Hill et al v. New Orleans City et al

Plaintiff: Darrin Hill and Marie Hill
Defendant: New Orleans City, Ronal Serpas, Arnesta Taylor, Cathey Carter, Allen Gressert, Antoine Saacks, Jr, Joseph Hebert, Howard Lewis, Robert Haar, Daniel Waguespack and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2013cv02463
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2016 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' "Motion for Sanctions and to Strike Defendant Cathey Carter's Motion for Reconsideration" Rec. Doc. 136 is DENIED and Defendants' "Motion for Leave to Supplement the Re cord" Rec. Doc. 165 is GRANTED, subject to the parties' ability to conduct further discovery on the contested issue; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Carter's "Motion for Reconsideration" Rec. Doc. 135 is DENIED and all pending motions regarding continuing the submission of this motion Rec. Docs. 170 , 172 are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/8/2016. (mmv)
January 13, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/12/2015. (ijg)
September 24, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 41 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/24/14. (plh) Modified doc type on 9/24/2014 (plh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Hill
Represented By: Nick J. Brustin
Represented By: Emma Freudenberger
Represented By: Stephen J. Haedicke
Represented By: Aaron Scherzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Hill
Represented By: Nick J. Brustin
Represented By: Emma Freudenberger
Represented By: Stephen J. Haedicke
Represented By: Aaron Scherzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronal Serpas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnesta Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathey Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Gressert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Saacks, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?