Mr. Mudbug, Inc. v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. Mudbug, Inc.
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Mr. Mudbug, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv05265
Filed: October 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER AND REASONS denying 93 Motion for Sanctions, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER AND REASONS as to Rec. Doc. 123 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff's claim on open account is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with respect to the lobster bisque, crab stuffing, kid mac, creolaise, miscellaneous deductions, and attorney's fees. Plaintiff's claim for Dot Seasoning, wine, and mustard REMAINS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/5/2018. (sa)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING IN PART 95 Motion for Summary Judgment as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/24/2018. (sa)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER AND REASONS denying 80 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. The Magistrate's award of attorneys' fees to Defendant is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: ORDERED that 76 Defendant's Motion to Fix Attorney's Fees is GRANTED. Defendant Ford Motor Company is awarded reasonable attorneys fees and expensesin the amount of $3,686.40. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall satisfy their obligation to Defendant no later than twenty-one (21) days from the issuance of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/23/17. (clc)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that 67 Motion to Compel Site Inspections is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff will allow the Defendant to inspect the Plaintiff's facility and food product at issue in this case on February 11, 2017 thro ugh February 12, 2017. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Bloomin Brands, Inc. is awarded attorneys fees and costs in connection with this motion. FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant shall file a motion to fix attorney fees into the record by February 7, 2017 as stated herein. Any opposition to the fee application shall be filed no later than February 14, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER AND REASONS denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that 45 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED to the extent that the Plaintiff must identify the Bates Numbers of responsive documents for each request. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff must identify responsive documents within twenty-one (21) days of the signing of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is DENIED to the extent that the Defendant seeks an order from the Court for the electronically stored information to be produced in another format. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND REASONS granting 23 Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's bad faith claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING IN PART 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's bad faith allegations are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and Plaintiff may amend its Complaint within 20 days of this Order to the extent that it can plausibly state a claim for bad faith.Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 3/23/2016. (my)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mr. Mudbug, Inc. v. Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Mudbug, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Beckner
Represented By: Peter G. Carmichael
Represented By: Michael Gerald Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Tori S. Bowling
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Tori S. Bowling
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mr. Mudbug, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Beckner
Represented By: Peter G. Carmichael
Represented By: Michael Gerald Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?