Washington v. Fieldwood Energy LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald Washington
Defendant: Fieldwood Energy LLC and Fieldwood Energy Offshore
Case Number: 2:2015cv06615
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Calcasieu
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Wood Group's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's claims (Rec. Doc. 105 ) is GRANTED. Wood Group's Motion for Summary Judgment regarding the Intervenor's Claims (Rec. Doc. 104 ) is DENIED AS MOOT, as set forth in document. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/12/2018. (sa)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER AND REASONS denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 73 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court REVERSES its ruling dismissing Wood Group in Record Document 68 and REINSTATES Plaintiff's claims against Wood Group for vicarious liability of Justin Roberts. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER AND REASONS granting, IN PART, Fieldwood Energy LLC and Fieldwood Energy Offshore LLC's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Wood Group PSN, Inc.'s 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Fieldwood Energy Offshore LLC and Wood Group PSN, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Fieldwood Energy LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Washington
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldwood Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldwood Energy Offshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?