Veterans Brothers No. 126, L.L.C. v. 7-Eleven, Inc.
Plaintiff: Veterans Brothers No. 126 LLC and Lapalco Brothers No. 125, LLC
Defendant: SEI Fuel Services, Inc
Consol_defendant: SEI Fuel Services, Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv00272
Filed: January 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER AND REASONS that third-party defendants' motion 85 to stay the entire proceeding pending arbitration is GRANTED and third-party plaintiff's motion 93 to stay the parties from proceeding in arbitration is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/24/17.(Reference: ALL CASES)(jjs)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER & REASONS denying 69 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 73 Motion to Set Aside Default; SEI Fuel's motion for summary judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/27/2016. (Reference: 16-272)(mmm)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND REASONS denying 25 Motion by plaintiff Avondale Brothers No. 128 L.L.C. to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/1/16. (Reference: 16-2034)(jjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veterans Brothers No. 126, L.L.C. v. 7-Eleven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veterans Brothers No. 126 LLC
Represented By: Joseph Vincent DiRosa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lapalco Brothers No. 125, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Vincent DiRosa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEI Fuel Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: SEI Fuel Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?