J&J Sports Productions, Inc v. Evolution Entertainment Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Defendant: Brent D Tigler, Evolution Entertainment Group, LLC, Joseph Delandro Lewis and Dwayne Thomas
Case Number: 2:2013cv05178
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605 Theft of Satellite Communications
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 43 . ORDERED that Plaintiff's 41 motion for attorneys fees and court costs is GRANTED. Defendants, Evolution Entertainment Group, LLC and Dwayne Thomas are to pay to Plaintiff, J&J Sports Productions, Inc., $5,558.00 in reasonable attorneys fees plus $400.00 in costs.Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/12/2014.(my)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 31 second summary judgment motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's 47 U.S.C. § 605(a) claim against Defendant Evolution and Defendant Thomas and DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. Plaintiff&# 039;s claims against Defendant Tigler are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the issue of costs and reasonable attorneys' fees is REFERRED to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for a report and recommendation. Because this Order and Reasons resolves all claims in this case, the trial presently scheduled to begin on August 18, 2014 is canceled. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/12/2014. (bwn)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AND REASONS denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff may re-file a summary judgment motion addressing the deficiencies discussed herein on or before Monday, July 28, 2014. Any Defendant may file an opposition to a renewed summary judgment motion before Monday, August 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc v. Evolution Entertainment Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent D Tigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evolution Entertainment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Delandro Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Represented By: Ronnie J. Berthelot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?