Parekh v. Argonautica Shipping Investments B.V. et al
Plaintiff: Nayana Ambarish Parekh
Defendant: Weber Marine, Inc., Absolute Outdoor, Inc. and African Raptor Shipping Company, LTD
Case Number: 2:2016cv13731
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St John the Baptist
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER AND REASONS granting 66 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/8/2018. (Reference: 16-13731)(clc)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER AND REASONS denying 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (Reference: 16-13731)(bwn)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND REASONS granting 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (Reference: 16-13731)(bwn)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER AND REASONS re 25 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Absolute's Affirmative Defenses 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, and 12 are STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the jury demand in this case be STRICKEN. This matter will proceed to a bench trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Absolute file by August 22, 2017 an amended answer to the Plaintiff's amended complaint, striking its jury demand and Affirmative Defenses 5, 7, 8, 9, 10, and 12, and including any defenses to the Plaintiff's claim for strict products liability under general maritime law. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (Reference: Both Cases)(bwn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parekh v. Argonautica Shipping Investments B.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nayana Ambarish Parekh
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Outdoor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: African Raptor Shipping Company, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?