Doe v. Holy See et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Mark Anthony Broussard, Glen J. Provost, Holy See, Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans, Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles and Gregory M. Aymond
Case Number: 2:2013cv00128
Filed: January 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605 Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act of 1976
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER & REASONS denying 120 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/11/2014. (caa)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER & REASONS granting 92 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, w/out prejudice to the pla being permitted to attempt service w/in 45 days; denying 95 Motion for limited discovery; & granting 100 Motion to Stay discovery, but the stay may be lifted if a supported request is timely filed, fully briefed, & granted by the Court. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/2/2014. (caa)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER & REASONS denying 69 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/9/2013. (caa, )
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER & REASONS granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/24/2013. (caa, )
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER & REASONS granting 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Punitive Damages & 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/24/2013. (caa, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Holy See et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Anthony Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen J. Provost
Represented By: Gilbert Hennigan Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of New Orleans
Represented By: Ralph Joseph Aucoin
Represented By: Richard Arthur Bordelon
Represented By: Dwight C. Paulsen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society of the Roman Catholic Church of the Diocese of Lake Charles
Represented By: Gilbert Hennigan Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory M. Aymond
Represented By: Ralph Joseph Aucoin
Represented By: Richard Arthur Bordelon
Represented By: Dwight C. Paulsen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Andre Phillip LaPlace
Represented By: Felecia Y. Peavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?