Alford et al v. Chevron U.S.A. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Catherine P. Alford, Margaret Perez Barton, James L Carrere, Richard J. Carrere, Jr., Thomas A. Carrere, Paula Perez Landrem, Leander H. Perez, III, Citrus Realty, L.L.C. and River Realty, L.L.C.
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Goodrich Petroleum Company, L.L.C., Hilcorp Energy I., L.P., Laurent Oil & Gas, L.L.C., Malloy Energy Company, L.L.C., Noble Energy, Inc. and Shell Oil Company
Consol_plaintiff: Catherine P. Alford, Margaret Perez Barton, James L. Carrere, Richard J. Carrere, Jr., Thomas A. Carrere, Paula Perez Landrem, Leander H. Perez, III, Citrus Realty, LLC and River Realty LLC
Consol_defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Chevron Pipeline Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Gulf Oil Corporation, Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC, BP America Production Company, Chevron USA Inc, Chevron USA Holdings, Inc., Four Star Oil and Gas Company, French Gulf Coast Partners, Hilcorp Energy I, L.P. and Pan American Petroleum Corporation
Case Number: 2:2013cv05457
Filed: August 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER AND REASON granting plaintiff's MOTION 239 to continue trial and pretrial deadlines. The Court also sets an in-person STATUS CONFERENCE to be held in chambers on OCTOBER 3, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. for the purpose of setting pretrial conference and trial dates and discussing limitations on expert witnesses.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/1/16.(Reference: 13-5464)(jjs)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER AND REASONS granting 181 Motion by Hilcorp to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 182 Motion by Chevron to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion by BP to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 186 Motion by Anadarko to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 187 Motion by French to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/4/15. (Reference: 13-5703)(jjs)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 167 Exxon's Motion to Dismiss; granting 177 Chevron's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/12/15. (Reference: 13-5464)(jjs)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 162 Motion for Reconsideration. the Court revises its April 1st Order 161 in one narrow respect: the Court holds that plaintiffs have not plausibly alleged that Exxon violated the implied obligations of mineral servitude holders set forth in Louisiana Mineral Code articles 11 and 22.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/3/14. (Reference: 13-5464)(jjs)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER AND REASONS - Defendants Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron U.S.A. Holdings, Inc., Four Star Oil and Gas Company, and Gulf Oil Corporation (collectively "Chevron") move for a more definite statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (e) and also move to dismiss several of plaintiffs' claims. 38 Defendants Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC; BP America Production Company and Pan American Petroleum Corporation (collectively "BP"); Hilcorp Energy I, L.P.; and French Gulf Coa st Partners also move for a more definite statement and move to dismiss, on substantially the same grounds as Chevron. 63 72 74 145 The Court DENIES defendants' motions for a more definite statement because plaintiffs' complaint is suff iciently detailed to allow defendants to prepare responsive pleadings. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART defendants' motions to dismiss because plaintiffs have failed to plausibly allege necessary factual elements of certain claims. P laintiffs will be allowed twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to amend their complaint. Failure to timely amend the complaint will result in dismissal of the foregoing claims with prejudice.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/22/14. (Reference: 13-5703)(jjs)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER AND REASONS - the Court DENIES defendants' motions 25 47 for a more definite statement, GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Chevron's motion 25 to dismiss, and GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Exxon's motion 47 to dismiss. The Court dismisses without prejudice all of plaintiffs' claims against Chevron except their claims under Civil Code articles 2683(2), 2686, and 2692, and Mineral Code articles 11 and 122. The Court dismisses without prejudice the claims (listed in this document) against Exxon. Plaintiffs will be allowed twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to amend their complaint. Failure to timely amend the complaint will result in dismissal of the foregoing claims with prejudice.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/1/14. (Reference: 13-5464)(jjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford et al v. Chevron U.S.A. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine P. Alford
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Perez Barton
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Carrere
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Carrere, Jr.
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Carrere
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Perez Landrem
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leander H. Perez, III
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citrus Realty, L.L.C.
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River Realty, L.L.C.
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Alan James Berteau
Represented By: David Phillip Curtis
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Brittany Buckley Salup
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Petroleum Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Demarcus J. Gordon
Represented By: Jane Jackson
Represented By: Terrence Kent Knister
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy I., L.P.
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Andrea Mahady Price
Represented By: Zachary I. Rosenberg
Represented By: Michelle M Rutherford
Represented By: Richard Edward Sarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurent Oil & Gas, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malloy Energy Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Demarcus J. Gordon
Represented By: Jane Jackson
Represented By: Terrence Kent Knister
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Daria Burgess Diaz
Represented By: John P. Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Patrick Wise Gray
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Catherine P. Alford
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Margaret Perez Barton
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: James L. Carrere
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Richard J. Carrere, Jr.
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Thomas A. Carrere
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Paula Perez Landrem
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Leander H. Perez, III
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Citrus Realty, LLC
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: River Realty LLC
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Represented By: Donald T. Carmouche
Represented By: John Hogarth Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: William Peter Connick
Represented By: Ross Joseph Donnes
Represented By: Victor Lynn Marcello
Represented By: Diane Adele Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Alan James Berteau
Represented By: David Phillip Curtis
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Brittany Buckley Salup
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Chevron Pipeline Company
Represented By: Alan James Berteau
Represented By: David Phillip Curtis
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Brittany Buckley Salup
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Phillip E. Foco
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Gulf Oil Corporation
Represented By: Alan James Berteau
Represented By: David Phillip Curtis
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Brittany Buckley Salup
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Represented By: Alan James Berteau
Represented By: David Phillip Curtis
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Brittany Buckley Salup
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Anadarko E&P Onshore, LLC
Represented By: James E. Lapeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: James P. Dore
Represented By: Benn Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Chevron USA Inc
Represented By: Alan James Berteau
Represented By: David Phillip Curtis
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Brittany Buckley Salup
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Chevron USA Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Alan James Berteau
Represented By: David Phillip Curtis
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Brittany Buckley Salup
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Four Star Oil and Gas Company
Represented By: Alan James Berteau
Represented By: David Phillip Curtis
Represented By: Louis Victor Gregoire, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Simon McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael Raudon Phillips
Represented By: Brittany Buckley Salup
Represented By: Shannon A. Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: French Gulf Coast Partners
Represented By: Paul J. Hebert
Represented By: Patrick S. Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Hilcorp Energy I, L.P.
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: Andrea Mahady Price
Represented By: Zachary I. Rosenberg
Represented By: Michelle M Rutherford
Represented By: Richard Edward Sarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Pan American Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: James P. Dore
Represented By: Benn Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?