Securities and Exchange Commission v. Blackburn et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Ronald L Blackburn, Andrew V Reid, Bruce A Gwyn, Michael A Mulshine, Lee C. Schlesinger, Samuel E Whitley and Treaty Energy Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv02451
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER AND REASONS granting 235 Motion for Remedies as to Treaty and the Officer Defendants and granting in part and denying in part 250 Motion for Remedies as to Treaty as to Defendant Samuel E. Whitley. The SEC's requests for disgorgement and a civil penalty are GRANTED, and its requests for a permanent injunction and penny-stock bar are DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/8/20. (cg)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER AND REASONS granting 232 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/10/20. (cg)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that the SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 183 ) is GRANTED and Defendant Whitley's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 192 ) is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the SEC shall submit a brief to the Court on the appropriate remedies to be imposed against Defendant Whitley as a result of his violations within 21 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the SEC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 182) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/17/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the SEC's Motion to Strike ( Rec. Doc. 204) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Blackburn, Reid, Gwyn, and Mulshine's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 197) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the SEC shall submit a brief to the Court on the appropriate remedies to be imposed against each Defendant as a result of their violations within 21 days of this Order. (cg)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER AND REASONS denying 164 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 3/7/2017. (cg)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER & REASONS denying 105 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/28/2015. (mmm)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Defendant's 90 Motion to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER & REASONS: granting in part and denying in part 18 Defendant Lee C. Schlesinger's Partial Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Lee C. Schlesinger's Partial Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 18) is GRANTED IN PART, inasmuch as the Court concl udes that Plaintiff's Complaint fails to meet the pleading requirements, and DENIED IN PART, as to Defendant's request for a dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff's claims. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days from entry of this order; otherwise the aforementioned claims against Defendant will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/10/15. (sek)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER & REASONS denying 74 Defendants' Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/12/15. (sek)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Blackburn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Jennifer Dianne Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L Blackburn
Represented By: Henry L. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew V Reid
Represented By: Henry L. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce A Gwyn
Represented By: Henry L. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Mulshine
Represented By: Henry L. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee C. Schlesinger
Represented By: Jeffrey J Ansley
Represented By: Gregory D. Kelminson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel E Whitley
Represented By: Robert Michael Corn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treaty Energy Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Lewis Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?