Thomas v. Edison Chouest Offshore, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wren Thomas
Defendant: Edison Chouest Offshore, LLC, Galliano Marine Services, LLC and Offshore and Service Vessels, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv03487
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that the 117 Motion to Quash is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gec)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER AND REASONS - Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Submit an Independent Medical Examination (Rec. Doc. 106 ) is GRANTED. Further, the Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Submit to a Vocational Rehabilitation Evaluation (Rec. Doc. 116 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gec)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER AND REASONS re 62 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; 66 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. For the following reasons, the Magistrate Judge's decisions are AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/18/2016. (my)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDERED that 81 Motion to Compel Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (gec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Edison Chouest Offshore, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wren Thomas
Represented By: Tammy D. Harris
Represented By: Megan C Misko
Represented By: Daniel J. Poolson, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Chouest Offshore, LLC
Represented By: Colin B. Cambre
Represented By: Robert Perry McCleskey, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galliano Marine Services, LLC
Represented By: Colin B. Cambre
Represented By: Robert Perry McCleskey, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore and Service Vessels, LLC
Represented By: Colin B. Cambre
Represented By: Robert Perry McCleskey, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?