Paternostro et al v. Choice Hotels International Services Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Angela Paternostro, Mercedes Paternostro and Robyn Ortego
Defendant: Century Wilshire, Inc., Daniel J Gaul, Century Surety Company, Choice Hotels International Services Corp. and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2013cv00662
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER & REASONS - Before the Court are three Rule 12 Motions to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Class Action Allegations filed by the following defendants: Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s 562 Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaint iffs' Class Action Allegations; Century Wilshire, Inc.'s 563 Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Class Action Allegations and Allied World National Assurance Company, American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, A IG Specialty Insurance Company, Merchants National Insurance Company, National Surety Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, and Scottsdale Insurance Company's 566 Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Class Action Allegat ions. The Court finds that the Plaintiffs have failed to satisfy their burden under Rule 23(b)(1) or (2). Therefore, the court need not address the threshold requirements of Rule 23(a). Defendants' motions to strike the class allegations (R. Docs. 562, 563, 566) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/27/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER & REASONS that the Joint 572 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court will limit the number of Plaintiffs' proposed 30(b)(6) depositions to ten organizations that held meetings or conventions at the Hotel and booked rooms at the Hotel during the relevant time period, which is from January 1, 2012 through January 31, 2013. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/3/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Choice and CWI's 479 and 482 motions for joinder are GRANTED in that they adopt the arguments of Century Surety's motion for partial summary judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Century Surety's 475 and 528 motions for partial summary judgment are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that AIG's 476 motion for summary judgment regarding the First AIG Policy is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/3/2015.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER & REASONS that IT IS ORDERED that Allied Worlds motion to reconsider, 427 , is DENIED, as re-explained and clarified herein; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CWI and Choice's motions to reconsider, 435 , 436 are DENIED, as re-explained an d clarified herein; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scottsdale's motion to reconsider, 437 , is DENIED, as re-explained and clarified herein; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Century Surety's motion to dismiss the crossclaim/counterclaim of CWI, [3 04], is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Allied World's motion to dismiss the crossclaim of CWI, 343 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lexingtons motion for a 54(b) judgment, 438 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ACE's motion for a 54(b) judgment, 443 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/4/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER & REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Allied World's motion to dismiss and strike, 148 , is GRANTED IN PART insomuch as the First Allied Policy does not cover the injuries that allegedly occurred during its Policy Period, and is OTHERWISE DEN IED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Choice's motion to dismiss, 192 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Choice's motion for partial summary judgment on prescription, 193 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Choice's motion for partial summary judgment on class claims, 216 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that CWI's motion to dismiss, 251 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Allied World's motion to dismiss cross-claims, 254 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that CWI's motion for partial summary judgment on indemnity, 255 , is CONTINUED WITHOUT DATE and the parties shall move to re-notice this motion for submission when appropriate; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Allied World's motion to d ismiss cross-claims, 257 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scottsdale's motion to dismiss, 259 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that National Surety's motion to dismiss and strike, 260 , is GRANTED IN PART insomuch as the Firs t National Surety Policy does not cover the injuries that allegedly occurred during its Policy Period, and is OTHERWISE DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Scottsdale's motion to strike, 261 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Century Sure ty's motion for judgment on the pleadings and to strike, 263 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ACE's motion to dismiss on grounds of prescription, 264 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Century Surety's motion for judgm ent on the pleadings, 265 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Merchant's motion to dismiss, 268 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Merchant's motion to strike, 269 , is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ACE's motion to d ismiss for failure to state a claim, 270 , is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ohio Casualty's motion to dismiss, 272 , is GRANTED IN PART insomuch as the First Ohio Casualty Policy does not cover the injuries that allegedly occurred du ring its Policy Period, and is OTHERWISE DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that American Guarantee's motion for judgment on the pleadings, 287 , is GRANTED IN PART insomuch as the First American Guarantee Policy does not cover the injuries that allegedly occurred during its Policy Period, and is OTHERWISE DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lexington's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, 305 , is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/14/14. (Reference: All Cases) (dno)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paternostro et al v. Choice Hotels International Services Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Paternostro
Represented By: Kyle T. Del Hierro
Represented By: D. Douglas Howard, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Pedersen
Represented By: Ronnie Glynn Penton
Represented By: Shawn C. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Paternostro
Represented By: Kyle T. Del Hierro
Represented By: D. Douglas Howard, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Pedersen
Represented By: Ronnie Glynn Penton
Represented By: Shawn C. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Ortego
Represented By: Kyle T. Del Hierro
Represented By: D. Douglas Howard, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Pedersen
Represented By: Ronnie Glynn Penton
Represented By: Shawn C. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Wilshire, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh Fontenot Groves
Represented By: Keely Yoes Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J Gaul
Represented By: Leigh Fontenot Groves
Represented By: Keely Yoes Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Briard
Represented By: Celeste D. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International Services Corp.
Represented By: Lottie Lynn Bash
Represented By: Annalynn S. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?