Midfirst Bank v. Craige et al
Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank
Defendant: Kristian R. Craige, Sr. and Patrice Tardieff Craige
Third_party_defendant: Citimortgage, Inc., Citibank N.A. and Citigroup Inc
Counter_claimant: Kristian R. Craige, Sr. and Patrice Tardieff Craige
Counter_defendant: Midfirst Bank
Third_party_plaintiff: Kristian R. Craige, Sr. and Patrice Tardieff Craige
Case Number: 2:2016cv03941
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER & REASONS that Counter Defendant Midfirst Bank's 43 Motion to Dismiss against the Citi Entities is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/8/2017. (cms) (cc: Kristian R. Craige, Sr.)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER & REASONS that Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/11/2017. (cms) (cc: Kristian R. Craige, Sr.)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AND REASONS Dismissing as moot 26 Motion to re-urge a complaint ; granting 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff Craige's claims against Citimortgage, Inc., Citibank, N.A., and Citigroup Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/26/2016. (cg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midfirst Bank v. Craige et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristian R. Craige, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Tardieff Craige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midfirst Bank
Represented By: J. Donald Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Katie L. Dysart
Represented By: Kristen Lewis Hayes
Represented By: Kent A. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Citibank N.A.
Represented By: Katie L. Dysart
Represented By: Kristen Lewis Hayes
Represented By: Kent A. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Citigroup Inc
Represented By: Katie L. Dysart
Represented By: Kristen Lewis Hayes
Represented By: Kent A. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kristian R. Craige, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Patrice Tardieff Craige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Midfirst Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Kristian R. Craige, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Patrice Tardieff Craige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?