Vedros v. Northrop Grumman et al

Plaintiff: Sally Gros Vedros
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Albert Bossier, Jr., Onebeacon America Insurance Company, American Employers Insurance Company, American Motorists Insurance Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Foster-Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., CBS Corporation and Maryland Casualty Company
Third_party_plaintiff: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Albert L Bossier, Jr and J Melton Garrett
Third_party_defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Cross_claimant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Albert L Bossier, Jr, J Melton Garrett, McCarty Corporation and Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Cross_defendant: Eagle, Inc., Reilly-Benton, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., CBS Corporation, Maryland Casualty Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company and American Employers Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv01198
Filed: May 20, 2011
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2015 618 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that the Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dr. Stephen Terry Kraus (Rec. Doc. 517 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Exclude Causation Opinions Regarding Ben jamin Foster Products Based on the "No Safe Level of Exposure" Theory (Rec. Doc. 518 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. At trial, Dr. Kraus may not offer specific causation testimony based on the "every exposure above backgro und" theory, or any similar theory, that Vedros's mesothelioma was caused by any particular exposure to a defendant's product or premises. Dr. Kraus may opine regarding Vedros's diagnosis of mesothelioma and issues of general causation. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
July 29, 2015 549 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 511 MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Dr. Stephen Terry Kraus Which Are Outside the Scope of Opinions Offered by Dr. Samuel Hammar ; granting in part, denying in part 516 M OTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Dr. Stephen Terry Kraus Which Are Outside the Scope of Opinions Offered by Dr. Samuel Hammar; denying as moot 539 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Plaintiff's Opposition and 548 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/29/2015.(blg)
July 1, 2015 506 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 477 Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Dr. Gail Stockman Which Are Outside the Scope of Opinions Offered by Dr. Robert Sawyer, Which Are Contrary to the Opinions of Dr. Robert Sawyer, and Which Are Contrary to Prior Rulings Already Rendered by This Court; denying as moot 501 Motion for Leave to File reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (lag)
June 25, 2015 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: denying 448 Motion to Exclude Speculative Testimony of Exposure to Benjamin Foster Products by Dr. Frank Parker; denying 484 Motion for Leave to File Reply, because proposed pleading exceeds the page limit allowed by Local Rule 7.7. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/25/15. (sek)
June 18, 2015 494 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: denying 450 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Danny Joyce; denying 451 Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dennis J. Paustenbach. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/18/15. (sek)
June 17, 2015 492 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: granting 443 Defendant Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc. (n/k/a Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, f/k/a Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc., f/k/a Avondale Industries, Inc., f/k/a Avondale Shipyards, Inc., f/k/a Avondale Marine Ways, Inc.)s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/17/15. (sek)
June 8, 2015 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: Motions for Partial Summary Judgment, 415 , 418 , 419 , 420 are GRANTED as set forth in document; FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Reply is DENIED as moot (Rec. Doc. 439). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/8/15. (sek)
April 24, 2014 341 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: denying 320 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/24/14. (sek)
March 17, 2014 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: granting in part and denying in part 217 Defendant CBS Corporation, formerly known as Westinghouse Electric Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Westinghou se based on a theory that Vedros was exposed to asbestos through turbines manufactured or distributed by Westinghouse are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Westinghouse based on a theory t hat Vedros was exposed to asbestos through micarta manufactured or distributed by Westinghouse remain unaffected by this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument, currently set for Wednesday, March 26, 2014, is CANCELLED with respect to Rec. Doc. 217. FURTHER ORDERED that all other motions pending in the above-captioned matter remain unaffected by this order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/17/14. (sek)
March 14, 2014 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 204 General Electric Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED that all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant General Electric Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that the oral ar gument, currently set for Wednesday, March 26, 2014, is CANCELLED with respect to Rec. Doc. 204. FURTHER ORDERED that all other motions pending in the above-captioned matter remain unaffected by this order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/14/14. (sek)
March 7, 2014 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that the Motions for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Avondale (Rec. Doc. 108 ) and the Avondale Interests (Rec. Doc. 109 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Avondale and the Avondale Interests based on theories of intentional tort, fraud, and conspiracy are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/7/14. (sek, )
June 15, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting 26 Motion to Stay 9 Motion to Remand to State Court pending anticipated transfer to MDL-875. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/15/2011. (rll, ) Modified on 6/15/2011 to edit doc type (rll, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vedros v. Northrop Grumman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Gros Vedros
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Anita Ann Cates
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Represented By: Gordon Peter Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: Anita Ann Cates
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Represented By: Gordon Peter Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onebeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Gordon Peter Wilson
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Employers Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Gordon Peter Wilson
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Motorists Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Gordon Peter Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Harold
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jennifer H. McLaughlin
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Harold
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Cougill
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Milazzo, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Royer
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Diane Michelle Sweezer
Represented By: Jennifer D. Zajac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Claude Alvin Greco
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Medo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By: Martin Andrew Childs
Represented By: Donald Alfred Hoffman
Represented By: Mary Ann Darr Wegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Anita Ann Cates
Represented By: David Leroy Hoskins
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Represented By: Anita Ann Cates
Represented By: David Leroy Hoskins
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: J Melton Garrett
Represented By: Anita Ann Cates
Represented By: David Leroy Hoskins
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jennifer H. McLaughlin
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Anita Ann Cates
Represented By: David Leroy Hoskins
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Albert L Bossier, Jr
Represented By: Anita Ann Cates
Represented By: David Leroy Hoskins
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: J Melton Garrett
Represented By: Anita Ann Cates
Represented By: David Leroy Hoskins
Represented By: Gary Allen Lee
Represented By: Richard Marshall Perles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Harold
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Harold
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Reilly-Benton, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Cougill
Represented By: Kenneth R. Royer
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Diane Michelle Sweezer
Represented By: Jennifer D. Zajac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Claude Alvin Greco
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Medo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By: Martin Andrew Childs
Represented By: Donald Alfred Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Sheri Sport Faust
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jennifer H. McLaughlin
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: American Employers Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?