Shell Offshore Inc. v. Eni Petroleum US LLC et al

Plaintiff: Shell Offshore Inc.
Defendant: Eni Petroleum US LLC and Eni Petroleum Co. Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv15537
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 43:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2017 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS: This is a contract dispute concerning offshore rig operations and the governmentally mandated abandonment of four oil field wells located on the Outer Continental Shelf. The disputed motion of defendant Eni Petroleum US LLC (" Eni") to file summary judgment response, material facts, and exhibits under seal, Record Doc. No. 124 , is pending before me. I deferred the motion and temporarily placed the exhibits under seal pending furthercourt order. Record Doc. Nos. [126 ]. Having considered all of these factors, I find that Shell has not carried its evidentiary burden to show that good cause exists to protect the subject materials from disclosure by sealing them in this court's presumptively public record. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Eni's 124 motion to seal is DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/22/2017. (mmv)
September 21, 2017 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 38 Partial Motion to Dismiss claims asserted in Defendant's counterclaim. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 9/20/2017. (clc)
August 18, 2017 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS re 14] Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 76 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ORDERED that Eni-Inc.'s motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b) (2) is GRANTED. The claims against Eni-Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Eni-LLC's and Eni-Operating's motions to dismiss are hereby GRANTED IN PART, DEFERRED IN PART, and DISMISSED AS MOOT IN PART, as further explained herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/17/2017. (clc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shell Offshore Inc. v. Eni Petroleum US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Offshore Inc.
Represented By: Melissa M. Desormeaux
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Janika D. Polk
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eni Petroleum US LLC
Represented By: Seth E. Bagwell
Represented By: Russell L. Foster
Represented By: Emily Lippold Gordy
Represented By: Robert S. Stassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eni Petroleum Co. Inc.
Represented By: Seth E. Bagwell
Represented By: Russell L. Foster
Represented By: Emily Lippold Gordy
Represented By: Robert S. Stassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?