Amir El v. Louisiana State et al
Plaintiff: King Sandi Amir El
Defendant: Louisiana State and Jefferson Parish
Case Number: 2:2016cv02125
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND REASONS granting 60 Motion to Dismiss. Denying as moot 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against the consolidated Defendant, the State of Louisiana, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/20/2018. (Reference: all cases)(cg)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER AND REASONS: For all of the reasons discussed above, plaintiff fails both to show good cause under Rule 16(b)(4) to amend the scheduling order to allow his amended complaint and to assert cognizable claims in his proposed amendment because it is futile under the Rule 15 standard. Accordingly, plaintiff's 53 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, is DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/6/2017. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER AND REASONS denying 54 Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/3/2017. (Reference: All cases)(cg)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Louisiana Governor John Bel Edwards' 39 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that District Attorney Paul D. Connick, Jr.'s 35 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against the State of Louisiana are DISMISSED AS FRIVOLOUS. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier.(gec)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against the Parish of Jefferson, Louisiana are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/31/2017. (gec)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Entry of Default (R. Doc. 14 ) is hereby SET ASIDE with respect to both Defendants, the State of Louisiana and Jefferson Pa rish. However, Plaintiff is granted an additional 90 days from the entry of this Order to properly serve Defendants in conformity with the requirements established by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This Order shall stand as notice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that if service is not properly executed, Plaintiff's claims may be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amir El v. Louisiana State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Sandi Amir El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?