84 Lumber Company v. F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: 84 Lumber Company
Defendant: F. H. Paschen, S. N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC, Continental Casualty Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America and Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 2:2012cv01748
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER AND REASONS regarding 324 Motion for Attorney Fees and 326 Motion to Alter Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Paschen's motion for attorney's fees and 84 Lumber's motion to alter or amend final judgment. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/27/2018. (cg)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER AND REASONS granting 314 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Paschen's motion for voluntary dismissal. Paschen's claim against J&A is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/19/2018. (cg)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER AND REASONS denying 295 and 298 Motions Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/14/2017. (cg)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 272 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Court GRANTS defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings with respect to the June 2012 statements of claim. The Court DENIES defendants' motion with respect to the November 2011 statement of claim. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/14/2017. (cg)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER AND REASONS granting 269 Paschen's motion for judgment on the pleadings. J & A's breach of contract counterclaim is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/8/2017. (cg)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER AND REASONS - For the foregoing reasons, J & A's motion to appeal the Magistrate Judge's decision 267 is DENIED. 84 Lumber's motion to strike J & A's appeal 268 is DENIED AS MOOT. 84 Lumber's motion to strike a portion of J & A's answer 260 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/1/2017. (cg)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER & REASONS granting 220 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/16/2017. (mmm)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER AND REASONS - the Court GRANTS Fidelity's motion for partial summary judgment and DISMISSES Paschen's claims against Fidelity that arise out of the breach of Paschen's subcontract with J & A. The Court also GRANTS Fidelity's motion for judgment on the pleadings and DISMISSES Paschen's claim against Fidelity arising out of 84 Lumber's breach of its subcontract with J & A.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/3/17. (jjs)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER AND REASONS - the Court GRANTS 84 Lumber's and Maggie's Management's motion 134 to re-open this case and to dismiss J & A's claims against them. The Court ORDERS that J & A's claims against 84 Lumber and Maggie's Management are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. The Court further ORDERS that the stay imposed by the Court's July 24, 2013 order is hereby lifted. The Court further ORDERS that a status conference will be held on Thursday, Ju ne 9, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in the Chambers of United States District Judge Sarah S. Vance, 500 Poydras Street, C-25 in New Orleans, Louisiana. Counsel for all parties are instructed to attend in person. Status Conference set for 6/9/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Sarah S. Vance.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/5/16.(jjs)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER AND REASONS denying 94 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 03/25/2014. (kac)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER AND REASONS granting 87 Motion to Set Deadline to Initiate Arbitration. Arbitration must commence no later than May 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 03/25/2014. (kac)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER AND REASONS denying 72 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 11/12/2013. (kac, )
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER AND REASONS granting 44 Motion to Compel Arbitration; granting 54 Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying 54 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 07/24/2013. (kac, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 84 Lumber Company v. F.H. Paschen, S.N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 84 Lumber Company
Represented By: Mark Wayne Frilot
Represented By: Beatriz Quintana Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. H. Paschen, S. N. Nielsen & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?