Mays v. C-Dive, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Dean Mays
Defendant: C-Dive, L.L.C. and Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP
Consol_plaintiff: Brian Beadell
Consol_defendant: C-Dive, L.L.C. and Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP
Case Number: 2:2016cv13139
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER AND REASONS denying 130 MOTION to Certify a Judgment as Final. For reasons set forth in document, the Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/9/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER AND REASONS denying 90 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that C-Dive, LLC, Catlin Insurance Co., and New York Marine & General Insurance Co.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 81 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 76 ) is GRANTED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 8/1/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER AND REASONS granting 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Contractual Additional Insured Status. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER AND REASONS denying 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Reference: All Cases)(ecm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. C-Dive, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Dean Mays
Represented By: Bobby J. Delise
Represented By: Alton Jerold Hall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-Dive, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Brian Beadell
Represented By: Charles Clarence Bourque, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph G. Jevic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: C-Dive, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Gulf South Pipeline Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?