Hoffman et al v. Bailey
Plaintiff: Peter Hoffman and Susan Hoffman
Defendant: David Bailey
Case Number: 2:2013cv05153
Filed: July 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assualt,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Hoffman's 139 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (FRCP 56) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted in part to the extent that the element of publication to a third party is admitted. The motion is denied in part as to the remaining issues raised by Hoffman, including: (1) if Bailey's words were defamatory per se; (2) fault; (3) falsity; (4) conditional privilege; (5) presumed damages; and (6) punitive damages. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/20/2017. (jls)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDERED that Hoffmans' 109 Motion Seeking Award of Attorney Fees to Plaintiff as Prevailing Party Re: Order of January 27, 2014 [DKT. 38] (LaCCP ART. 971(B)) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/16/2017. (cms)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Hoffmans' 111 Motion to Strike Certain Paragraphs and Referenced Exhibits of Bailey's Counterclaim and For Sanctions Against Defendants David Bailey and Attorneys Barry Goldin and Daniel Carr Re: Violation of 26 U.S.C. Sections 6103(a) and 7213(a)(3) (FRCP 12(f)) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/12/2017. (mmv)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Hoffmans' 96 Motion to Dismiss Defendant David Bailey's Counterclaim [FRCP 12(b)(6)] is GRANTED. Bailey's 98 counterclaim pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1514A is dismissed, while Bailey's countercla im for malicious prosecution is dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Hoffmans' 110 Special Motion to Strike Defendant David Bailey's Counterclaim and Seventh Affirmative Defense (LaCCP ART. 971) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/26/2017. (mmv)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 80 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 43 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/22/15. (jrc)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 22 Motion to Strike lifting stay on discovery. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman et al v. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Hoffman
Represented By: William John Wegmann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen H. Kupperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?