Gobert v. Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Gobert, Jr.
Defendant: Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc. and Weeks Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00650
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Landry
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER AND REASONS re 104 Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Evidence and Deposition Testimony. IT IS ORDERED that Weeks Marine's motion is granted in part, denied in part, and deferred in part as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER AND REASONS re 98 Objection; ORDERED that Weeks Marine's objection is DENIED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART. No mention shall be made of the costs of the proposed surgery before the jury unless the Court permits the same following a bench conference. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/1/2017.(blg)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part and deferring in part 85 Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Matters that are Inadmissible, Irrelevant or Unduly Prejudicial. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/6/2017. (bwn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gobert v. Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Gobert, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Represented By: Julie Marie Sumrall
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Sounding Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weeks Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?