Collins v. A.B.C. Marine Towing, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Collins
Defendant: A.B.C. Marine Towing, L.L.C. and Board of Commissioners Port of New Orleans
Third_party_plaintiff: Board of Commissioners Port of New Orleans
Third_party_defendant: Boh Bros. Construction Co., LLC
Cross_claimant: Board of Commissioners Port of New Orleans
Cross_defendant: A.B.C. Marine Towing, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01900
Filed: August 19, 2014
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Plaquemines
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2015 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that 274 Boh Bros. Construction Co., L.L.C.'s Motion for Reconsideration regarding the Court's October 14, 2015 ruling, wherein this Court granted summary judgment in favor of the Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans dismissing all punitive damages claims against the Board relating to the fatal allision of August 13, 2014 is GRANTED and the issue of punitive damages will proceed to trial. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/17/15. (Reference: 14-1900)(dno)
October 14, 2015 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that the 215 Board of Commissioners' of the Port of New Orleans' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/14/15. (Reference: 14-1900)(dno)
October 2, 2015 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that the Hull Underwriters' 214 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Boh Brothers' 217 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: Both Cases)(dno)
September 9, 2015 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that the 153 Board of Commissioners Port of New Orleans' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Reference: 14-1900)(dno)
August 17, 2015 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that the Excess Underwriters' Motions for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment, 67 , 155 and 156 are DENIED and ABC Marine's Cross-Motion 141 for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/17/15. (Reference: All Cases)(dno)
July 2, 2015 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/15. (Reference: 14-1900)(plh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. A.B.C. Marine Towing, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Collins
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ian F. Taylor(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.B.C. Marine Towing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Harry E. Morse(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kelley A. Sevin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Siemann(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners Port of New Orleans
Represented By: Edward Francis LeBreton, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Board of Commissioners Port of New Orleans
Represented By: Edward Francis LeBreton, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Boh Bros. Construction Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Board of Commissioners Port of New Orleans
Represented By: Edward Francis LeBreton, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: A.B.C. Marine Towing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Harry E. Morse(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kelley A. Sevin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Siemann(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?