Jones v. Tidex/Tidewater Marine Co et al

Plaintiff: Jackson C. Jones, Jr.
Defendant: Tidewater Inc, Pennzoil Company, Union Carbide Coporation, Steve Comeaux, Stephanie Skinner, Keith Marchadie, Jim Cooley, John Colley, Deborah Perkins and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2014cv01245
Filed: May 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Plaquemines
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER & REASONS that the Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts Order & Reasons, issued January 16, 2015, which granted Defendant Tidewater's motion for a Rule 54(b) judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/13/15. (dno)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER & REASONS that Defendant Tidewater's 31 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to this Courts Order & Reasons, dated October 2, 2014, 21 , Tidewater's Motion to Dismiss 6 is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims of Plaintiff herein against Defendant Tidewater Marine, LLC, erroneously named in the Petition as "Tidex/Tidewater Marine Co.", be and hereby are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; As the Court finds that there is no just reason for delay of any appeal from this Court's Order and Reasons 21 , the Court shall issue a Rule 54(b) judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/13/15. (dno)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER & REASONS that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 25 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, 60 days, to obtain a lawyer and to serve the other defendants is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/12/14. (dno)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER & REASONS that the 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by defendant Tidewater Inc (incorrectly named as Tidex/Tidewater Marine Co.), is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against Tidewater Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/1/14. (dno)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Tidex/Tidewater Marine Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson C. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Inc
Represented By: Miles Paul Clements
Represented By: Joseph E. Lee, III
Represented By: Brandon Kyle Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennzoil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Coporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Comeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Marchadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?