Bayham, Jr. v Grosse Tete Well Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cary A Bayham, Jr.
Defendant: Louisiana Delta Oil Co., L.L.C., B & B Oilfield Services, Inc. and Grosse Tete Well Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv01815
Filed: July 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Iberville
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0688
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER & REASONS that the 82 Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of Louisiana Delta, Eugene Carter, and Lafourche Area Geoscience, LLC, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/20/13. (dno, )
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER & REASONS that the Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/3/12. (dno, )
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER & REASONS granting pla's 38 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying dft's 44 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/22/2012. (rll, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayham, Jr. v Grosse Tete Well Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Delta Oil Co., L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & B Oilfield Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grosse Tete Well Service, Inc.
Represented By: Elton A. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary A Bayham, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph F. Gaar, Jr.
Represented By: Lucas Scott Colligan
Represented By: Willard P. Schieffler
Represented By: Jason M. Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?