Weiters v. Vannoy et al
Plaintiff: Rocarldo Weiters
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Case Number: 2:2016cv14945
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 20 . IT IS ORDERED that Rocarldo Wieters' motion for stay and abeyance of petitioner's federal habeas corpus proceedings (Rec. Doc. No. 25) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rocarldo Weiters' petition for issuance of a writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 is DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, as states within document. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 8/8/2017.(cbs)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AND REASONS denying 17 Motion to Stay and Abeyance of Federal Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/24/17. (clc)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND REASONS denying 12 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 11/3/16. (clc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiters v. Vannoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocarldo Weiters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Represented By: Matthew Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?