produce the names and current or last known addresses of potential collective action plaintiffs is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for authorization to distribute the proposed notice to potential plaintiffs is DEFERRED.. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/15/11. (ecm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lackey et al v. SDT Waste and Debris Services, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Lackey
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Represented By: Gerald James Huffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Nicolini
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Represented By: Gerald James Huffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bold
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Represented By: Gerald James Huffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gay
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Represented By: Gerald James Huffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Hamilton
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Represented By: Gerald James Huffman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Smith
Represented By: Gerald James Huffman, Jr.
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Swann
Represented By: Gerald James Huffman, Jr.
Represented By: Susan Ruth Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDT Waste and Debris Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Russell L. Foster
Represented By: Isadore Harold Koretzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney Torres, IV
Represented By: Russell L. Foster
Represented By: Isadore Harold Koretzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason McDaniel
Represented By: Russell L. Foster
Represented By: Isadore Harold Koretzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Gonlag
Represented By: Russell L. Foster
Represented By: Isadore Harold Koretzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?