Board of Commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority - East et al v. Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Board of Commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority - East, Orleans Levee District, Lake Borgne Basin Levee District and East Jefferson Levee District
Defendant: Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, Alta Mesa Services, LP, Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, Apache Corporation, Atlantic Richfield Company, Bepco, LP, Boardwalk Pipeline Partners, LP, Bopco, LP, BP America Production Company, BP Oil Pipeline Company, Callon Offshore Production Inc, Callon Petroleum Company, CasKids Operating Company, Castex Energy Inc, Cemex, Inc., Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp., Chevron Pipeline Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chroma Operating, Inc., Clayton Williams Energy, Inc., Clovelly Oil Co., LLC, Coastal Exploration and Production, LLC, Collins Pipeline Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Continental Oil Company, Cox Operating, L.L.C., Crawford Hughes Operating Company, Crosstex LIG LLC, Dallas Exploration, Inc., Davis Oil Company, Devon Energy Production Co. LP, Energen Resources Corporation, Enteprise Intrastate, LLC, EOG Resources Inc, EP Energy Management, LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Pipeline Company, Flash Gas & Oil Northeast, Inc., Graham Royalty, Ltd., Greka AM Inc, Gulf Production Company, Inc., Gulf South Pipeline Co. LP, Harvest Oil & Gas, LLC, Helis Energy, LLC, Helis Oil & Gas Company, LLC, Hess Corporation, Hilliard Oil & Gas, Inc., HKN, Inc., Integrated Exploration & Production, LLC, J.C. Trahan Drilling Contractor, Inc., J.M. Huber Corp., Kenmore Oil Co., Inc., Kewanee Industries, Inc., Kilroy Company of Texas, Inc., Koch Exploration Company, LLC, Koch Industries Inc, Liberty Oil & Gas Corp, LLOG Exploration Company, Manti Operating Company, Marathon Oil Company, McMoRan Exploration Company, Moem Pipeline, LLC, Mosbacher Energy Company, Murphy Exploration and Production Company, Natural Resources Corp. of Texas, Newfield Exploration Gulf Coast, LLC, Noble Energy, Inc., O'Meara, LLC, ORX Resources, LLC, P.R. Rutherford, Placid Oil Company, Plains Pipeline, LP, PXP Producing Co, LLC, Republic Mineral Corp., Ripco, LLC, Rozell Operating Co., S. Parish Oil Company, Inc., Seneca Resources Corporation, Shell Oil Co.,, Source Petroleum, Inc., Southern Bay Energy, LLC., Southern Natural Gas Co., LLC, Sun Oil Company, Sundown Energy LP, Union Oil Company of California, Vintage Petroleum, LLC, White Oak Operating Co., LLC., Whiting Oil & Gas Corp., Williams Exploration Co., Yuma Exploration and Production Co., Inc., BHP Billiton Petroleum KCS Resources, LLC, BP Pipelines North Amcerica, Inc, Statoil Exploration US Inc, Meridian Resource & Exploration, LLC, Pickens Co., Inc, William G Helis, Louisiana Land and Exploration Company, LLC Maryland and Kaiser-Francis Oil Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv05410
Filed: August 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting 427 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDERED that all of Plaintiff's claims against defendant P.R. Rutherfordare DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant P.R. Rutherford's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Ex Parte Motion for Hearing are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/10/2014. (cms)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER & REASONS denying plas' 70 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (bbc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority - East et al v. Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Commissioners of the Southeast Louisiana Flood Protection Authority - East
Represented By: Brent Bennett Barriere
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: J. Rock Palermo, III
Represented By: Ashley E. Philen
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reichard
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: J. Michael Veron
Represented By: Alonzo P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orleans Levee District
Represented By: Brent Bennett Barriere
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: J. Rock Palermo, III
Represented By: Ashley E. Philen
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reichard
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: J. Michael Veron
Represented By: Alonzo P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Borgne Basin Levee District
Represented By: Brent Bennett Barriere
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: J. Rock Palermo, III
Represented By: Ashley E. Philen
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reichard
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: J. Michael Veron
Represented By: Alonzo P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Jefferson Levee District
Represented By: Brent Bennett Barriere
Represented By: Turner Duvall Brumby
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Eberhard D. Garrison
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: J. Rock Palermo, III
Represented By: Ashley E. Philen
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reichard
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: J. Michael Veron
Represented By: Alonzo P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC
Represented By: Ewell E. Eagan, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence Kent Knister
Represented By: James D. Rhorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Mesa Services, LP
Represented By: Francis V. Liantonio, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. O'Brien
Represented By: Jane C. Raiford
Represented By: Gregory Fortier Rouchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Represented By: Joe B. Norman
Represented By: Kathryn M. Zainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bepco, LP
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Represented By: Jane Jackson
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boardwalk Pipeline Partners, LP
Represented By: Ewell E. Eagan, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence Kent Knister
Represented By: James D. Rhorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bopco, LP
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Represented By: Jane Jackson
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Represented By: Joe B. Norman
Represented By: Kathryn M. Zainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Oil Pipeline Company
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Represented By: Joe B. Norman
Represented By: Kathryn M. Zainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callon Offshore Production Inc
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Percy Tadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callon Petroleum Company
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Percy Tadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CasKids Operating Company
Represented By: Evan J. Godofsky
Represented By: Morgan J. Wells, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castex Energy Inc
Represented By: Julie E. Deshotels
Represented By: Ashley Stelly Green
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Represented By: Jane Jackson
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cemex, Inc.
Represented By: Ernest Aloysius Burguieres, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Pipeline Company
Represented By: Linda Sarradet Akchin
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Linda Sarradet Akchin
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chroma Operating, Inc.
