Carlisle v. Normand, et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Carlisle
Defendant: Tracy Mussal, Kevin Theriot, Joe McNair, Richard M Thompson, Newell Normand, Kristen Becnel, Louisiana Public Defender Board, Joe Marino and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2016cv03767
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER AND REASONS denying 566 Motion for Summary Judgment by former Jefferson Parish Sheriff Newell Normand and current Jefferson Parish Sheriff Joseph Lopinto, 580 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Sheriff, and 608 Motion to Certify Class Respecting Sheriff Claims and to Issue Notice to Class Members. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' putative class claims against the Sheriff are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER AND REASONS: DENYING 547 Motion for Reconsideration or Alternatively Motion for a New Trial, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 09/27/2019. (am)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER AND REASONS: For the reasons stated herein, the Sheriff's 443 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART, and Plaintiffs' 530 , 532 , 542 Motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 08/07/2019. (am)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER AND REASONS as to Rec. Doc. 500 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's ruling is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/7/2019. (sa)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER AND REASONS: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 475 Motion to Stay Discovery as set out in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 3/22/2019. (ajn)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that 486 Motion to Stay or Deposit Sealed Record with Magistrate is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 488 Motion to Expedite is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/13/2019. (ajn)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER AND REASONS: GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 457 Motion for Relief Respecting Objections and Deposition of Mr. Marino as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/4/2019. (ajn)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER AND REASONS denying 418 , 423 MOTIONS for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court; granting 428 Motion to Strike an exhibit that Plaintiffs attached to their Motion appealing Judge van Meerveld's order; and denying as MOOT 429 Motion to Expedite & 430 Request/Statement of Oral Argument on the Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/13/2018. (ecm)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER AND REASONS denying Motions for Reconsideration (Rec. Docs. 356 , 366 & 381 ); denying Motion to Strike Taylor Carlisle's Affidavit (Rec. Doc. 360 ); granting Motion for Leave to File Declaration (Rec. Doc. 362 ). Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Sheriff Joseph Lopinto's Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 307 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Defendant Patricia Klees's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Jurisdiction (Rec. Doc. 308 ) is GRANTED; and Defendant Patricia Klees's Motion to Dismiss Based on Prescription (Rec. Doc. 309 ) is DENIED AS MOOT, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 9/25/2018. (sa)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Prescription (Rec. Doc. 280 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims for any sanctions imposed before April 27, 2015, for Plaintiff's initial evaluation, and for any treatment or lack thereof by the McNair Defendants before April 27, 2015 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/30/2018. (sa)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER AND REASONS the Motions to Stay Discovery filed by Klees and the Sheriff 316 , 322 are GRANTED. Discovery is hereby stayed pending resolution of the Motions to Dismiss (Rec. Docs. 307, 308, 309). Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 7/19/2018. (caa)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the two Motions to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, one filed by Defendants McNair & McNair, L.L.C. and Joe McNair (Rec. Doc. 236 ) and the other filed by Defendants Joseph Marino and Richard Tompson (Rec. Doc. 247 ) are both DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/17/2018. (sa)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER AND REASONS denying 181 Motion to Dismiss; denying 182 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 189 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 191 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Defendant Drug Court Administrators' 197 Motion for Entry of Judgment is granted. Defendant Marino's denying 199 Motion for Reconsideration is denied, 199 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is denied, 199 Motion to Strike Class Allegations is granted. Further, all motions having been considered, oral argument scheduled for December 20, 2017 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER AND REASONS granting 140 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Jefferson Parish dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER AND REASONS granting Kristen Becnel, Tracey Mussal, and Kevin Theriot's 128 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part Joe McNair and McNair & McNair, LLC's 130 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part Richard Thompson and Joseph Marino's 138 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against Kristen Becnel, Tracey Mussal, Kevin Theriot AND Richard Thompson are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER AND REASONS: Plaintiffs' official capacity suits against Drug Court Administrator Kristen Becnel, Program Supervisor Tracy Mussal, Probation Coordinator Kevin Theriot, and Director of counseling Joe McNair are DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER AND REASONS denying 112 Motion for Reconsideration, as set forth in Order. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part 58 , 59 , 71 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may amend their Complaint within 21 days of the entry of this Order to the extent they can remedy any deficiencies outlined herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit any briefing relative to this Courts jurisdiction to entertain official-capacity claims against Defendants Becnel, Mussal, Theriot, and McNair within 15 days of the entry of this Order. Any such briefs shall not exceed five pages in length. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlisle v. Normand, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Mussal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe McNair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newell Normand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Becnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Public Defender Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Carlisle
Represented By: Marie Olympia Riccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?