Peaker Energy Group, LLC et al v. Cargill, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Peaker Energy Group, LLC and Energy Coast Logistics Terminal, LLC
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated and Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv02106
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER and REASONS denying as moot the 375 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Permit the Depositions of Two Out-of-State Witnesses, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/4/2017. (cc: MAG-3) (cbs) .
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER and REASONS granting in part and denying in part 270 Motion for Summary Judgment on Peaker Energy Group, LLC's Claims, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/3/2017. (NEF: MAG-3) (cbs)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the 265 Motion for Summary Judgment on Lost-Profits Damages is GRANTED to the extent stated herein relative to any damages award for "lost profits" or "lost business value" sought by Plaintiffs Peaker Energy Group., LLC and Energy Coast Logistics Terminal,LLC in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (cml) (NEF:MAG KNOWLES)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 155 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. (NEF: MAG.KNOWLES) (cml)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER and REASONS granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC and 41 Motion to Dismiss by Cargill, Incorporated, as stated within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/27/2016. (cbs)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motions (Rec. Docs. 6 and 8) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that these rulings are without prejudice to Plaintiffs' right to attempt to cure the identified de ficiencies by amendment filed no later twenty (20) days from the entry of this Order and Reasons. Any such amendment is to be set forth in a second amended and superseding complaint, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 8/14/2015. (cbs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peaker Energy Group, LLC et al v. Cargill, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peaker Energy Group, LLC
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reichard
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: Lynn E. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Coast Logistics Terminal, LLC
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Benjamin D. Reichard
Represented By: James Richard Swanson
Represented By: Lynn E. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Sugar Refining, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?