Uptown Grill, LLC v. Shwartz et al
Plaintiff: Uptown Grill, LLC
Defendant: Michael Louis Shwartz, Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc. and Camellia Grill, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv06560
Filed: December 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge (Rec. Doc. 385 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. Accordingly; IT IS ORDERED that CGH's Motion for Attorney Fees (Rec. Doc. 362 ) is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Chartres Grill, LLC and Grill Holdings, LLC be ordered to pay to CGH $22,362.56 in reasonable attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/14/2018.(Reference: All Cases)(sa)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 357 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER AND REASONS denying 336 Motion for Reconsideration as set forth in Order. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 305 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 306 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/8/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER AND REASONS: Shwartz parties' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 236 is GRANTED with respect to Shwartz's claim that the Khodr parties' use of the registered Camellia Grill trademarks outside of Carrollton Avenue is a breach o f the License Agreement but DENIED in all other respects; the Khodr parties' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Trade Dress and Conversion 262 is GRANTED, the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Damages 264 is GRANTED, and the Khodr parties' Rule 21 Motion to Drop Parties 266 is DENIED.Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/26/2017. (Reference: 13-6560 c/w 14-810; 14-837)(my)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that the 233 Motion to Quash is DENIED. The Khodr Parties shall supplement their response to the Shwartz Parties' request for financial statements of Chartres Grill, L.L.C. within ten days. Further, the Court declines to award sanctions. Oral argument scheduled on October 19, 2016, is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (Reference: 15-3487)(gec)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER AND REASONS granting 194 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/9/15. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER AND REASONS granting 76 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc.'s 65 Motion for Leave to File fourth Amended Petition is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/19/2015. (Reference: 14-810, 14-837)(ecm)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDERED that the motion of the Kohdr Parties to compel a further deposition of Mark Stein (Rec. doc. 109 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (Reference: ALL CASES)(gec)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDERED that the motion of Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc., Camellia Grill, Inc. and Michael Louis Schwartz for protective order (Rec. doc. 93 ) is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; and the motion of Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc., Camellia Gril l, Inc. and Michael Louis Schwartz for reconsideration (Rec. doc. 94 ) is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. The Shwartz parties shall produce the federal tax returns for January 1, 2006 through June 2011 within seven calendar days of the entry of this order. Within seven calendar days of the entry of this order, Khodr shall produce the general ledger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sally Shushan. (Reference: ALL CASES)(gec)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AND REASONS denying 20 Motion to Remand; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uptown Grill, LLC v. Shwartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uptown Grill, LLC
Represented By: Scott Nikolaus Hensgens
Represented By: E. John Litchfield
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Represented By: Kathy L. Torregano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Louis Shwartz
Represented By: David Allan Silverstein
Represented By: Irl R. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camellia Grill Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: David Allan Silverstein
Represented By: Irl R. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camellia Grill, Inc.
Represented By: David Allan Silverstein
Represented By: Irl R. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?