AFC, Inc. et al v. Mathes Brierre Architects
Plaintiff: AFC, Inc, Ernest E. Ladner and Vonnie L. Ladner
Defendant: Mathes Brierre Architects
Case Number: 2:2016cv16560
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Mathes Brierre's request for jury instructions and jury interrogatories on the issue of licensing is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/26/2017.(blg)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER AND REASONS denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 7/26/2017. (blg)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/26/2017.(blg)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND REASONS re 13 Motion for Summary Judgment - IT IS ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' contribution claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The remainder of the summary judgment motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/27/2017. (bwn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFC, Inc. et al v. Mathes Brierre Architects
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFC, Inc
Represented By: Lawrence C. Gunn, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald Edward Meunier
Represented By: Kathy Ann Rito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest E. Ladner
Represented By: Lawrence C. Gunn, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald Edward Meunier
Represented By: Kathy Ann Rito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vonnie L. Ladner
Represented By: Lawrence C. Gunn, Jr.
Represented By: Gerald Edward Meunier
Represented By: Kathy Ann Rito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathes Brierre Architects
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?