Currier v. Entergy Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roseanne M. Currier
Defendant: Steven Franklin Griffith, Jr., Oliver Trowbridge and Entergy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv02208
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER & REASONS granting in part and denying in part 184 Motion for Summary Judgment, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/18/2014. (caa)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER & REASONS granting Griffith's 112 Motion for Summary Judgment & in turn denying Currier's 132 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the same issue; Currier's request for a judgment finding that Griffith violated Rule 4.2 isD ENIED; the sole remaining claim against Griffith is thus DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDER granting Trowbridge's 146 Motion for Summary Judgment & all claims against him are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/19/2014. (caa)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER & REASONS denying 95 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/10/2014. (caa)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER & REASONS granting in part, with respect to Currier's claims against him for intentional infliction of emotional distress, fraud, negligent misrepresentation, & invasion of privacy, & denying in part, with respect to the plaintiff's civil conspiracy theory of recovery, 64 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/14/2014. (caa)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER AND REASONS granting 21 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims Against Steven F. Griffith, Jr. without prejudice. Plaintiff must plead any additional allegations against him in the amended complaint due October 11, 2013, at 5:00 p.m., as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/30/2013. (tsf)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Strike 36 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/26/2013. (gbw, )
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER AND REASONS denying 46 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Steven Franklin Griffith, Jr. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/27/2012.(blg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currier v. Entergy Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseanne M. Currier
Represented By: Donald Lucas Hyatt, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Franklin Griffith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Trowbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?