Malik & Sons, LLC v. Circle K Stores Inc.
Plaintiff: Malik & Sons, LLC
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv06938
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER ADOPTING 202 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ORDERED that the Motion for Remittance of 147 Attorney Fees is DENIED without prejudice to renewal within 14 days after defendant Circle K Stores, Inc.'s appeal has resolved. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/6/2017.(clc)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion in Limine ; 86 Supplemental Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (cg)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER AND REASONS denying 71 Motion for Certificate of Appealability or, Alternatively Motion for Reconsideration re 70 Order on 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 54 Second Motion for Summary Judgment, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/4/2017. (cg)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER AND REASONS denying 52 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Renewed; denying 54 Second Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/16/2016. (cg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malik & Sons, LLC v. Circle K Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malik & Sons, LLC
Represented By: Freeman Rudolph Matthews
Represented By: Timothy R. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?