Doe v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00438
Filed: February 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that AstraZeneca's Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 23) is GRANTED. AstraZeneca's Motion for Leave to File Reply (Rec. Doc. 38) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims, with the exception of her Failure to Warn claim, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend her complaint is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument on this matter, set for October 7, 2015, at 9:30 a.m., is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/6/15. (sek)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER & REASONS: denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel; FURTHER ORDERED that Oral Argument on this matter, scheduled for October 7, 2015, is CANCELED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/30/15. (sek)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that AstraZeneca's Motion to Dismiss and Amend Case Caption (Rec. Doc. 15) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within tw enty-one (21) days, lest Plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the caption of this case be amended to reflect Plaintiff's true identity. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument (Rec. Doc. 18) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/5/15. (sek)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Lizette Miller-Radovic
Represented By: Jessica Michelle Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?