Hanover Insurance Company v. Superior Labor Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: Superior Labor Services, Inc., State National Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2011cv02375
Filed: September 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Lafourche
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER AND REASONS denying 557 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/1/2018. (Reference: 16-2490)(bwn)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER AND REASONS denying Lexington Insurance Company's 519 Motion for Summary Judgment and 529 Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/21/2018. (Reference: 14-1933, 16-2490)(clc)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER AND REASONS denying 531 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/21/2017. (Reference: 16-2490)(clc)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER AND REASONS denying 532 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/18/2017. (Reference: 16-2490)(clc)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER AND REASONS granting 472 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. FURTHER ORDERED that Great American Excess & Surplus Insurance Company's declaratory judgment action against Gray Insurance Company is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/12/2017. (Reference: 16-2490)(clc)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER AND REASONS denying 429 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/4/2017. (Reference: all cases)(cg)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER AND REASONS denying 415 Motion for Reconsideration re 347 Order on 242 Motion for Summary Judgment Finding No Duty to Defend Masse or Allied in the Underlying Adams Lawsuit. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/8/2016. (Reference: all cases)(cg) (Main Document 428 replaced on 12/8/2016 to correct footnote 1) (tsf).
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER denying 250 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 251 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that Arch's Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to its duty to defend Superior as an insured or Allied as an additional insured in t he Underlying Adams or St. Pierre Lawsuits is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Arch's Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to its duty to indemnify Superior as an insured or Allied as an additional insured in the Underlying Adams or St. Pierre Lawsuits is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Arch's Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to its duty to defend Masse as an insured or Allied as an additional insured in the Underlying Adams or St. Pier re Lawsuits is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Arch's Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to its duty to indemnify Masse as an insured or Allied as an additional insured in the Underlying Adams or St. Pierre Lawsuits is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/23/2016. (Reference: 14-1930, 14-1933)(cg)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER AND REASONS denying 376 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/26/2016. (Reference: All Cases)(bwn)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER AND REASONS granting State National's 242 Motion for Summary Judgment Finding No Duty to Defend Masse or Allied in the Underlying Adams Lawsuit and 244 Motion for Summary Judgment Finding No Duty to Defend Superior or Allied in the Underlying Adams Lawsuit AND denying State National's 243 Motion for Summary Judgment Finding No Duty to Defend Masse or Allied in the Underlying St. Pierre Lawsuit and 245 Motion for Summary Judgment Finding No Duty to Defend Superior or Allied in the Underlying St. Pierre Lawsuit, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/8/2016. (Reference: 11-2375, 14-1933) (tsf)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER AND REASONS denying Hanover's 228 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning the Duty to Defend Masse Contracting, Inc. and Allied Shipyards, Inc. as an Alleged Additional Insured, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/31/2016. (Reference: 14-1933) (tsf)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER AND REASONS denying 227 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning the Duty to Defend Superior Labor Services, Inc., and Allied Shipyards, Inc. as an Alleged Additional Insured, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/30/2016. (Reference: 11-2375) (tsf)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER AND REASONS granting Gray Insurance Company's 174 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Demand of Masse Contracting, Inc., as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/21/2016. (Reference: 14-1933) (tsf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover Insurance Company v. Superior Labor Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Ralph Shelton Hubbard, III
Represented By: Tina L. Kappen
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Labor Services, Inc.
Represented By: Paul N. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Caruso
Represented By: Peter S. Thriffiley, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?