Premium Hospitality, L.L.C. et al v. Astra Capital Funding et al

Plaintiff: Premium Hospitality LLC, Kajal, Inc. and Ashok Patel
Defendant: World Trade Holdings, LLC, Fidelity National Title Company, BP Communications LTD, Astra Wealth Management NA, Inc., Astra Capital Funding, John Burton Ramsey and Sandeep Nagin Patel
Case Number: 2:2012cv00779
Filed: March 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/28/14. (jjl)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER AND REASONS denying 63 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/6/2014. (cms, )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER & REASONS re granting in part and denying in part Defendant Fidelity National Title Company's ("Fidelity") 29 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6) 29 : for the reasons stated, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fidelity&# 039;s "Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule12(b)(6)" is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Fidelity for breach of fiduciary duty and failure to perform due diligence are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/19/2013. (rll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premium Hospitality, L.L.C. et al v. Astra Capital Funding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Trade Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Communications LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Wealth Management NA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Capital Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Burton Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandeep Nagin Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premium Hospitality LLC
Represented By: James Austin Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kajal, Inc.
Represented By: James Austin Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashok Patel
Represented By: James Austin Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?