Rodgers, et al v. Gusman, et al
Plaintiff: Latasha Rodgers
Defendant: Orleans Parish Sherriff Office, Orleans Parish Prison, Marlin Gusman, New Orleans City, Mitch Landrieu, New Orleans City Council, Correct Care Solutions and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2016cv16303
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gusman's 211 third Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/24/2019. (jls)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that City Defendant's 189 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on July 23, 2019. (mp)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that CCS' 180 Motion to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of William Anderson is DENIED, as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are granted until 8/2/2019 to complete the supplemental deposition of Dr. Anderson. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/17/2019. (jls)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gusman's 165 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend the complaint within seven days of this Order to include allegations regarding the alleged aggravated assault and battery. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/17/2019. (mmv)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that CCS' 146 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and all actions against CCS under 42 U.S.C. 1983 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/29/2019. (mmv)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 120 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/14/2019. (mmv)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gusman's 52 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend her complaintwithin thirty days of this Order to cure the deficiencies noted, if possible. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/18/2018. (mmv)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 12 Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend her complaint within thirty days of this Order to cure the deficiencies noted, if possible. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/16/2017. (mmv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers, et al v. Gusman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orleans Parish Sherriff Office
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Represented By: Freeman Rudolph Matthews
Represented By: Timothy R. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orleans Parish Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Gusman
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Represented By: Freeman Rudolph Matthews
Represented By: Timothy R. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Landrieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Rodgers
Represented By: Carol D. Powell Lexing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?