Sheppard v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Frank Sheppard
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, McCarty Corporation, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Union Carbide Coporation, Montello, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Pennsylvania General Insurance Company, Riley Power, Inc., Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc., General Electric Company, Uniroyal Holding, Inc. and Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP
Case Number: 2:2016cv02401
Filed: March 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43:1349
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER AND REASONS - defendants' motion 210 to exclude expert opinion testimony of plaintiff Jesse Frank Sheppard's treating physicians on the grounds that Sheppard failed to comply with expert disclosure requirements is GRANTED. Sheppard's treating physicians may offer only lay testimony at trial.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/2/17. (jjs)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER AND REASONS - Liberty Mutual's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. This Order applies only to claims against Liberty Mutual in its individual capacity, and has no bearing on Sheppard's claims against Liberty Mutual in its limited capacity as the alleged insurer of purported Mosaic executives.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/30/17. (jjs)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER granting 205 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 205 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/24/2017. (mmm)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDERED that Plaintiff's 175 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Records Deposition is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that the subpoena is modified as outlined above. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 264 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Records Deposition and Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in full given that this subpoena seeks no settlement documents. FURTHER ORDER that Plaintiff's 189 Motion to Overrule Rile Power, Inc.'s Objections and Compel Meani ngful Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that the Court orders Riley to respond to plaintiff's discovery requests related to any facility at which Sheppard worked and at which Riley Power may have had boilers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 1/23/2017. (cms)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER & REASONS denying 61 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/17/2016. (mmm)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER & REASONS denying 68 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/26/2016. (mmm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheppard v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Frank Sheppard
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Represented By: Lori Allen Waters
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Susan Muller Rogge
Represented By: Kimberly R. Silas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association
Represented By: Edwin Scott Hackenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Cougill
Represented By: Jennifer H. McLaughlin
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Jennifer D. Zajac
Represented By: Jamie M Zanovec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Melissa M. Desormeaux
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Coporation
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Cutaiar
Represented By: Melissa M. Desormeaux
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montello, Inc.
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Angela J. O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania General Insurance Company
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Angela J. O'Brien
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Marc John Bitner
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Sherman Gene Fendler
Represented By: Patrick B. Reagin
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Charles B. Wilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Represented By: Katherine Weatherly Emma Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?