Laurent v. New Orleans City et al
Plaintiff: Scott Laurent
Defendant: Gentilly Racing Corp., Ford Motor Company, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Daimler North America Corporation, General Electric Company, Anco Insulations, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., CBS Corporation, Foster Wheeler, LLC, New Orleans City, American Honda Motor Company Inc, McCarty Corporation, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and BMW of North America, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv02022
Filed: September 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER & REASONS: granting 87 Defendant General Electric Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 88 Defendant CBS Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting 89 Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED that GE's, CBS's, and Foster Wheeler's Motions for Leave to File Reply (Rec. Docs. 110, 111, 112) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/9/15. (sek)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 73 Defendant City of New Orleans' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Wrongful Death Claim. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/26/15. (sek)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JUDGMENT under Rule 54(b); Before the Court is a Motion for Entry of Rule 54(b) Final Judgment (Rec. Doc. 69) filed by Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Daimler North America Corporation, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Ford Motor Company, an d American Honda Motor Co. Inc: ORDERED that the motion (Rec. Doc. 69) is GRANTED. This judgment as to Plaintiff's claims against BMW, Daimler, Volkswagen, Ford, and Honda is to constitute a full and final judgment, a full adjudication of all claims against BMW, Daimler, Volkswagen, Ford, and Honda. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/18/15.(sek)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER & REASONS: granting 49 Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Daimler North America Corporation, and Volkswagen Group of America's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 51 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/24/15. (sek)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laurent v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Laurent
Represented By: Kevin C. Schoenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentilly Racing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Amber B. Barlow
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Meghan B. Shumaker
Represented By: Lance B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler North America Corporation
Represented By: Eric Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company Inc
Represented By: Andrew D. Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Represented By: Eric Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Brian Michael LeCompte
Represented By: Colvin Gamble Norwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?