Sanders et al v. International Paper Company et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Jevone Sanders, Patricia McGowan Lewis and Dione Evette Peters
Defendant: International Paper Company, Bernard F. Chascin and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2016cv12567
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER AND REASONS denying 284 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/2021. (cwa)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' 268 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. Defendant's experts are to be DEFERRED until Phase II of this litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 280 Motion for Partial Summary Judg ement that Black Liquor can be Corrosive to Metals; 285 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Black Liquor can Cause Staining to Property; 286 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Black Liquor can Cause Adverse Health Effects; 281 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that Black Liquor can Cause Damage to Vegetation and Defendant's 279 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Requesting Dismissal of Claims for Damage to Vegetation are DISMISSED without prejudice to be re-urged after Phase I. IT IS ORDERED that the 291 and 292 motions for leave to file documents related to R. Docs. 280 and 286 under seal is hereby DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/15/2021. (cwa)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' 252 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Class-Wide Claims for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief is GRANTED. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Defendants' 253 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on C laims for Emotional Distress Damages of Certain Subclasses is DENIED without prejudice to re-urge this motion, if necessary, after the completion of Phase One. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 243 Motion to Strike Defendant's Memorandum is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/10/2021. (cwa)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 168 Motion to Exclude and 169 Motion to Exclude. FURTHER ORDERED that 162 Motion to Exclude is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 161 Motion to Redefine Class Definition is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is GRAN TED to the extent Defendant seeks to redefine the class. It is DENIED with respect to the specific definition Defendant proposes. FURTHER ORDERED that the Class Definition be redefined as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/9/2020. (jeg)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER & REASONS that Plaintiffs' 119 Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Shawn C. Reed and Jonathan C. Pedersen be and hereby are APPOINTED as Co-Lead Class Counsel and Co-Lead Liaison Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that a Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, comprised of Shawn C. Reed; Jonathan C. Pedersen; D. Douglas Howard, Jr.; William H. Arata; and Thomas M. Discon be and hereby is ESTABLISHED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' provide the Court with a proposed notice by no later than Monday, May 27, 2019. Defendant may file its objection thereto, if any, by no later than Monday, June 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/21/19. (dno)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER & REASONS that Defendant International Paper's 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is GRANTED in relation to Plaintiffs claims for strict liability nuisance under Lo uisiana Civil Code Article 667. These claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Furthermore, the Motion is GRANTED in relation to claims filed by the subclass of Plaintiffs seeking solely emotional damages, described in Paragraph 42(c) of the Complaint. These claims are DISMISSED with prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant's Motion is DENIED in regards to all of Plaintiffs' remaining claims. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/4/2016. (cms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders et al v. International Paper Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Jevone Sanders
Represented By: Charlotte Elizabeth Discon
Represented By: Scott Greaves Discon
Represented By: Thomas Massa Discon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia McGowan Lewis
Represented By: Charlotte Elizabeth Discon
Represented By: Scott Greaves Discon
Represented By: Thomas Massa Discon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dione Evette Peters
Represented By: Charlotte Elizabeth Discon
Represented By: Scott Greaves Discon
Represented By: Thomas Massa Discon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Tim Gray
Represented By: Erin Wedge Latuso
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard F. Chascin
Represented By: Tim Gray
Represented By: Erin Wedge Latuso
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?