Novak et al v. St. Maxent-Wimberly House Condominium, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Novak and Kate Novak
Defendant: St. Maxent-Wimberly House Condominium, Inc., Michael Skinner, Cynthia Cunningham, Ross Henry and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv06835
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0004
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER AND REASONS granting 227 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' claims against them are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Strike (Rec. Doc. 235) and Motion to Expedite (Rec. Doc. 236) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/5/20. (cg)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER AND REASONS granting 225 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/14/20. (cg)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER AND REASONS regarding cross motions for summary judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Breach of By-laws Regarding Arbitration and Accounting (Rec. Doc. 95) and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Misrepresentation and Breach of Contract in Violation of the By-Laws and Louisiana Condominium Act (Rec. Doc. 137) submitted by Plaintiffs are DENIED with prejudice IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 56 Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 11 2) and Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 113) submitted by Defendants are GRANTED as to the Sixth Cause of Action, and as to Plaintiffs' allegations of "prior acts" committed by Defendants prior to the Plaintiffs' obtaining legal interest in St. Maxent and are otherwise DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further dispositive motions shall be filed without the Court's leave. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/11/2019. (cg)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 56 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 119) submitted by Defendants, Michael Tilbury and Jenny Tilbury is GRANTED, and Defendants, Michael Tilbury and Jenny Tilbury are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Negligent and Intentional Misrepresentations of Michael and Jenny Tilbury (Rec. Doc. 140) submitted by the Plaintiffs is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Strike Unsworn Declarations and Attachments (Rec. Docs. 148, 149) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/2/2019. (cg)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER AND REASONS: It is ORDERED that Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 117 ) by Movants Thom Beaty and French Quarter Realty, Inc. is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Movants' Motion to Reset Hearing (Rec. Doc. 174 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movants Martin Robinson's and Robinson Realty LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 126 ) is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Movants' Motion to Strike Unsworn Declaration of Malcom M. Kelso (Rec. Doc. 131 ) and Motion to Reset Hearing (Rec. Doc. 173 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novak et al v. St. Maxent-Wimberly House Condominium, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Novak
Represented By: Robert E. Couhig, III
Represented By: Claire Easterling Pontier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Novak
Represented By: Robert E. Couhig, III
Represented By: Claire Easterling Pontier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Maxent-Wimberly House Condominium, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Buck
Represented By: Brett Wayne Tweedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Skinner
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Buck
Represented By: Brett Wayne Tweedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Cunningham
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Buck
Represented By: Brett Wayne Tweedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Henry
Represented By: Thomas Glenn Buck
Represented By: Brett Wayne Tweedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: John E. McAuliffe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?