Biggio et al v. H2O Hair Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Biggio and Chelsea Luminais
Defendant: H2O Hair Inc, Michael John Gaspard and Holli M Gaspard
Case Number: 2:2015cv06034
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' 148 motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs' retaliation claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/8/2017. (mmv)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 90 Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissing the FLSA Claims of Ashley Brown and Kayla Alvarez; DENYING 91 Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissing the FLSA Claims and Gap Claims of Alison Kennedy. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 12/16/2016. (mmv)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 92 Motion to Compel as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/7/2016. (my)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AND REASONS granting 47 Motion for Partial Dismissal of First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/27/2016. (ijg)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Certify Class; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (ijg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggio et al v. H2O Hair Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H2O Hair Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael John Gaspard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holli M Gaspard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Biggio
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Bordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Luminais
Represented By: Kenneth Charles Bordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?