Represented By: Emile Joseph Dreuil
Represented By: Gerald F. Slattery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Williams Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen D. Baker
Represented By: Robert Michael Kallam
Represented By: Jennifer A. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clovelly Oil Co., LLC
Represented By: M. Taylor Darden
Represented By: Matthew James Fantaci
Represented By: Stephen P. Scullin
Represented By: Robert Spier Stassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Exploration and Production, LLC
Represented By: Todd G. Crawford
Represented By: John Steven Garner
Represented By: John A. Scialdone
Represented By: Michael J Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins Pipeline Company
Represented By: Michael P. Cash
Represented By: Robert B. McNeal
Represented By: Jamie D. Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Oil Company
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Operating, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford Hughes Operating Company
Represented By: Evan J. Godofsky
Represented By: Morgan J. Wells, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosstex LIG LLC
Represented By: Cliff LaCour
Represented By: Ben Louis Mayeaux
Represented By: Kevin Paul Merchant
Represented By: Francis Xavier Neuner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Exploration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Co. LP
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Percy Tadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energen Resources Corporation
Represented By: Gerald F. Slattery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enteprise Intrastate, LLC
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Percy Tadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources Inc
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Percy Tadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EP Energy Management, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Glen Marion Pilie
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Richardson
Represented By: Martin Alan Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Pipeline Company
Represented By: Michael P. Cash
Represented By: Robert B. McNeal
Represented By: Jamie D. Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flash Gas & Oil Northeast, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Royalty, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greka AM Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Production Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf South Pipeline Co. LP
Represented By: Ewell E. Eagan, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence Kent Knister
Represented By: James D. Rhorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvest Oil & Gas, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Goodwine
Represented By: Colleen Carr Jarrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helis Energy, LLC
Represented By: Edward D. Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Parker
Represented By: Erin B. Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helis Oil & Gas Company, LLC
Represented By: Edward D. Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Parker
Represented By: Erin B. Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Jonathan A. Hunter
Represented By: Joseph E. LeBlanc, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilliard Oil & Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Alida C. Hainkel
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Carl David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKN, Inc.
Represented By: Jane Jackson
Represented By: Terrence Kent Knister
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Exploration & Production, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Trahan Drilling Contractor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Huber Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenmore Oil Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kewanee Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilroy Company of Texas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Exploration Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries Inc
Represented By: Steven J. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Oil & Gas Corp
Represented By: Paul Edward Bullington
Represented By: Jonathan R. Cook
Represented By: James T. Guglielmo
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Hart
Represented By: Sara Lewis
Represented By: Guy E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLOG Exploration Company
Represented By: George Moore Gilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manti Operating Company
Represented By: Beverly Klundt Baudouin
Represented By: David Louis Carrigee
Represented By: Jedd Spencer Malish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Percy Tadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMoRan Exploration Company
Represented By: Alida C. Hainkel
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moem Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Cash
Represented By: Robert B. McNeal
Represented By: Jamie D. Rhymes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosbacher Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Exploration and Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Resources Corp. of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newfield Exploration Gulf Coast, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Meara, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORX Resources, LLC
Represented By: M. Taylor Darden
Represented By: Matthew James Fantaci
Represented By: Stephen P. Scullin
Represented By: Robert Spier Stassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.R. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placid Oil Company
Represented By: Christoffer C. Friend
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plains Pipeline, LP
Represented By: Michael A. Chernekoff
Represented By: Glenn Gill Goodier
Represented By: Robert Taylor Lemon, II
Represented By: Wayne G. Zeringue, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PXP Producing Co, LLC
Represented By: Alida C. Hainkel
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Mineral Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ripco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rozell Operating Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Parish Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew James Fantaci
Represented By: Stephen P. Scullin
Represented By: David F. Waguespack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca Resources Corporation
Represented By: Evan J. Godofsky
Represented By: Morgan J. Wells, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Co.,
Represented By: Kelly Brechtel Becker
Represented By: Dana Marie Douglas
Represented By: Russell Keith Jarrett
Represented By: Mark L. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Source Petroleum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Bay Energy, LLC.
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Represented By: Jane Jackson
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Natural Gas Co., LLC
Represented By: Ewell E. Eagan, Jr.
Represented By: Terrence Kent Knister
Represented By: James D. Rhorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundown Energy LP
Represented By: Alida C. Hainkel
Represented By: Lauren Courtney Mastio
Represented By: Carl David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Company of California
Represented By: Linda Sarradet Akchin
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Petroleum, LLC
Represented By: Mark Albin Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Oak Operating Co., LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiting Oil & Gas Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Exploration Co.
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Percy Tadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuma Exploration and Production Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul Oneal Dicharry
Represented By: Edward D. Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Parker
Represented By: Erin B. Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Billiton Petroleum KCS Resources, LLC
Represented By: Brett P. Fenasci
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr.
Represented By: Leonard L. Kilgore, III
Represented By: Douglas Conrad Longman, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Andrew Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard D. McConnell, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Stuart Pabst
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr.
Represented By: Erin Percy Tadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Pipelines North Amcerica, Inc
Represented By: George Arceneaux, III
Represented By: Penny Leonard Malbrew
Represented By: Joe B. Norman
Represented By: Kathryn M. Zainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil Exploration US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Resource & Exploration, LLC
Represented By: Francis V. Liantonio, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. O'Brien
Represented By: Jane C. Raiford
Represented By: Gregory Fortier Rouchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickens Co., Inc
Represented By: Daniel Clarence Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William G Helis
Represented By: Edward D. Hughes
Represented By: John Michael Parker
Represented By: Erin B. Sayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Land and Exploration Company, LLC Maryland
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser-Francis Oil Company
Represented By: George H. Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?