XL Specialty Insurance Company v. Bollinger Shipyards, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C. and Halter Bollinger Joint Venture, LLC
Consol_plaintiff: Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C. and Halter Bollinger Joint Venture, LLC
Consol_defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company and Continental Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv02071
Filed: August 13, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2015 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING 250 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AIG Claims, Inc., Illinois National Insurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, DENYING 254 MOTION for Summary Judgment file d by Bollinger Shipyard, Inc., Halter Bollinger Joint Venture, LLC, Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., and MOOTING 220 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AIG Claims, Inc., Illinois National Insurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company. The Court dismisses Illinois National, AmericanInternational, and AIG from the case.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/26/15.(Reference: 12-2167, 12-2098, 14-1377)(jjs)
October 31, 2014 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying Bollinger's cross- motion 88 for Summary Judgment; granting XL's motions 142 146 for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot XL's motion 197 to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/31/14. (Reference: ALL CASES)(jjs)
October 22, 2014 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 215 MOTION to Remand filed by Bollinger Shipyard, Inc., Halter Bollinger Joint Venture, LLC, Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C. and finding as moot 216 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Willis Of Louisiana, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/22/14.(Reference: 14-1377)(jjs)
July 15, 2014 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS overruling XL's objections 195 to Judge Wilkinson's ruling 190 on its motion for a protective order.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/15/14. (Reference: ALL CASES)(NEF: Mag 2)(jjs)
May 22, 2014 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS overruling Bollinger's objections 169 to Judge Wilkinson's ruling on its motion to compel. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/21/14. (Reference: ALL CASES) (NEF: Mag 2)(jjs)
March 13, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS - DENYING Bollinger's Motion 111 to Alter or Amend the Court's earlier order and GRANTING summary judgment in favor of National Union and Chartis. National Union and Chartis are dismissed from this case. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/13/14.(Reference: 12-2167)(jjs, )
January 27, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS ON MOTION. XL's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions for Failure to Comply with my August 7, 2013 Order, Record Doc. No. 98, was taken under advisement following oral argument on January 15, 2014. Having considered the record, t he applicable law and the written and oral representations of counsel, IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DISMISSED AS MOOT IN PART, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth herein. IT IS ORDERED that, no later than February 24, 2014, Bollinger must provide XL with all additional written discovery responses, privilege logs and document code identification information required by this order, together with actual production of all additional non-privileged responsive materials, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/24/14. (Reference: ALL CASES)(tbl)
January 3, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 76 Motion by Bollinger for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/3/14. (Reference: 12-2167)(jjs, )
June 24, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/24/13. (Reference: 12-2098)(jjs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XL Specialty Insurance Company v. Bollinger Shipyards, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carmelite M. Bertaut
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Bridger
Represented By: Mark Lynn Clark
Represented By: Kenneth D. Engerrand
Represented By: Abigayle Clary McDowell Farris
Represented By: Francis I. Spagnoletti
Represented By: David S. Toy
Represented By: Michael A. Varner
Represented By: Phillip A. Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halter Bollinger Joint Venture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Bollinger Shipyards, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Seth Reich
Represented By: Michael T. Wawrzycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert Seth Reich
Represented By: Michael T. Wawrzycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Halter Bollinger Joint Venture, LLC
Represented By: Robert Seth Reich
Represented By: Michael T. Wawrzycki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Carmelite M. Bertaut
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Bridger
Represented By: Mark Lynn Clark
Represented By: Kenneth D. Engerrand
Represented By: Abigayle Clary McDowell Farris
Represented By: Francis I. Spagnoletti
Represented By: David S. Toy
Represented By: Michael A. Varner
Represented By: Phillip A. Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: John F. Emmett
Represented By: Jordan Nichole Teich
Represented By: Randolph J. Waits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?