Cardoso-Gonzalez v. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Noel Cardoso-Gonzalez
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, W-Industries of Louisiana, LLC, Dolphin Services, L.L.C., Gulf South Services, Inc. and SafeZone Safety Systems, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv16585
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Anadarko's 75 motion for summary judgment regarding the crossclaim by W-Industries of Louisiana, LLC is GRANTED. Anadarko is entitled to judgment as a matter of law in its favor on W-Industrie s' crossclaim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Anadarko's 77 motion for summary judgment regarding the crossclaim by Dolphin Services, LLC is GRANTED. Defendant Anadarko is entitled to judgment as a matter of law in its favor on Dolphin's crossclaim. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER AND REASONS granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 11/15/2017. (ajn)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AND REASONS granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Gulf South Services, Inc. is entitled to judgment in its favor. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff file a Memorandum in Support of 34 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint on or before Thursday, November 9, 2017. The Motion will be taken under submission at that time and decided on the briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 11/6/2017.(ajn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardoso-Gonzalez v. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Cardoso-Gonzalez
Represented By: Lawrence Blake Jones
Represented By: Julie Marie Sumrall
Represented By: David Christopher Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W-Industries of Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Services, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf South Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SafeZone Safety Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?