Parkcrest Builders, LLC v. Housing Authority of New Orleans
Plaintiff: Parkcrest Builders, LLC
Defendant: Housing Authority of New Orleans
Case Number: 2:2015cv01533
Filed: May 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER AND REASONS denying without prejudice 687 Motion for Writ of Execution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that HANO's Motion to Stay (Rec. Doc. 688) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/4/21. (Reference: 15-1533)(cg)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part 668 Motion for Attorney Fees. Liberty is awarded $526,192.25 in attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/2/20. (Reference: 15-1533)(cg)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 490 Motion for Expert Fees and Costs filed by Housing Authority of New Orleans is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as detailed herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenor Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Plaintiff Parkcrest Builders, LLC shall satisfy their obligation to Defendant HANO no later than 21 days after the signing of this order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on September 15, 2020.(Reference: 15-1533)(mp)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 653 . The Court, having considered Parkcrest Builders, LLC's Motion for Attorney's Fees (Rec. Doc. 493), the record, the applicable law, the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, and the failure of Defendant Housing Authority of New Orleans ("HANO") to file any objections. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Parkcrest Builders, LLC is awarded attorney's fees and expenses in the amount of $5,170.00 against HANO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that HANO shall satisfy its obligation to Parkcrest Builders, LLC no later than 21 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/2/20.(Reference: 15-1533)(cg)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER AND REASONS denying 574 Motion for Writ; denying 577 Motion for Writ of Garnishment; denying 587 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that HANO is directed to post supersedeas bond no later than December 21, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Gregg Fortner, in his official capacity as executive director of HANO, is directed to ensure HANO's compliance with this Order as stated herein. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/30/2018. (Reference: All cases)(cg)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting 540 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 540) is GRANTED. If Plaintiff wishes to file a motion for reconsideration of this Order based on the appropriate Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, it must be filed within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/18/2018. (Reference: 16-14118)(cg)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER AND REASONS denying 548 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/7/2018. (Reference: All cases)(cg)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: (1) Parkcrest is not liable to HANO; (2) Liberty is not liable to HANO; (3) HANO is liable to Liberty in the amount of $437,851.60 plus reasonable attorney's fees; (4) Parkcrest is liable to Hebert in the amount of $103,193.08 plus reasonable attorney's fees; and (5) Liberty's Rule 52 Judgment on Partial Findings (Rec. Doc. 485 ) is GRANTED. Hebert's claims against Liberty are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Court awards prejudgment interest at the Louisiana rate and postjudgment interest at the federal rate, from the date of judicial demand until paid. Within 14 days, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed form for a final judgment in accordance with these findings and conclusions. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Reference: All Cases) (gec)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER AND REASONS denying 323 Motion for Leave to File Amended Witness and Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/21/2017. (Reference: all cases)(cg)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER denying 366 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER: ORDERED that the 359 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. Liberty Mutual is awarded reasonable attorneys fees and expenses in the amount of $1,455.25. FURTHER ORDERED that Colmex shall satisfy its obligation to Liberty Mutual no later than twenty-one (21) days from the issuance of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER and REASONS: ORDERED that 357 Motion to Strike, and Alternatively, Motion for a Protective Order Pertaining to the Request for Production Propounded to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/28/2017. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER AND REASONS granting 357 Motion to Strike. IT IS ORDERED that the Intervenor's Motion to Strike, and Alternatively, Motion for a Protective Order Pertaining to the Second Set of Interrogatories and to the First Request forAdmissions Propounded to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company by the Housing Authority of New Orleans (R. Doc. 356) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/27/2017. (Reference: All cases)(cg)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDERED that 347 Motion to Compel is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Request for Attorney's Fees is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Substantial Completion (Rec. Doc. 230 ) filed by HANO is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of HANO 's Damages Arising Out of Work Completed by Colmex (Rec. Docs. 236 and 247 ) filed by Liberty and Parkcrest are DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Dismiss All Delay Claims (Rec. Doc. 237 ) filed by HANO is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Reference: ALL CASES)(gec)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that Liberty's 67 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 170 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Liberty' ;s motion to dismiss HANO's fraud claim is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Libert's motion to dismiss HANO's breach of contract claim is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Liberty's liability is capped at the penal sum of the bond. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Reference: 15-1533)(gec)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 127 Motion for Protective Order and Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated herein. FURTHER ORDERED that 144 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated herein. FURTHER ORDERED that Liberty is to finish production of its discovery responses to HANOs First Set of Request for Production and Interrogatories no later than May 10, 2017. Prior to that time, Liberty should produce document on a rolling basis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 117 Motion to Amend ESI Protocol be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties will provided an updated ESI Protocol reflecting these changes signed by all Parties to the undersigneds Chambers email no later than April 12, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 102 Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 103 Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amended Counterclaim is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: All Cases)(cml)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER AND REASONS granting 71 Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 1/17/17. (Reference: 15-1533)(clc)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 28 Liberty Mutual's Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 9/1/16. (clc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parkcrest Builders, LLC v. Housing Authority of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parkcrest Builders, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Boudreaux
Represented By: George Trippe Hawthorne
Represented By: Mallory Scott McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?