Thibodeaux v. Normand et al
Plaintiff: Damon Thibodeaux
Defendant: Newell Normand, Steve Buras, Dennis Thornton, Stacy Phillips, Walter Gorman, Maggie Snow, Hilda Montecino and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2013cv05903
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that 103 Second Motion for Reconsideration filed by the plaintiff, Damon Thibodeaux, is DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/28/2020.(ajn)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that 60 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Within fourteen days of this Order, the JPDA shall produce the grand jury transcript subject to a protective order that the transcript shall only be used in this matter, shall not be disclosed outside of the trial teams of the parties in this case, and shall not be filed into the record without a request that such transcript be filed under seal along with supporting memoranda in accordance with Local Rule 5.6. As to the remaining documents, they are not sufficiently material to the issues in this case to warrant the burden of production by JPDA, a non-party to this litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gec)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORDERED that after waiting fifteen days from entry of this Order, the Clerk shall notice a scheduling conference unless Defendants have filed a notice of interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thibodeaux v. Normand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Thibodeaux
Represented By: Sara A. Johnson
Represented By: Herbert Victor Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newell Normand
Represented By: Joseph P. Lopinto, III
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Buras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Montecino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?