Seals v. Shell Oil Company et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Seals
Defendant: Shell Oil Company and Keiwit Offshore Services, Ltd
Movant: Danos & Curole Marine Contractors, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01983
Filed: August 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 33:0905
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER finding as moot 125 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/30/14. (jrc)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Defendant submit a final protective order consistent with this order. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/5/2013.(my, )
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDERED that 64 Motion to Compel Production of Subpoenaed Documents from Danos & Curole, Inc. is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDERED that 20 Motion to Quash or Modify Deposition and Subpoena Duces Tecum is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Expedited Hearing ; granting 6 Motion to Quash Deposition and Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/17/2012. (gbw, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seals v. Shell Oil Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Seals
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keiwit Offshore Services, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Danos & Curole Marine Contractors, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert B. Acomb, III
Represented By: Robert Seth Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?