Hughes et al v. National Football League et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Tyrone Hughes, Eric Hill, Dewana Hill, Curtis Baham, Leslie Baham, John Fourcade, Raion Hill, Maurice Hurst, Alleasia Hurst, Treverane Faulk, Rachael Faulk, Keaton Cromartie, Vince Buck, Erika Buck, Charles Commiskey and Tyrone Legette
Defendant: National Football League, Riddell, Inc, All American Sports Corporation and Riddell Sports Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00459
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2012 8 Receipt of transferred case by USDC, EDPA. (gbw, )
March 13, 2012 7 Order of MDL Transfer to Eastern District of PA. MDL case number is 2323. certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent as requested. (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal Letter)(gbw, )
March 8, 2012 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; All American Sports Corporation served on 3/5/2012, answer due 3/26/2012. (Oufnac, Kevin)
March 8, 2012 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Riddell Sports Group, Inc. served on 3/5/2012, answer due 3/26/2012. (Oufnac, Kevin)
March 8, 2012 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order to MDL regarding MDL 2323. (gbw, )
February 23, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to All American Sports Corporation, National Football League, Riddell Sports Group, Inc., Riddell, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Riddell Inc, # 2 Summons All American Sports Corp, # 3 Summons Riddell Sports Group Inc)(gbw, )
February 22, 2012 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (cl, )
February 17, 2012 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053L-3393614) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Dugan, James) Modified on 2/23/2012 (gbw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes et al v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Sports Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riddell Sports Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Hughes
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hill
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewana Hill
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Baham
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Baham
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fourcade
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raion Hill
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Hurst
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alleasia Hurst
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treverane Faulk
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Faulk
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keaton Cromartie
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vince Buck
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Buck
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Commiskey
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Legette
Represented By: Allan Berger
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Andrew J. Geiger
Represented By: Norman F. Hodgins, III
Represented By: Kevin Lester Oufnac
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?