Phillips v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: Henry Phillips
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2013cv05868
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER & REASONS: denying 44 Motion for Relief from a Final Judgement, Order, or Proceeding. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/17. (sek)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 26 ; ORDERED that the federal application for habeas corpus relief filed by Henry Phillips is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/26/14.(sek)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 26 ; ORDERED that the petition of Petitioner Errol Victor, Sr. for issuance of a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/12/14.(sek)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Henry Phillips. It is RECOMMENDED that the petition be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan.(gec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?