Jack W. Harang, APLC v. Schwartz
Plaintiff: Jack W. Harang, APLC
Defendant: Newton B. Schwartz, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00058
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER denying 323 Motion for Leave to File; denying 341 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jjl)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER and REASONS that Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of Courts Order and Reasons with Regard to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine (Rec. Doc. 281) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/20/2014. (cms)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER denying 254 Motion to Strike ; denying 255 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Newton B. Schwartz's "Cross-Motion for 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1927 Sanctions" (Rec. Doc. 132). After considering the motion, the memoranda in support, the memorandum in opposition, the record, and the applicable law, as set forth in document, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Cross-Motion for Sanction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/27/2014. (rll, )
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER & REASONS: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 167) Motion for Summary Judgment; for the reasons set forth herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/16/2013. (rll, )
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER & REASONS re dft Newton B. Schwartz, Sr.'s 82 Application for Interlocutory Appeal Per 28 USC 1292(b) wherein Defendant requests leave to file an interlocutory appeal before the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit to ch allenge this Court's Order and Reasons entered on July 25, 2013, which affirmed the magistrate judge's order denying Defendant leave to file certain counterclaims and join third parties: for the reasons stated, IT IS ORDERED that dft's 82 Applcation for Interlocutory Appeal Per 28 USC 1292(b) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/29/2013. (rll, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack W. Harang, APLC v. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton B. Schwartz, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack W. Harang, APLC
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?